The Confederation of North, Central American and Caribbean Association Football v. Warner et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | William F Kuntz, II |
Referred: | Steven M Gold |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02304 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 25, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 14, 2017 5:16 AM EDT |
Defendant
Charles Blazer
|
|
Defendant
En Passant Inc.
|
|
Defendant
En Passant Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Multisport Games Development Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sportvertising (Cayman)
|
|
Defendant
Sportvertising (NY),
|
|
Defendant
Austin Jack Warner
|
|
Plaintiff
The Confederation of North, Central American and Caribbean Association Football
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 51 minutes ago |
Tuesday, February 11, 2020 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Tue 02/11 4:04 PM
ORDER finding as moot49 Motion for Attorney Fees. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 2/11/2020. (Helwig, Christopher) |