Williams v. USA - 2255
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Catherine C Blake |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01054 |
Nature of Suit | 510 Prisoner Petitions - Motions to Vacate Sentence |
Cause | 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 18, 2020 |
Petitioner
Charlie Williams
|
|
Respondent
USA - 2255
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, February 18, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 02/18 12:47 PM
ORDER denying MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 by Charlie Williams. (Civil Action CCB 17-1054 and granting as to the right to file a belated direct appeal. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 2/18/2020. (c/m 2/18/2020) (krs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Memorandum Opinion
Tue 02/18 12:45 PM
MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 2/18/2020. (krs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Monday, December 17, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Transcript
Mon 12/17 2:12 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/9/18, before Judge Blake. Court Reporter/Transcriber Douglas J. Zweizig, Telephone number 410-962-4474. Total number of pages filed: 22. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/7/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/17/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/18/2019.(dz, Court Reporter) |
|
Thursday, November 08, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Transcript
Thu 11/08 7:13 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 6/15/18, before Judge Blake. Court Reporter/Transcriber Douglas J. Zweizig, Telephone number 410-962-4474. Total number of pages filed: 46. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/29/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/10/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/6/2019.(dz, Court Reporter) |
|
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 11/17 10:17 AM
ORDER DENYING and DISMISSING all claims re: 271 Motion to Vacate (2255) as to Charlie Williams (5), except the claim that he directed defense counsel to file an appeal; DIRECTING new counsel be appointed for purposes of an evidentiary hearing. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 11/16/2017. (c/m 11/17/2017)(hmls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
2 | 2
2
pgs
order
Memorandum Opinion
Fri 11/17 10:12 AM
MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 11/16/2017. (c/m 11/17/2017)(hmls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
utility
Remark 2255
Tue 04/18 9:18 AM
PLEASE DO NOT ELECTRONICALLY FILE IN THIS CASE. ALL SUBSEQUENT DOCUMENTS ARE TO BE ELECTRONICALLY FILED IN CRIMINAL CASE CCB 14-0385 ONLY THE CLOSING ORDER SHOULD BE FILED IN THIS CASE. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support |