Cleveland v. Smith & Nephew Inc
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Catherine C Blake |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01037 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 03, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 14, 2017 6:38 AM EDT |
Defendant
Smith & Nephew Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roy D Cleveland, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 03, 2023 | ||
691 | 691
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Wed 08/30 2:42 PM
Marginal ORDER APPROVING 4714 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Smith & Nephew Inc.; Roy D Cleveland, Jr terminated. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 8/3/2023. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB, 1:17-cv-01037-CCB (hmls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Wednesday, August 02, 2023 | ||
690 | 690
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 08/02 8:39 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Smith & Nephew Inc.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB, 1:17-cv-01037-CC |