Graham v. Caine & Weiner Company, Inc.
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Arthur D Spatt |
Referred: | A Kathleen Tomlinson |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02295 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 03, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 14, 2017 6:29 AM EDT |
Counter Claimant
Caine & Weiner Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Anthony C. Graham
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Caine & Weiner Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony C. Graham
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Tuesday, September 12, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 09/12 2:58 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(A)(1)(a)(ii) re:13 STIPULATION of Dismissal. Case shall remain closed. So Ordered. (Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 9/12/2017.) (Fagan, Linda) |
|
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 09/11 2:13 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Anthony C. Graham (Sanders, Craig) |
|
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 08/04 11:27 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE Re:11 Notice of Settlement. The Court is closing this case for administrative purposes, subject to the terms of the settlement agreement. The parties are granted leave to move to reopen this matter in theevent the settlement is not consummated. SO ORDERED by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 8/3/2017. (Ortiz, Grisel) |
|
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Settlement
Tue 08/01 2:21 PM
NOTICE of Settlement as to entire action by Anthony C. Graham (Barshay, David) |
|
order
Order(Other)
Tue 08/01 10:28 AM
ORDER. The parties are directed to submit the Joint Proposed Discovery Plan as set forth in Section II.D. of the Initial Conference Scheduling Order by 3 p.m. today. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 8/1/2017. (Roman, Joshua) |
||
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Wed 07/19 2:59 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Anthony C. Graham by Caine & Weiner Company, Inc.. (Borges, Wanda) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service | ||
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 06/26 11:52 AM
Electronic ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer nunc pro tunc. Defendant shall file a responsive pleading on or before 7/20/2017. So Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 6/26/2017. (Fell, Christopher) |
||
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 06/23 11:53 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Caine & Weiner Company, Inc.. (Borges, Wanda) |
|
Att: 1 Stipulation_Extension of Time to Answer | ||
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Thu 06/22 2:22 PM
ORDER granting8 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The Court has reviewed Defendant's letter motion. As an initial matter, the Court points out that counsel are not free to provide each other with courtesy extensions of any deadlines. As such, to the extent Defendant sought relief from the original deadline to file its Answer, it was obligated, after obtaining consent from opposing counsel, to file a duly executed Stipulation with the Court. As this has not been accomplished, the parties are directed to execute and file a Stipulation extending Defendant's time to Answer directed to the attention of Judge Spatt forthwith. Notwithstanding this procedural error, the Court will nevertheless adjourn the Initial Conference presently scheduled for June 26, 2017. The Conference will instead proceed on August 2, 2017 at 11 a.m. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 6/22/2017. (Roman, Joshua) |
||
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Adjourn Conference
Wed 06/21 11:45 AM
MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Caine & Weiner Company, Inc.. (Borges, Wanda) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 06/21 11:39 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Wanda Borges on behalf of Caine & Weiner Company, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Borges, Wanda) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 06/01 1:34 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anthony C. Graham. Caine & Weiner Company, Inc. served on 5/3/2017, answer due 5/24/2017. (Sanders, Craig) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 05/12 12:27 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: INITIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for June 26, 2017 at 11:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson in Courtroom 910 at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York. No later than two business days before the Initial Conference, counsel for the parties must submit, by means of electronic filing on the court's ECF system, a Joint Proposed Discovery Plan. SEE ATTACHED ORDER for additional details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 5/12/2017. (Roman, Joshua) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/25 11:33 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Barshay on behalf of Anthony C. Graham (aty to be noticed) (Barshay, David) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/18 10:31 AM
Summons Issued as to Caine & Weiner Company, Inc. (Rodin, Deanna) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Tue 04/18 10:29 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) |
|
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Tue 04/18 10:26 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. (Rodin, Deanna) |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 04/18 10:28 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Arthur D. Spatt and Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) |
||
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/17 5:23 PM
COMPLAINT against Caine & Weiner Company, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9455306 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Anthony C. Graham. (Sanders, Craig) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons |