I DO LENDING, LLC (CON - LEAD CASE #17-50472)
Member Case
Lead case is: 3:17-bk-50472
Lead case is: 3:17-bk-50472
Nevada Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Hilary L Barnes |
Case #: | 3:17-bk-50476 |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | May 22, 2017 |
Claims Deadline: | Aug 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 25, 2023 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $0 to $50,000 |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
I DO LENDING, LLC
PO Box 7296
Reno, NV 89510-7296 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. TRUSTEE - RN - 11
300 BOOTH STREET, STE 3009
RENO, NV 89509 |
Docket last updated: 04/17/2017 5:00 PM PDT |
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
15
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition - Chapter 11
Tue 04/18 5:05 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1717. Filed by STEPHEN R HARRIS on behalf of I DO LENDING, LLC (HARRIS, STEPHEN) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing
Tue 04/18 5:06 PM
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Filed by STEPHEN R HARRIS on behalf of I DO LENDING, LLC (HARRIS, STEPHEN) |
|
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-docket of online payment
Tue 04/18 5:06 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-50476 [misc,volp11pb] (1717.00). Receipt number 17445873, fee amount $1717.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
4 | 4
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Non-Individual (BNC-auto assignment)
Tue 04/18 5:06 PM
|
|
6 | 6
utility
Set Deficient Filing Deadlines-11
Wed 04/19 8:23 AM
Set Deficient Filing Deadlines. Incomplete Filings due by 5/2/2017. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due by 5/2/2017. Schedule A/B due by 5/2/2017. Schedule D due by 5/2/2017.Schedule E/F due by 5/2/2017. Schedule G due by 5/2/2017. Schedule H due by 5/2/2017. Declaration Re: Schedules due by 5/2/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs due by 5/2/2017. (lms) |