Kersey v. Prudential Insurance Agency, et al
Original Case: 1:15-cv-14186
First Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-civil-01358 |
Type | civil / private / contract |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Case Filed: | Apr 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 16, 2017 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 17, 2017 3:29 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellee
PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE AGENCY, LLC, a/k/a Prudential and Prudential Insurance Company of America
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, a/k/a Prudential
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
FRASER DEBORAH
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DEBORAH FRASER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
PAUL FRASER
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
GEORGE E. KERSEY
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11/17/2017 3:29 AM EST |
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #47) filed by Appellant George E. Kersey. Transcript Report/Order form due 04/28/2017. PLEASE NOTE: The December 1, 2016 amendment to the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure made significant changes to appellate practice. The full text of the amendments, as well as a summary of major rule changes, is available here. The changes went into effect on December 1, 2016. 17-1358 (GRC) |