Viner v. Smith & Nephew Inc.
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Catherine C Blake |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01040 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 01, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday Oct 15, 2017 5:01 AM EDT |
Defendant
Smith & Nephew Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carol A. Viner
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 01, 2023 | ||
696 | 696
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Thu 08/10 10:45 AM
MARGINAL ORDER APPROVING 4555 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Smith & Nephew Inc.; Carol A. Viner terminated. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 8/1/2023. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB, 1:17-cv-01040-CCB(slss, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Friday, July 28, 2023 | ||
695 | 695
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 07/28 10:07 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Smith & Nephew Inc.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB, 1:17-cv-01040-CC |