Workman v. M. et al
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | R Bryan Harwell |
Referred: | Kevin Mcdonald |
Case #: | 6:17-cv-00972 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:12117 Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 26, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 10, 2017 5:17 AM EDT |
Defendant
Tee Brokiskie
|
|
Defendant
Michael Compos
|
|
Defendant
Caleb Davis
|
|
Defendant
Montre Jeter
|
|
Defendant
Bill M.
|
|
Defendant
Chris Mattern
|
|
Defendant
Engineered Product Corporation Co
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John NLN
|
|
Plaintiff
Olandio Ray Workman
1263 Green Dorm Cell 19 Greenville County Detention Center 20 McGee Street
Greenville, SC 29601 |
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 08, 2018 | ||
46 | 46
appeal
Appeal Remark
Thu 08/09 7:51 AM
Letter regarding appeal re39 Notice of Appeal : Plaintiff inquiring about status of appeal.(kric, ) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Tuesday, April 24, 2018 | ||
45 | 45
appeal
USCA Mandate
Tue 04/24 8:59 AM
USCA MANDATE and Judgment as to39 Notice of Appeal,(kric, ) |
|
Att: 1 Judgment | ||
Monday, April 02, 2018 | ||
44 | 44
appeal
USCA Opinion
Mon 04/02 10:25 AM
USCA OPINION for39 Notice of Appeal. Decision of Appeals Court Affirmed Decision of District Court. (kric, ) |
|
Monday, December 04, 2017 | ||
42 | 42
appeal
Record to 4CCA - Initial Electronic Record
Tue 12/05 7:29 AM
ASSEMBLED INITIAL ELECTRONIC RECORD TRANSMITTED TO FOURTH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS re39 Notice of Appeal, Electronic record successfully transmitted. (kric, ) |
|
41 | 41
misc
Document Mailed
Mon 12/04 3:27 PM
***DOCUMENT MAILED39 Notice of Appeal,40 Transmittal Sheet for Notice of Appeal to USCA, and public docket sheet placed in U.S. Mail to Olandio Ray Workman (kric, ) |
|
40 | 40
appeal
Transmittal Sheet for Notice of Appeal to USCA
Mon 12/04 3:22 PM
Transmittal Sheet for Notice of Appeal to USCA re39 Notice of Appeal, The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (kric, ) |
|
39 | 39
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Mon 12/04 3:14 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to35 Order Ruling on Report and Recommendation. - Filing fee $ 505. The Docketing Statement form, Transcript Order form and CJA 24 form may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov(kric, ) |
|
Att: 1 4CCA letter, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
Thursday, October 26, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Document Mailed
Thu 10/26 11:30 AM
***DOCUMENT MAILED37 Judgment,35 Order Ruling on Report and Recommendation, placed in U.S. Mail to Olandio Ray Workman (kric, ) |
|
37 | 37
misc
Judgment
Thu 10/26 11:28 AM
JUDGMENT. Defendant Engineered Product Corporation Cos motion to dismiss is granted and the defendant is dismissed without prejudice. (kric, ) |
|
35 | 35
6
pgs
order
Order Ruling on Report and Recommendation
Thu 10/26 10:38 AM
ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 19 , 31 . The Court SUMMARILY DISMISSES Defendants Bill M., Montre Jeter, Caleb Davis, Chris Mattern, Tee Brokiskie, Michael Compos, and John NLN without prejudice and without issuance and service of process. The Court GRANTS the motion to dismiss [ECF No. 26] filed by Defendant Engineered Products and DISMISSES this defendant without prejudice. Signed by Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 10/26/2017. (kric, ) |
|
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendation
Thu 09/14 9:15 AM
OBJECTION to31 Report and Recommendation by Olandio Ray Workman. Reply to Objections due by 9/27/2017 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.(kric, ) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Tuesday, August 29, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Document Mailed
Tue 08/29 3:27 PM
***DOCUMENT MAILED31 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Engineered Product Corporation Co placed in U.S. Mail to Olandio Ray Workman (kric, ) |
|
31 | 31
motion
Report and Recommendation
Tue 08/29 3:09 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending the defendant Engineered Products' 26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM be granted. IT IS SO RECOMMENDED. Objections to R&R due by 9/12/17. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 8/29/17. (ctuc, ) |
|
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 07/28 1:09 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response filed by Olandio Ray Workman.Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/4/2017 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.(kric, ) Modified on 7/28/2017 to correct filing date (kric, ) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Document Mailed
Thu 07/20 8:56 AM
***DOCUMENT MAILED27 Roseboro Order, placed in U.S. Mail to Olandio Ray Workman (kric, ) |
|
27 | 27
order
Roseboro Order
Thu 07/20 8:54 AM
ROSEBORO ORDER directing clerk to forward summary judgment explanation to the opposing party and directing that party to respond in 31 days. Response due to 26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response to Motion due by 8/21/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 7/20/2017. (kric, ) |
|
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Wed 07/19 1:14 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Engineered Product Corporation Co. Response to Motion due by 8/2/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(Hedgepath, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Charge of Discrimination, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - EEOC Dismissal and Notice of Rights, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Detention Center Record of Inmate Description and Location | ||
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
service
Summons Returned Executed - Complaint Served
Mon 07/10 2:06 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Engineered Product Corporation Co served on 6/27/2017, answer due 7/18/2017. (kric, ) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendation
Thu 07/06 2:41 PM
OBJECTION to19 Report and Recommendation by Olandio Ray Workman. Reply to Objections due by 7/20/2017 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.(jtho, ) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope (postmark July 5, 2017) | ||
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
service
Summons Issued
Wed 06/21 9:52 AM
Summons Issued as to Engineered Product Corporation Co. (kric, ) |
|
20 | 20
misc
Document Mailed
Wed 06/21 7:46 AM
***DOCUMENT MAILED17 Order 1983,,19 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re1 Complaint, filed by Olandio Ray Workman placed in U.S. Mail to Olandio Ray Workman (kric, ) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Report and Recommendation
Tue 06/20 2:49 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending the district court dismiss defendants Bill M., Montre Jeter, Caleb Davis, Chris Mattern, Tee Brokiskie, Michael Compos, and John NLN from this action without prejudice and without issuance and service of process. This action remains pending against the remaining Engineered Product. IT IS SO RECOMMENDED. Objections to R&R due by 7/5/17. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 6/20/17. (ctuc, ) |
|
17 | 17
order
Order 1983 - Service - Inmate
Tue 06/20 2:46 PM
ORDER authorizing partial service of process and collection of filing fee. Plaintiff has incurred a debt to the U.S.A. in the amount of $350. Apprising defendant Engineered Product, Corporation, Co. of deadline for filing dispositive motions and directing plaintiff to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. The plaintiff's 7 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. The plaintiff's 8 10 motions for discovery are denied. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 6/20/17. (ctuc, ) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Document Mailed
Wed 05/10 11:30 AM
***DOCUMENT MAILED: blank Complaint for Employment Discrimination with letter from the court, placed in U.S. Mail to Olandio Ray Workman (kmca) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Discovery
Fri 05/05 11:45 AM
MOTION for Discovery by Olandio Ray Workman. Response to Motion due by 5/18/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(kric, ) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Discovery
Thu 04/27 2:33 PM
MOTION for Discovery by Olandio Ray Workman. Response to Motion due by 5/11/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(kric, ) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
7 | 7
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 04/27 2:31 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Olandio Ray Workman. Response to Motion due by 5/11/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(kric, ) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Document Mailed
Wed 04/19 3:07 PM
***DOCUMENT MAILED5 Proper Form Order, placed in U.S. Mail to Olandio Ray Workman with AO240 form and complaint form (kric, ) Modified on 4/19/2017 to edit text (kric, ) |
|
5 | 5
order
Proper Form Order
Wed 04/19 3:03 PM
PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 5/11/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 4/19/2017. (kric, ) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/17 8:19 AM
COMPLAINT against Tee Brokiskie, Michael Compos, Caleb Davis, Montre Jeter, Bill M., Chris Mattern, filed by Olandio Ray Workman. Service due by 7/12/2017(kric, ) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope |