Board of Trustees v. MCM Management et al
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Ellen L Hollander |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01062 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1145 E.R.I.S.A. |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 24, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Oct 15, 2017 5:26 AM EDT |
Defendant
David Mardigian
35980 Woodward Avenue Suite 210
Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304 |
|
Defendant
MCM Management Corporation
|
|
Plaintiff
Board of Trustees of the International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 37 Benefit Funds
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 24, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 08/24 3:28 PM
MARGINAL ORDER approving8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 8/24/2017. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 08/24 2:11 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Board of Trustees of the International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 37 Benefit Funds (Singleton, John) |
|
Wednesday, August 23, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order
Wed 08/23 8:55 AM
ORDER directing Plaintiff to file a motion for clerk's entry of default; and directing Plaintiff to show cause for its failure to comply with the Court's Order of 7/26/17. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 8/23/2017. (c/m 8/23/17 bmhs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order
Wed 07/26 12:32 PM
ORDER setting deadline for Plaintiff to file a motion for clerk's entry of default as to both defendants, or show cause why such action is not appropriate. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 7/26/2017. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/m 7/26/17-das) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 05/15 2:36 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Board of Trustees of the International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 37 Benefit Funds. MCM Management Corporation served on 4/25/2017, answer due 5/16/2017.(Singleton, John) |
|
Att: 1 Receipt | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 05/15 2:29 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Board of Trustees of the International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 37 Benefit Funds. David Mardigian served on 4/24/2017, answer due 5/15/2017.(Singleton, John) |
|
Att: 1 Receipt | ||
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/19 9:45 AM
Summons Issued 21 days as to MCM Management Corporation, David Mardigian.(ko, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 04/18 2:58 PM
NOTICE by Board of Trustees, Operating Engineers Local 37 Benefit Fund Summons (Singleton, John) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/18 12:07 PM
COMPLAINT against MCM Management Corp., David Mardigian ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-6612185.), filed by Board of Trustees, Operating Engineers Local 37 Benefit Fund.(Singleton, John) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B |