White et al v. Zebroski
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | A David Copperthite |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01063 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Torts |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 28, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Oct 15, 2017 5:37 AM EDT |
Consol Plaintiff
Juanita White
545 Park Avenue, Apt. 4M
East Orange, NJ 07017 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jacob Zebroski
20215 Misty View Lane, P.O. Box 18
Rohrersville, MD 21779 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bruce White
220 Prospect Street Apt. B11B
East Orange, NJ 07017 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Tuesday, October 02, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 10/02 10:24 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Jacob Zebroski(Kozlowski, Mark) |
|
Tuesday, August 28, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
order
Settlement Order
Tue 08/28 10:57 AM
SETTLEMENT ORDER DISMISSING case with each party to bear its own costs unless otherwise agreed without prejudice to the right of a party to move for good cause to reopen this action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 8/28/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01063-ADC, 1:17-cv-01066-ADC (jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Friday, July 27, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order for Settlement Conference
Fri 07/27 3:54 PM
ORDER Cancelling Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 7/27/2018. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Monday, April 16, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
3
pgs
order
Order for Settlement Conference
Mon 04/16 2:49 PM
ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 4/16/2018. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Monday, April 09, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Mon 04/09 2:02 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner for Settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 4/9/2018. (cags, Deputy Clerk) |
|
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/09 1:13 PM
ORDER Granting13 Request for Extension of Discovery Deadline filed by Jacob Zebroski; Status Report due 6/15/18. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 4/9/2018. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
13 | 13
corresp
Status Report Submitted
Mon 04/09 12:06 PM
Status Report Submitted by Jacob Zebroski (Kozlowski, Mark) |
|
Tuesday, January 23, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 01/23 4:00 PM
MARGINAL ORDER Approving11 Request for Extension of Time filed by Juanita White, Bruce White. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 1/23/2018. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
11 | 11
corresp
Extension of Time - requesting
Tue 01/23 3:00 PM
Joint REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01066-ADC, 1:17-cv-01063-ADC(Finnegan, Kevin) |
|
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
QC Notice - Miscellaneous
Tue 11/14 11:56 AM
QC NOTICE:9 NOTICE RE: EXPERT WITNESSES filed by Juanita White, Bruce White was filed incorrectly. **Local Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures should not be filed with the court. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 11/13 7:39 AM
NOTICE by Bruce White, Juanita White RE: EXPERT WITNESSES (Finnegan, Kevin) |
|
Wednesday, September 06, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 09/06 2:29 PM
Marginal ORDER APPROVING 14 Correspondence re: Scheduling Order 17-1066 . Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 9/6/2017. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases
Wed 09/06 2:17 PM
ORDER GRANTING 15 Motion to Consolidate Cases 1:17-cv-01066-ADC with 1:17-cv-01063-ADC for all purposes. The Court's Scheduling Order in 17-1063 will control both cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 9/6/2017. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01066-ADC, 1:17-cv-01063-ADC(hmls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
minutes
Status Conference
Thu 08/17 10:05 AM
Telephone Status Conference held on 8/17/2017 before Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Wed 08/16 3:13 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite for all Proceedings. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 8/16/2017 (cags, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
corresp
Magistrate Judge - consent to
Tue 08/15 12:59 PM
Consent to Magistrate Judge (Finnegan, Kevin) |
|
4 | 4
corresp
Magistrate Judge - consent to
Tue 08/15 11:15 AM
Consent to Magistrate Judge (Kozlowski, Mark) |
|
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 07/26 2:58 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Jacob Zebroski.(Kozlowski, Mark) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/19 8:23 AM
Summons Issued 21 days as to Jacob Zebroski.(jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/18 1:29 PM
COMPLAINT against Bruce White ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-6612405.), filed by Bruce White.(Finnegan, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons |