Williams v. City of New York et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Raymond J Dearie |
Referred: | Steven M Gold |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02303 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 23, 2020 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 14, 2017 6:12 AM EDT |
Defendant
Shaequana Braithwaite
|
|
Defendant
Furrel Canteen
|
|
Defendant
City of New York
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John or Jane Doe 1
|
|
Defendant
John or Jane Doe 2
|
|
Defendant
Martin J Murphy
|
|
Defendant
Joseph Ponte
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Williams
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Grace Greaves
Terminated: 08/01/2017
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 23, 2020 | ||
92 | 92
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 04/23 10:22 AM
STIPULATION Of Dismissal: The above-referenced actions are each hereby dismissed with prejudice. (See Order for details) SO Ordered by Judge Raymond J. Dearie on 4/23/2020. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-02303-RJD-SMG, 1:19-cv-00365-RJD-SMG (Tavarez, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, April 22, 2020 | ||
91 | 91
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 04/22 11:59 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of All Claims With Prejudice Pursuant ot Settlement by City of New York Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-02303-RJD-SMG, 1:19-cv-00365-RJD-SMG (Scheiner, Alan) |
|
Tuesday, April 21, 2020 | ||
order
Status Report Order
Tue 04/21 12:40 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: Counsel shall file a joint status report letter by May 6, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 4/21/2020. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-02303-RJD-SMG, 1:19-cv-00365-RJD-SMG (Gillespie, Saudia) |