Williams v. State of Maryland et al
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Ellen L Hollander |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01058 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983pr Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 21, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 04/24 1:41 PM
ORDER Granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Dismissing case without prejudice. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 4/21/2017. (bas, Deputy Clerk) |
|
3 | 3
order
Memorandum Opinion
Mon 04/24 11:49 AM
MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 4/21/2017. (c/m 4/24/17 bas, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 04/18 10:03 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Colin B. Williams, Jr(bas, Deputy Clerk) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/18 10:02 AM
COMPLAINT against Baltimore County Department of Corrections, State of Maryland, filed by Colin B. Williams, Jr.(bas, Deputy Clerk) |