Trustees of the International Union of Operating Engineers Local 295 Welfare Fund and the Local 295 Pension Fund v. Queens Boulevard Extended Care Facility, Inc. et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Roslynn R Mauskopf |
Referred: | Cheryl L Pollak |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02316 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 27, 2020 |
Last checked: Sunday Oct 15, 2017 4:37 AM EDT |
Defendant
Queens Boulevard Extended Care Facility Management, LLC.
6111 Queens Boulevard
Woodside, NY 11377 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Queens Boulevard Extended Care Facility, Inc.
6111 Queens Boulevard
Woodside, NY 11377 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trustees of the International Union of Operating Engineers Local 295 Welfare Fund and the Local 295 Pension Fund
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Monday, January 27, 2020 | ||
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 01/27 12:08 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: Per the stipulation at49 , the action is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. Ordered by Chief Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 1/27/2020. (Taronji, Robert) |
||
Friday, January 24, 2020 | ||
49 | 49
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 01/24 4:30 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Trustees of the International Union of Operating Engineers Local 295 Welfare Fund and the Local 295 Pension Fund (Bauman, Michael) |
|
48 | 48
misc
Settlement Agreement
Fri 01/24 4:29 PM
SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT by Trustees of the International Union of Operating Engineers Local 295 Welfare Fund and the Local 295 Pension Fund (Bauman, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, January 15, 2020 | ||
minutes
Status Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines
Wed 01/15 10:41 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for Status Conference proceeding held before MJ Pollak on 1/15/2020. Appearance for Plaintiff: Michael Bauman. Appearance for Defendant: Jeffery Alan Meyer. Parties are to report on status by 1/24/2020 . (Caggiano, Diana) |
||
Tuesday, January 14, 2020 | ||
47 | 47
misc
Status Report
Tue 01/14 3:49 PM
STATUS REPORT by Queens Boulevard Extended Care Facility Management, LLC., Queens Boulevard Extended Care Facility, Inc. (Meyer, Jeffery) |
|
Tuesday, January 07, 2020 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 01/07 12:46 PM
ELECTRONIC SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties advised the Court that this case reached a settlement on October 22, 2019. The stipulation of discontinuance should have been filed by 11/22/2019. If the parties do not file the stipulation of discontinuance by 1/14/2020 , a status conference is set for 1/15/2020 @ 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 1/7/2020. (Caggiano, Diana) |
||
Tuesday, October 22, 2019 | ||
46 | 46
misc
Letter
Tue 10/22 4:55 PM
Letter to Judge Pollak re Settlement by Queens Boulevard Extended Care Facility Management, LLC., Queens Boulevard Extended Care Facility, Inc. (Meyer, Jeffery) |
|
order
Order(Other)
Tue 10/22 5:00 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER re46 Stipulation of discontinuance to be filed within 30 days - 11/22/2019 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 10/22/2019. (Caggiano, Diana) |
||
Sunday, September 22, 2019 | ||
order
Status Report Order
Sun 09/22 7:44 PM
ELECTRONIC STATUS REPORT ORDER: The parties are directed to provide a Stipulation of Dismissal or a Status Report to this Court within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Status Report due by 10/22/2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 9/22/2019. (Caggiano, Diana) |
||
Monday, August 05, 2019 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 08/05 8:36 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER re45 . Stipulation of dismissal or status report due by 8/26/2019 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 8/5/2019. (Zisa, Marie) |
||
Friday, August 02, 2019 | ||
45 | 45
misc
Status Report
Fri 08/02 2:17 PM
STATUS REPORT by Trustees of the International Union of Operating Engineers Local 295 Welfare Fund and the Local 295 Pension Fund (Bauman, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, July 09, 2019 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 07/09 11:37 AM
ELECTRONIC SCHEDULING ORDER re44 . Stipulation of dismissal or status report due by 7/19/2019 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 7/9/2019. (Zisa, Marie) |
||
Wednesday, July 03, 2019 | ||
44 | 44
misc
Status Report
Wed 07/03 1:38 PM
STATUS REPORT by Trustees of the International Union of Operating Engineers Local 295 Welfare Fund and the Local 295 Pension Fund (Bauman, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, June 18, 2019 | ||
43 | 43
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Tue 06/18 2:41 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation of Discontinuance or Further Status Report by Queens Boulevard Extended Care Facility Management, LLC., Queens Boulevard Extended Care Facility, Inc.. (Meyer, Jeffery) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Tue 06/18 2:50 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting43 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Stipulation of dismissal or status report due 7/2/2019 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 6/18/2019. (Zisa, Marie) |
||
Tuesday, June 04, 2019 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 06/04 10:42 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: re42 . Stipulation of dismissal or status report due 6/18/2019 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 6/4/2019. (Zisa, Marie) |
||
Monday, June 03, 2019 | ||
42 | 42
misc
Status Report
Mon 06/03 4:24 PM
STATUS REPORT by Trustees of the International Union of Operating Engineers Local 295 Welfare Fund and the Local 295 Pension Fund (Bauman, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, May 01, 2019 | ||
minutes
Settlement Conference
Wed 05/01 1:23 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for Settlement Conference proceeding held before MJ Pollak on 5/1/2019. Appearance for Plaintiff: Michael Bauman. Appearance for Defendant: Jeffery Alan Meyer. Settlement discussions continue. Report or Stip due 6/3/2019 . (Caggiano, Diana) |
||
Monday, April 01, 2019 | ||
41 | 41
motion
Adjourn Conference
Mon 04/01 1:14 PM
MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Trustees of the International Union of Operating Engineers Local 295 Welfare Fund and the Local 295 Pension Fund. (Bauman, Michael) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Mon 04/01 3:17 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting41 . The Court is not available on the dates suggested by the parties. Accordingly, the conference is adjourned to 5/1/2019 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Counsel are reminded that their clients must attend. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 4/1/2019. (Zisa, Marie) |
||
Tuesday, March 12, 2019 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 03/12 2:08 PM
ELECTRONIC SCHEDULING ORDER: A Settlement Conference is set for 4/10/2019 @ 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Counsel is required to bring their clients . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 3/12/2019. (Caggiano, Diana) |
||
Friday, February 22, 2019 | ||
minutes
Status Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines
Fri 02/22 10:43 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for Status Conference held on 2/22/2019 before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Appearance for plaintiff: Michael Bauman. Appearance for defendant: Jeffery Alan Meyer. Parties are given until March 8, 2019 to resolve issues relating to settlement documents and to file the Stipulation of Dismissal with the Court. If no stipulation is filed by March 8, the Court will schedule a conference and counsel will be required to bring their clients so that the Court can assist in resolving the issues. (Zisa, Marie) |
||
Thursday, February 14, 2019 | ||
40 | 40
misc
Status Report
Thu 02/14 5:54 PM
STATUS REPORT by Trustees of the International Union of Operating Engineers Local 295 Welfare Fund and the Local 295 Pension Fund (Bauman, Michael) |
|
Thursday, February 07, 2019 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Thu 02/07 10:48 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting39 . The Status Conference is adjourned to 2/22/2019 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. The parties are to submit a status report by 2/14/2019 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 2/7/2019. (Zisa, Marie) |
||
Wednesday, February 06, 2019 | ||
39 | 39
motion
Adjourn Conference
Wed 02/06 6:28 PM
First MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Trustees of the International Union of Operating Engineers Local 295 Welfare Fund and the Local 295 Pension Fund. (Bauman, Michael) |
|
Monday, February 04, 2019 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 02/04 12:19 PM
ELECTRONIC SCHEDULING ORDER: A Status Conference is set for 2/14/2019 @ 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 2/4/2019. (Caggiano, Diana) |
||
Friday, November 30, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Fri 11/30 8:41 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting38 . Stipulation to be filed by 12/14/2018 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 11/30/2018. (Zisa, Marie) |
||
Thursday, November 29, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Thu 11/29 5:00 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation of Discontinuance by Queens Boulevard Extended Care Facility Management, LLC., Queens Boulevard Extended Care Facility, Inc.. (Meyer, Jeffery) |
|
Friday, October 12, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
motion
Adjourn Conference
Fri 10/12 4:25 PM
Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Queens Boulevard Extended Care Facility Management, LLC., Queens Boulevard Extended Care Facility, Inc.. (Meyer, Jeffery) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference 1 - Terminate Hearings
Fri 10/12 5:18 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting37 Motion to Adjourn Conference. Conference adjourned sine die . Stipulation to be filed by 10/31/2018. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 10/12/2018. (Caggiano, Diana) |
||
Monday, September 24, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 09/24 1:53 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David Adam Tauster on behalf of Queens Boulevard Extended Care Facility Management, LLC., Queens Boulevard Extended Care Facility, Inc. (notification declined or already on case) (Tauster, David) |
|
Friday, August 24, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
misc
Letter
Fri 08/24 10:31 AM
Letter to Judge Pollak with Status Report by Queens Boulevard Extended Care Facility Management, LLC., Queens Boulevard Extended Care Facility, Inc. (Meyer, Jeffery) |
|
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 08/24 12:56 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: A Status Conference is set for 10/18/2018 @ 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 8/24/2018. (Caggiano, Diana) |
||
Friday, August 10, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Status Report
Fri 08/10 4:38 PM
STATUS REPORT by Trustees of the International Union of Operating Engineers Local 295 Welfare Fund and the Local 295 Pension Fund (Bauman, Michael) |
|
Monday, July 09, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
order
Status Report Order
Mon 07/09 12:28 PM
ENDORSED LETTER STATUS REPORT ORDER re32 Status Report due by 8/10/2018 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 7/9/2018. (Caggiano, Diana) |
|
Friday, July 06, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Status Report
Fri 07/06 5:41 PM
STATUS REPORT by Trustees of the International Union of Operating Engineers Local 295 Welfare Fund and the Local 295 Pension Fund (Bauman, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, June 06, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
order
Status Report Order
Wed 06/06 2:15 PM
ENDORSED LETTER STATUS REPORT ORDER re30 Status Report due by 7/6/2018 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 6/6/2018. (Caggiano, Diana) (Caggiano, Diana) |
|
Friday, June 01, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Status Report
Fri 06/01 3:33 PM
STATUS REPORT by Trustees of the International Union of Operating Engineers Local 295 Welfare Fund and the Local 295 Pension Fund (Bauman, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, May 09, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
minutes
Telephone Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines
Wed 05/09 6:56 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for Telephone Conference held before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 5/9/2018: Appearances: Michael Bauman for plaintiffs; Jeffery Meyer for defendants. Conference held. Parties discussing one last issue. Status Report due by 6/1/2018 . (Blase, Brendan) |
|
Tuesday, May 01, 2018 | ||
order
~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 05/01 3:32 PM
ELECTRONIC SCHEDULING ORDER re28 : A Telephone Conference is set for 5/9/2018 at 11:00 a.m. Counsel to contact the Court once all parties are on the line.So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 5/1/2018. (Rutbeck-Goldman, Ariela) |
||
Friday, April 27, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Status Report
Fri 04/27 6:00 PM
STATUS REPORT by Trustees of the International Union of Operating Engineers Local 295 Welfare Fund and the Local 295 Pension Fund (Bauman, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, March 27, 2018 | ||
order
Status Report Order
Tue 03/27 10:39 AM
ELECTRONIC STATUS REPORT ORDER re27 : Status Report due by 4/27/2018 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 3/27/2018. (Rutbeck-Goldman, Ariela) |
||
Friday, March 23, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Status Report
Fri 03/23 5:42 PM
STATUS REPORT by Trustees of the International Union of Operating Engineers Local 295 Welfare Fund and the Local 295 Pension Fund (Bauman, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, February 28, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
order
Status Report Order
Wed 02/28 12:18 PM
ENDORSED LETTER - STATUS REPORT ORDER re25 The parties are to submit a status report by 3/23/2018. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 2/28/2018. (Caggiano, Diana) |
|
Tuesday, February 27, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Status Report
Tue 02/27 2:59 PM
STATUS REPORT by Trustees of the International Union of Operating Engineers Local 295 Welfare Fund and the Local 295 Pension Fund (Bauman, Michael) |
|
Monday, January 29, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
minutes
Status Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines
Mon 01/29 4:15 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for Status Conference proceeding held before MJ Pollak on 1/29/2018. By 2/2/2018, defendant to provide review of audit. Status Report due by 2/27/2018 . (Caggiano, Diana) |
|
Wednesday, January 17, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Letter
Wed 01/17 12:25 PM
Letter by Trustees of the International Union of Operating Engineers Local 295 Welfare Fund and the Local 295 Pension Fund (Bauman, Michael) |
|
Thursday, December 07, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
minutes
Telephone Conference ~Util - Set Hearings
Thu 12/07 1:48 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for Telephone Conference proceeding held before MJ Pollak on 12/7/2017. Parties continuing audit review. Settlement Conference set for 1/29/2018 @ 4:00 PM. (Caggiano, Diana) |
|
Wednesday, December 06, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice of Hearing
Wed 12/06 11:35 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE: The telephone conference previously scheduled for 12/7/2017 @ 9:00 AM conference before MJ Pollak has been rescheduled to 12/7/2017 @ 11:00 AM. (NOTE: new time) (Caggiano, Diana) |
||
Friday, November 17, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
minutes
Telephone Conference ~Util - Set Hearings
Fri 11/17 3:05 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for Telephone Conference proceeding held before MJ Pollak on 11/17/2017. (Telephone) Status Conference set for 12/7/2017 @ 9:00 AM. Audit to be completed by then. (Caggiano, Diana) |
|
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Consent to Change Attorney
Fri 10/06 3:57 PM
NOTICE of Consent to Change Attorney by Jeffery Alan Meyer (Meyer, Jeffery) |
|
Tuesday, October 03, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
minutes
Telephone Conference ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 10/03 10:38 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for Telephone Conference held on 10/3/2017: Audit continues. Telephone Conference set for 11/17/2017 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. By October 13, 2017 counsel for defendant is Ordered to clarify who will be representing defendant. So Ordered by Pollak, U.S.M.J. (Blase, Brendan) |
|
Thursday, August 24, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 08/24 11:27 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting18 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney David Adam Tauster terminated. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 8/24/2017. (Caggiano, Diana) |
||
Wednesday, August 23, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 08/23 4:41 PM
Letter MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Queens Boulevard Extended Care Facility Management, LLC., Queens Boulevard Extended Care Facility, Inc.. (Tauster, David) |
|
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 08/21 1:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Cohen on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Cohen, Matthew) |
|
Thursday, July 13, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
minutes
Initial Conference Hearing ~Util - Set Hearings
Thu 07/13 1:22 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for Initial Conference proceeding held before MJ Pollak on 7/13/2017. Parties to exchange discovery requests by 8/18/17 - responses 9/18/17. Telephone Conference set for 10/3/2017 @ 10:00 AM. (Caggiano, Diana) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 06/12 5:33 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Queens Boulevard Extended Care Facility Management, LLC., Queens Boulevard Extended Care Facility, Inc.. (Meyer, Jeffery) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 06/12 5:31 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Queens Boulevard Extended Care Facility Management, LLC., Queens Boulevard Extended Care Facility, Inc. (Meyer, Jeffery) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 05/12 12:39 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 7/13/2017 @ 12:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 5/12/2017. (Caggiano, Diana) |
|
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 05/12 12:31 PM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply - 6/12/17. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 5/12/2017. (Caggiano, Diana) |
|
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 05/11 12:24 PM
Proposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint, /Stipulation Extending Defendants' time to answer, move, or otherwise respond by Queens Boulevard Extended Care Facility Management, LLC., Queens Boulevard Extended Care Facility, Inc.. (Meyer, Jeffery) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 05/11 12:21 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David Adam Tauster on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Tauster, David) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 05/11 12:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffery Alan Meyer on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Meyer, Jeffery) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 05/09 1:42 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the International Union of Operating Engineers Local 295 Welfare Fund and the Local 295 Pension Fund. Queens Boulevard Extended Care Facility Management, LLC. served on 5/1/2017, answer due 5/22/2017. (Bauman, Michael) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 05/09 1:40 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the International Union of Operating Engineers Local 295 Welfare Fund and the Local 295 Pension Fund. Queens Boulevard Extended Care Facility, Inc. served on 5/1/2017, answer due 5/22/2017. (Bauman, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 04/26 11:59 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the International Union of Operating Engineers Local 295 Welfare Fund and the Local 295 Pension Fund. Queens Boulevard Extended Care Facility Management, LLC. served on 4/21/2017, answer due 5/12/2017. (Bauman, Michael) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 04/26 11:57 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the International Union of Operating Engineers Local 295 Welfare Fund and the Local 295 Pension Fund. Queens Boulevard Extended Care Facility, Inc. served on 4/21/2017, answer due 5/12/2017. (Bauman, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/19 3:07 PM
Summons Issued as to Queens Boulevard Extended Care Facility Management, LLC., Queens Boulevard Extended Care Facility, Inc.. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Wed 04/19 3:05 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Wed 04/19 3:01 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 04/19 3:00 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf and Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) |
||
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/18 11:06 AM
COMPLAINT against Queens Boulevard Extended Care Facility Management, LLC., Queens Boulevard Extended Care Facility, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9456426 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Trustees of the International Union of Operating Engineers Local 295 Welfare Fund and the Local 295 Pension Fund. (Bauman, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons |