Beaufrand v. Genpact Services LLC
Wisconsin Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Pamela Pepper |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00538 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 16, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 11, 2017 4:23 AM CDT |
Defendant
Genpact Services LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carlos Beaufrand
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 06/16 5:08 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Carlos Beaufrand. (Eldridge, Mark) |
|
utility
Terminate Case - Notice Attorneys
Mon 06/19 8:24 AM
Case Terminated (vkb) |
||
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
order
Order Approving Stipulation
Tue 05/16 9:39 AM
Text-Only ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 5/16/2017 APPROVING5 Stipulation to extend the time for defendant to file a response to the Complaint. The court ORDERS that the defendant shall have until the end of the day on 6/21/2017 to file a response to the Complaint. (cc: all counsel)(pwm) |
||
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Disclosure Statement
Mon 05/15 5:13 PM
DISCLOSURE Statement by Genpact Services LLC. (Newburger, Manuel) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 05/15 5:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Manuel H Newburger on behalf of Genpact Services LLC. (Newburger, Manuel) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Stipulation
Mon 05/15 5:09 PM
STIPULATION to Extend Answer Date by Genpact Services LLC.(Newburger, Manuel) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Mon 04/24 2:45 PM
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Carlos Beaufrand. (Eldridge, Mark) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Mon 04/17 8:29 AM
NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Pamela Pepper ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl) |
||
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/17 12:03 PM
Summons Issued as to Genpact Services LLC. (vkb) |
||
order
Order on Motion to Stay Order on Motion for Relief Order on Motion to Certify Class
Mon 04/17 2:54 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 4/17/2017 re3 MOTION to Certify Class (Campbell-Ewald; Damasco), MOTION to Stay briefing on the motion to Certify Class until an amended motion is filed, MOTION for Relief from the local rules requiring briefs and supporting materials to be filed with the motion and the automatic briefing schedule filed by plaintiff: The court GRANTS the plaintiff's motion to stay the class certification motion until such time as the plaintiff files an amended class certification motion. The court further GRANTS the plaintiff's motion asking for relief from the automatic briefing schedule required by the local rules for the Eastern District of Wisconsin. (cc: all counsel)(pwm) |
||
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Certify Class Stay Relief
Fri 04/14 4:33 PM
MOTION to Certify Class (Campbell-Ewald; Damasco) , Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION to Stay briefing on the motion to Certify Class until an amended motion is filed , Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Relief from the local rules requiring briefs and supporting materials to be filed with the motion and the automatic briefing schedule by Carlos Beaufrand. (Blythin, John) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/14 4:33 PM
DISCLOSURE Statement by Carlos Beaufrand. (Blythin, John) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/14 4:32 PM
COMPLAINT (class action) with Jury Demand; against Genpact Services LLC by Carlos Beaufrand. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2559475)(Blythin, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A: letter from Defendant to Plaintiff, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B: letter from Defendant to Plaintiff, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Summons on Defendant |