Gillie v. USA - 2255
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | James K Bredar |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01059 |
Nature of Suit | 510 Prisoner Petitions - Motions to Vacate Sentence |
Cause | 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 18, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
order
Order
Fri 08/18 1:47 PM
ORDER Denying 27 Motion for Appointment of Counsel Pursuant to the Criminal Justice Act, Title 18, U.S.C. §3006A(a)(1)(C) and/or Motion to Hold Filing in Abeyance or Motion to Stay and Motion for 2255 (JKB 06-cr-0211). Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 8/18/2017. (c/m 8/18/17 bas, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
utility
Remark 2255
Tue 04/18 10:51 AM
PLEASE DO NOT ELECTRONICALLY FILE IN THIS CASE. ALL SUBSEQUENT DOCUMENTS ARE TO BE ELECTRONICALLY FILED IN CRIMINAL CASE JKB 06-0211 ONLY THE CLOSING ORDER SHOULD BE FILED IN THIS CASE. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) |