Tang v. Citizens Bank, et al
Original Case: 1:14-cv-12550
First Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-civil-01365 |
Type | civil / private / civil rights |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Case Filed: | Apr 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 11, 2018 |
Last checked: Thursday Jul 12, 2018 4:30 AM EDT |
Defendant
DOES 1 - 22
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
CITIZENS BANK, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
RBS CITIZENS BANK, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
ROYAL BANK OF SCOTLAND GROUP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
DAVID NACKLEY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
DOES 1 - 22
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
CITIZENS BANK, a/k/a Citizens Bank, N.A., a/k/a Citizens, N.A, a/k/a Citizens, a/k/a RBS Citizens, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
RBS CITIZENS, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
ROYAL BANK OF SCOTLAND GROUP, a/k/a RBS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
XIAOYAN TANG
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 07/12/2018 4:30 AM EDT |
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #158) filed by Appellant Xiaoyan Tang. Fee and Transcript Report/Order form due 05/02/2017. PLEASE NOTE: The December 1, 2016 amendment to the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure made significant changes to appellate practice. The full text of the amendments, as well as a summary of major rule changes, is available here. The changes went into effect on December 1, 2016. 17-1365 (GB) |