L3 Technologies, Inc. v. EME Technology International, Inc. et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Denis R Hurley |
Referred: | Steven I Locke |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02287 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 09, 2018 |
Last checked: Thursday Oct 26, 2017 8:40 AM EDT |
Defendant
EME Technology International, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Robert Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Susan Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rooftop Antenna Safety Services LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John and Jane Does Nos. 1-10
|
|
Defendant
Wavecontrol Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wavecontrol S.L.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
L3 Technologies, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Monday, February 12, 2018 | ||
81 | 81
1
pgs
notice
Notice of Report Patent or Trademark AO120
Mon 02/12 4:44 PM
Notice of Report on the filing of an action regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Cubano, Jazmin) |
|
Att: 1 5 pgs Order of dismissal | ||
Friday, February 09, 2018 | ||
order
Order(Other)
Fri 02/09 11:57 AM
ORDER re79 ,80 : The Stipulations of Dismissal are So Ordered and the Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 2/9/2018. (Bochner, Francesca) |
||
order
~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Mon 02/12 3:02 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (Cubano, Jazmin) |
||
Thursday, February 08, 2018 | ||
80 | 80
2
pgs
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 02/08 10:11 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice against Wavecontrol S.L. and Wavecontrol Inc. by L3 Technologies, Inc. (Tenedios, Irene) |
|
79 | 79
1
pgs
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 02/08 10:07 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal against EME Technology International, Inc. Robert Johnson, Rooftop Antenna Safety Services LLC (formerly known as Stray Voltage Solutions, LLC d/b/a Contact Voltage Solutions), and Susan Johnson by L3 Technologies, Inc. (Tenedios, Irene) |