Lopez v. Dittman
Wisconsin Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Lynn Adelman |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00528 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Apr 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 30, 2019 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, May 13, 2020 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Review
Wed 05/13 9:19 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 5/13/20. The petitioner's motion at31 is DENIED. (cc: all counsel, defendant) (jad) |
||
Thursday, December 19, 2019 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Letter
Thu 12/19 2:39 PM
Copies of Correspondence to ADA Mark Williams, Human Rights Watch, Senator Ron Johnson and John Barrett (lh) |
|
Wednesday, December 04, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Review
Wed 12/04 2:08 PM
MOTION to Review by Roberto I Lopez.(tlf) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits (with bookmarks) | ||
Wednesday, October 30, 2019 | ||
30 | 30
order
Judgment
Wed 10/30 10:45 AM
JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk on 10/30/19. (cc: all counsel, petitioner)(jad) |
|
utility
Terminate Case - Notice Attorneys
Thu 10/31 9:32 AM
Case Terminated (bx) |
||
Tuesday, October 29, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
2
pgs
order
Order on Report and Recommendations
Wed 10/30 10:39 AM
ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 10/29/19 that Magistrate Judge Jones's Report & Recommendation 44 is ADOPTED in its entirety, the petition for habeas corpus is DISMISSED, this case is DISMISSED and a certificate of appealability is DENIED. (cc: all counsel, petitioner) (jad) |
|
Monday, October 07, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Objections
Tue 10/08 10:06 AM
SECOND OBJECTIONS by Roberto I Lopez re26 Report and Recommendations, Case Assigned/Reassigned. (bx) |
|
27 | 27
misc
Objections
Mon 10/07 4:04 PM
OBJECTIONS by Roberto I Lopez re26 Report and Recommendations(mac) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit - Copy of Report and Recommendation | ||
Thursday, September 19, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Report and Recommendations ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 09/19 1:44 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 9/19/19. IT IS HEREBY RECOMMENDED that Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2254 By a Person in State Custody, ECF No.1 , be DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2244(b). IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that this action be DISMISSED and that a certificate of appealability be DENIED. Case reassigned to Judge Lynn Adelman. Judge Magistrate Judge David E Jones no longer assigned to the case. (cc: all counsel - via US Mail to Petitioner)(kah) |
|
Wednesday, September 18, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee
Thu 09/19 10:39 AM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 9/18/19 granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the stay ordered on December 28, 2017, is LIFTED. (cc: all counsel - via US Mail to Petitioner) (kah) |
|
Monday, June 11, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Mon 06/11 2:46 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address as to Roberto I Lopez AND letter re: status of case. Updated address to Wisconsin Resource Center and sent docket to petitioner report via US Mail. (amb) |
|
Thursday, March 22, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
Thu 03/22 3:48 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 3/22/18. Roberto I. Lopez's motion to appoint counsel, ECF No.14 , is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Mr. Lopez may renew his request if and when the stay is lifted, pending the outcome of his action in the Western District of Wisconsin. NOTE: There is no document attached to this text-only order. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Petitioner) (jh) |
|
Thursday, December 28, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Case Stayed
Thu 12/28 2:33 PM
ORDER STAYING ACTION signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 12/28/2017. IT IS ORDERED that this action is STAYED pending resolution of Mr. Lopez's action in the Western District of Wisconsin, or until further order of the Court. (cc: all counsel, via US Mail to petitioner)(amb) |
|
Thursday, December 07, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Letter
Fri 12/08 1:26 PM
LETTER from Mr. Lopez regarding suppressed material withheld by the state prosecution. (mlm) |
|
Wednesday, August 23, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Original Document
Wed 08/23 9:28 AM
MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENTS filed by Robert I Lopez. (mac) |
|
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Supplement
Fri 08/18 4:17 PM
SUPPLEMENT by Roberto I Lopez. (lh) |
|
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Letter
Wed 08/16 2:06 PM
LETTER from petitioner regarding Interstate Agreement on Detainers Act. (kah) |
|
Wednesday, August 02, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Original Document
Tue 08/08 11:42 AM
DOCUMENTS filed in support of14 Motion to Appoint Counsel by Roberto I Lopez. (tlf) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Letter
Tue 08/08 11:36 AM
LETTER to the Clerk of Court from Roberto I Lopez. (tlf) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Original Document
Tue 08/08 11:33 AM
MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENTS filed by Robert I Lopez. (tlf) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Appoint Counsel
Tue 08/08 11:28 AM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Roberto I Lopez. (tlf) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Original Document
Tue 08/08 11:15 AM
MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT - Case law submitted by Robert I Lopez. (tlf) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Supplement
Tue 08/08 11:11 AM
SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENTS (with bookmarks) filed by Roberto I Lopez. (tlf) |
|
11 | 11
respm
Response (Non-Motion)
Tue 08/08 11:07 AM
PARTIAL RESPONSE filed by Roberto I Lopez re10 Order to Show Cause. (tlf) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order to Show Cause
Wed 07/05 3:22 PM
SHOW-CAUSE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 7/5/17 that on or before August 21, 2017, Mr. Lopez shall submit a response to this Show-Cause Order, addressing the issues identified in the Order. (cc: all counsel - via US Mail to Petitioner)(kah) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Original Document
Fri 06/30 4:53 PM
Copies of State Court Decisions in Milwaukee County Circuit Court Case 02CF003278 filed by Roberto I Lopez. (tlf) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Fri 06/30 4:52 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Roberto I Lopez. (tlf) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
minutes
Status Conference
Thu 06/29 3:41 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David E Jones: Telephonic Status Conference held on 6/29/2017. Court discusses plaintiff's three pending cases. Court directs plaintiff to file an amended complaint and a consent/refusal form in Case 17-cv-526. The Court will issue orders addressing each of the three cases. (Tape #10:14:23-10:41:45) (kah) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice of Hearing
Tue 06/20 11:50 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 6/30/2017 10:00 AM By Telephone before Magistrate Judge David E Jones. The court will initiate the call to Mr. Lopez. (cc: all counsel - via US Mail to Plaintiff/Petitioner)(kah) |
||
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Mon 06/12 9:31 AM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Roberto I Lopez. (tlf) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Letter from Clerk re Consent to Magistrate
Wed 05/24 10:48 AM
SECOND LETTER from the clerk to Petitioner requesting that the consent/refusal form to Magistrate Judge David E Jones be filed within 14 days. (kah) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Letter from Clerk re Consent to Magistrate
Fri 04/14 2:10 PM
LETTER from the clerk to Petitioner re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge David E. Jones and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (amb) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
Fri 04/14 2:36 PM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Roberto A Lopez. (amb) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee
Fri 04/14 2:03 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Miguel A Dotel Sierra. (amb) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Fri 04/14 2:02 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Miguel A Dotel Sierra. (amb) |