O'Briant v. Rhodes et al
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | J Frederick Motz |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01050 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 24, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 14, 2017 6:32 AM EDT |
Defendant
Carol M. Glace
|
|
Defendant
Monica Jackson
|
|
Defendant
Rosemarie Rhodes
|
|
Plaintiff
Phillip O'Briant
433 Drew Street
Baltimore, MD 21224 |
GPO
Apr 24 2017
MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 4/24/2017. (c/m 4/24/17 bas, Deputy Clerk) |
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 04/24 3:59 PM
ORDER Granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Dismissing Complaint. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 4/24/2017. (bas, Deputy Clerk) |
|
3 | 3
order
Memorandum Opinion
Mon 04/24 3:57 PM
MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 4/24/2017. (c/m 4/24/17 bas, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 04/18 8:18 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Phillip O'Briant(bas, Deputy Clerk) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/18 8:16 AM
COMPLAINT against Carol M. Glace, Monica Jackson, Rosemarie Rhodes, filed by Phillip O'Briant.(bas, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 10 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 11 Proposed Summons | ||
misc
Jury Demand
Tue 04/18 8:17 AM
Jury Trial Demand by Phillip O'Briant(bas, Deputy Clerk) |