Bland v. Bank of America NA
Wisconsin Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Pamela Pepper |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00536 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:2201 Injunction |
Case Filed: | Apr 14, 2017 |
Re-opened: | Jun 01, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 10, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 11, 2017 4:22 AM CDT |
Defendant
Bank of America NA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Defendant
Alan Wyskochil
|
|
Plaintiff
Mackray Bland
1920 W Melvina St
Milwaukee, WI 53206 |
Docket last updated: 33 minutes ago |
Monday, October 30, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Judgment
Mon 10/30 2:28 PM
JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk and approved by Judge Pamela Pepper on 10/30/2017. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Mackray Bland)(cb) |
|
18 | 18
7
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
Mon 10/30 2:26 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 10/30/2017.17 Judge Joseph's Report and Recommendations ADOPTED.14 Defendant Bank of America's MOTION to Dismiss GRANTED. Case DISMISSED for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Mackray Bland)(cb) |
|
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Report and Recommendations ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 10/10 11:23 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph re8 Amended Complaint filed by Mackray Bland,14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Bank of America NA. Case reassigned to Judge Pamela Pepper. (cc: all counsel, via US mail to Plaintiff)(blr) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Disclosure Statement
Mon 07/17 11:56 AM
DISCLOSURE Statement by Bank of America NA. |
|
15 | 15
respm
Brief in Support of Motion
Mon 07/17 11:55 AM
BRIEF in Support filed by Bank of America NA re14 MOTION to Dismiss . |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Foreclosure Judgment, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Note, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Mortgage, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Assignment of Mortgage, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Foreclosure Complaint, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F - State Court Order Substituting Plaintiff, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Plaintiff's State Court Affidavit, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H - Plaintiff's State Court Motion | ||
14 | 14
motion
Dismiss
Mon 07/17 11:50 AM
MOTION to Dismiss by Bank of America NA. |
|
13 | 13
misc
Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Mon 07/17 11:48 AM
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Bank of America NA. |
|
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice by Clerk to Counsel Re Consent to Magistrate
Mon 07/10 3:07 PM
NOTICE from the clerk to DEFENDANT; Bank of America NA requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed no later than 7/24/2017; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (asc) |
||
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 06/19 4:57 PM
ORDER GRANTING Defendant's11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's Answer is Due July 17, 2017. signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph on 6/19/2017 (cc: all counsel) (cc) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 06/19 4:37 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Bank of America NA. |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 06/19 4:35 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John R Remington on behalf of Bank of America NA. Attorney(s) appearing: John R. Remington |
|
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
utility
Copies Mailed
Fri 06/02 8:29 AM
Copy of9 Order sent via U.S. Mail to Plaintiff. (blr) |
||
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order
Thu 06/01 5:15 PM
ORDER VACATING Order Filed May 5, 2017 (Docket # 4) and Judgment Filed May 10, 2017. (Docket # 5) signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph on 6/1/2017. (cc: all counsel) (cc) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 05/30 4:04 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bank of America NA, Alan Wyskochil, John Doe filed by Mackray Bland.(blr) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
utility
Copies Mailed
Fri 05/19 8:42 AM
Copy of7 Order on Motion for Reconsideration sent via U.S. Mail to Plaintiff. (blr) |
||
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Reconsideration
Thu 05/18 4:20 PM
ORDER DENYING6 Motion for Reconsideration. signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph on 5/18/2017 (cc: all counsel) (cc) |
|
Wednesday, May 17, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Reconsideration
Wed 05/17 1:49 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration by Mackray Bland.(blr) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit - Copies of Certified Mortgage, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Judgment
Wed 05/10 2:31 PM
JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk approved by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. (cc: all counsel, via US mail to Plaintiff)(blr) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
utility
Copies Mailed
Mon 05/08 8:44 AM
Copy of4 Order sent via U.S. Mail to Plaintiff. (blr) |
||
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee
Fri 05/05 4:01 PM
ORDER DENYING as Moot Petitioner's2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph on 5/4/2017 (cc: all counsel) (cc) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Mon 04/17 3:04 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Mackray Bland. (blr) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee
Mon 04/17 3:03 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Mackray Bland. (blr) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Preliminary Injunction
Mon 04/17 3:02 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Mackray Bland. (blr) |