Masoud v. Linen Outlet et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Allyne R Ross |
Referred: | Sanket J Bulsara |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02315 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 11, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Oct 15, 2017 5:17 AM EDT |
Defendant
Basaam Khalil
|
|
Defendant
Linen Outlet
|
|
Plaintiff
Omar Masoud
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 33 minutes ago |
Monday, April 16, 2018 | ||
utility
Transfer Case Opened
Mon 04/16 8:11 AM
Case transferred from New York Eastern has been opened in Southern District of New York as case 1:18-cv-03249, filed 04/13/2018. (Lee, Tiffeny) |
||
Wednesday, April 11, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order(Other) Case Transferred Out - District Transfer
Wed 04/11 9:15 AM
ORDER TO TRANSFER VENUE dated 4/10/18, this matter has been mistakenly venued in the Eastern District of New York. Case transferred to District of Southern District of New York. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. ( Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 4/10/2018 ) (Guzzi, Roseann) |
|
Monday, April 09, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Response to Order to Show Cause
Mon 04/09 1:29 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Omar Masoud (Jaffe, Jodi) |
|
Thursday, April 05, 2018 | ||
order
Order(Other) ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 04/05 12:21 PM
ORDER: Pursuant to the federal venue statute 28 USC 1391, a civil action may be brought in, among other places, a judicial district in which any defendant resides or in which a substantial part of the events giving rise to the claim occurred. The Complaint alleges that Plaintiff was working in a Bronx retail store, namely at Defendant Linen Outlet, whose address is in the Bronx. There is no allegation about the residence of the individual defendant, Basaam Khalil, who is the owner of the corporation based in the Bronx. Thus it appears that both the events relevant to this case and Defendants's residence is in the Southern District of New York. Plaintiff is ordered to show cause by 4/9/2018 why venue is proper in the Eastern District of New York and why this case should not be transferred to the Southern District of New York. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 4/5/2018. (Cardenas, Alex) |
||
Friday, December 01, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Default Judgment
Fri 12/01 2:27 PM
First MOTION for Default Judgment Linen Outlet, Basaam Khalil by Omar Masoud. Responses due by 12/8/2017 (Jaffe, Jodi) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Motion, | ||
Att: 2 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 3 Affidavit Jodi Jaffe, Esq., | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Proof of Service, | ||
Att: 5 Affidavit Damages, Omar Masoud, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Clerk's Default, | ||
Att: 7 Affidavit Attorneys Fees and Costs, | ||
Att: 8 Proposed Judgment | ||
order
Order Referring Motion
Fri 12/01 2:38 PM
ORDER REFERRING MOTION:12 First MOTION for Default Judgment Linen Outlet, Basaam Khalil filed by Omar Masoud. Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 12/1/2017. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. (Moldovan, Jessica) |
||
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
order
Status Report Order
Wed 11/29 8:07 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: Plaintiff obtained a certificate of default against Defendant on 10/18/2017, but has not indicated whether he intends to move for default judgment or otherwise communicated with the court since that date. Accordingly, Plaintiff is directed to file a status report on or before 12/13/2017 indicating how he intends to proceed in this case. SO Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 11/29/2017. (Cardenas, Alex) |
||
Wednesday, October 25, 2017 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 10/25 4:24 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Mahoney, Brenna) |
||
Wednesday, October 18, 2017 | ||
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Wed 10/18 3:00 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Linen Outlet has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Linen Outlet is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Poveda, J.) |
||
Friday, September 08, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice(Other)
Fri 09/08 9:56 AM
NOTICE by Omar Masoud of Filing Second Amended Proof of Service (Jaffe, Jodi) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service Linen Outlet | ||
order
Order(Other)
Fri 09/08 9:32 AM
ORDER: Any forthcoming motion for a default judgment is respectfully referred to Judge Levy pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B). Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 9/8/2017. (Moldovan, Jessica) |
||
Thursday, September 07, 2017 | ||
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Thu 09/07 10:45 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that Defendant Basaam Khalil has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of Defendant Basaam Khalil is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Hamilton, Janet) |
||
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice(Other)
Thu 06/08 12:43 PM
NOTICE by Omar Masoud of filing Amended Proof of Service (Jaffe, Jodi) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service Amended, Linen Outlet, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit of Service Amended Bassam Khalil | ||
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Request for Certificate of Default
Wed 06/07 4:45 PM
Request for Certificate of Default by Omar Masoud (Jaffe, Jodi) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice(Other)
Wed 05/31 2:05 PM
NOTICE by Omar Masoud of Filing Proof of Service (Jaffe, Jodi) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service Linen Outlet, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit of Service Bhasam Khalil | ||
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 05/22 11:45 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Omar Masoud. Basaam Khalil served on 4/27/2017, answer due 5/18/2017. (Jaffe, Jodi) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service | ||
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Tue 04/18 1:16 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Tue 04/18 1:15 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/18 1:15 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
Att: 1 Kahlil summons | ||
3 | 3
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 04/18 10:30 AM
Proposed Summons. by Omar Masoud (Jaffe, Jodi) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 04/18 10:30 AM
Proposed Summons. by Omar Masoud (Jaffe, Jodi) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/18 10:27 AM
COMPLAINT against Basaam Khalil, Linen Outlet filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9456251 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Omar Masoud. (Jaffe, Jodi) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 04/18 1:12 PM
Case assigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) |