Peterson v. Afni, Inc. et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Arthur D Spatt |
Referred: | Steven I Locke |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02298 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 21, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 14, 2017 6:20 AM EDT |
Defendant
Affirm, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Afni, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Peterson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Wednesday, February 21, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 02/21 3:36 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE re29 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1) with each party to bear its respective attorney's fees and costs. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to close the case. SO ORDERED by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 2/21/2018. (Coleman, Laurie) |
|
Tuesday, February 20, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 02/20 2:16 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by John Peterson (Barshay, David) |
|
Wednesday, January 31, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 01/31 6:36 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Spencer M Schulz Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-10163674. by Afni, Inc.. (Schulz, Spencer) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, January 30, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
minutes
Status Conference
Tue 01/30 11:19 AM
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke:Status Conference held on 1/30/2018. The deadline for depositions is adjourned until 5/15/18. There will be no expert discovery. Motion hearing adjourned to March 1, 2018 at 11am in Courtroom 820 before Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. (Gandiosi, Kristin) |
|
Monday, January 29, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Protective Order
Mon 01/29 11:25 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by John Peterson. (Barshay, David) |
|
Thursday, January 25, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Compel
Thu 01/25 5:04 PM
First MOTION to Compel by John Peterson. (Barshay, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit January 9, 2018 letter to Defendant, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit January 23, 2018 letter to Defendant, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Local Civil Rule 37.1 Statement | ||
Saturday, January 20, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Sat 01/20 10:13 AM
Electronic ORDER granting24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re21 MOTION to Dismiss. On consent of the parties, responses due by 2/19/2018, replies due by 3/5/2018. Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 1/20/2018. (Roberts, Joshua) |
||
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 01/19 2:23 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to21 MOTION to Dismiss Letter Request for Extension of Time Concerning Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by John Peterson. (Curtis, Eric) |
|
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 01/19 12:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Mark Cader on behalf of John Peterson (aty to be noticed) (Cader, Jonathan) |
|
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 01/19 12:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Eric A Curtis on behalf of John Peterson (aty to be noticed) (Curtis, Eric) |
|
Thursday, January 11, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Dismiss
Thu 01/11 10:53 AM
MOTION to Dismiss by Afni, Inc.. (Easley, Aaron) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, December 07, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Parties
Fri 12/08 1:27 PM
ORDER Dismissing Parties Re:19 Stipulation of Dismissal without Prejudice; The Court respectfully directs the Clerk of Court to amend the caption to the caption referenced herein and terminate Affirm, Inc. So Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 12/7/2017. (Valle, Christine) |
|
Wednesday, December 06, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 12/06 2:59 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Affirm by John Peterson (Barshay, David) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Amended Caption | ||
Tuesday, December 05, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order(Other)
Wed 12/06 12:34 PM
ORDER re17 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Defendant Affirm, Inc. only. Denying Stipulation of Dismissal as to Defendant Affirm, Inc. Only. The Plaintiff is instructed to refile the Stipulation in a manner that is consistent with this Court's Individual Rules. As stated in Individual Rule 11.C., the Plaintiff is required to submit an amended caption, reflecting the parties remaining in the case. SO ORDERED by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 12/5/2017. (Coleman, Laurie) |
|
Monday, December 04, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 12/04 12:28 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal w/o prejudice as to Affirm, Inc. only by Affirm, Inc. (Matthews, Victor) |
|
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 08/28 4:16 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: A Pretrial Conference is set for 6/19/2018 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. A Status Conference is set for 1/30/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 820 before Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. See attached written order for all other deadlines. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 8/28/2017. (Perri, Anthony) |
|
15 | 15
minutes
Status Conference
Mon 08/28 4:14 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke:An Initial Conference was held on 8/28/2017. A scheduling order was adopted and so ordered. A status conference is set for 1/30/2018 at 10:30 a.m. See scheduling order for all other dates and deadlines. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 8/28/2017. (FTR Log #10:38-10:40.) (Perri, Anthony) |
|
Wednesday, August 23, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Proposed Scheduling Order
Wed 08/23 4:34 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by John Peterson (Barshay, David) |
|
Wednesday, August 02, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Wed 08/02 10:30 AM
Electronic ORDER granting in part and denying in part DE12 , Motion to Adjourn Conference. The Initial Conference originally scheduled for August 8, 2017 is hereby adjourned to August 28, 2017 at 12:00 p.m. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 8/2/2017. (Perri, Anthony) |
||
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Thu 06/29 3:54 PM
ANSWER to7 Amended Complaint by Afni, Inc.. (Easley, Aaron) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Adjourn Conference
Fri 06/23 12:07 PM
Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference to August 21, 2017 by Afni, Inc.. (Easley, Aaron) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Tue 06/20 3:19 PM
ANSWER to7 Amended Complaint by Affirm, Inc.. (Matthews, Victor) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 06/12 11:43 AM
INITIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 8/8/2017 in Courtroom 820 before Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. See order and attachments. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 6/12/2017. (Gandiosi, Kristin) |
|
Att: 1 SIL Individual Rules, | ||
Att: 2 Scheduling Order Worksheet | ||
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 06/01 5:54 PM
AFNI Inc's ANSWER to1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by Afni, Inc.. (Easley, Aaron) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 06/01 5:50 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Afni, Inc. (Easley, Aaron) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 05/30 5:05 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with proposed Amedned Caption against Affirm, Inc., Afni, Inc., filed by John Peterson. (Barshay, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Caption, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit collection letter | ||
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 05/25 1:54 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Affirm, Inc.. (Matthews, Victor) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/25 12:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Barshay on behalf of John Peterson (aty to be noticed) (Barshay, David) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/18 11:22 AM
Summons Issued as to Affirm, Inc. (Rodin, Deanna) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/18 11:22 AM
Summons Issued as to Afni, Inc. (Rodin, Deanna) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Tue 04/18 11:18 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) |
|
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Tue 04/18 11:17 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. (Rodin, Deanna) |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 04/18 11:18 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Arthur D. Spatt and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) |
||
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/17 5:45 PM
COMPLAINT against Affirm, Inc., Afni, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9455392 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by John Peterson. (Sanders, Craig) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet |