Tatosian et al v. Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Catherine C Blake |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01045 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 01, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 14, 2017 6:06 AM EDT |
Defendant
Smith & Nephew Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Irina Tatosian
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mike Tatosian
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 01, 2023 | ||
695 | 695
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Tue 08/08 11:33 AM
MARGINAL ORDER APPROVING 4540 STIPULATION of Dismissal filed by Smith & Nephew Inc., Mike Tatosian (CCB 17-1045 , Mike Tatosian, Irina Tatosian (CCB 17-1045 and Irina Tatosian terminated. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 8/1/2023. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB, 1:17-cv-01045-CCB(kb3s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Thursday, July 27, 2023 | ||
694 | 694
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 07/27 3:48 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Smith & Nephew Inc.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB, 1:17-cv-01045-CC |