Harrison v. Life Insurance Company of North America
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Mary Geiger Lewis |
Case #: | 6:17-cv-00979 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 24, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 14, 2017 6:07 AM EDT |
Defendant
Life Insurance Company of North America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rita Harrison
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Saturday, June 24, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Sat 06/24 10:07 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Shuler, Franklin) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice and Acknowledgment of Removal
Tue 04/18 1:40 PM
NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Greenville County.(Shuler, Franklin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Signed Acknowledgment of Removal | ||
6 | 6
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Tue 04/18 12:38 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Rita Harrison.(Peace, John) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Erisa Order
Mon 04/17 3:29 PM
ERISA CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Joint Stipulation Deadline 8/15/2017. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 4/17/2017. (abuc) |
|
4 | 4
respoth
Answer to Complaint Notice of Removal
Mon 04/17 3:28 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Life Insurance Company of North America. (abuc) |
|
3 | 3
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Mon 04/17 3:27 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Life Insurance Company of North America.(abuc) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Mon 04/17 3:26 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Greenville County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2017-CP 23-01888 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-7104789), filed by Life Insurance Company of North America.(abuc) |
|
Att: 1 State Court Documents, | ||
Att: 2 Filed Stipulation of Dismissal of Lowe's Companies, Inc. Without Prejudice, | ||
Att: 3 Notice of Filing Removal to the United States District Court of South Carolina |