Barksdale et al v. Smith & Nephew Inc
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Catherine C Blake |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01042 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 14, 2017 6:27 AM EDT |
Defendant
Smith & Nephew Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Grant H Barksdale
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Katie Barksdale
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, August 02, 2023 | ||
686 | 686
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Fri 09/01 3:51 PM
MARGINAL ORDER approving685 Stipulation of Dismissal filed in 1:17-cv-01042-CCB, and 4685 Stipulation of Dismissal filed in 1:17-md-02775-CCB; Grant H Barksdale and Katie Barksdale terminated. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 8/2/2023. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB, 1:17-cv-01042-CCB(jf3s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Tuesday, August 01, 2023 | ||
685 | 685
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 08/01 10:55 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Smith & Nephew Inc.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB, 1:17-cv-01042-CC |