Burley v. Target Department Store, Inc.
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Carol Bagley Amon |
Referred: | Steven M Gold |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02317 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1446 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 31, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Oct 15, 2017 5:24 AM EDT |
Defendant
Target Department Store, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Diane Burley
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Wednesday, October 31, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 11/01 11:19 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: It is HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, pursuant to Rule 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by and between the undersigned, the attorneys of record for the plaintiff and defendants, Target Corporation i/s/h/a Target Department Store, Inc. and CentiMark Corporation in the above-titled action, that whereas no party hereto is an infant or incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of this action, that all claims asserted by and between the above-noted parties are hereby discontinued with prejudice without costs to any party as against the other.Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 10/31/2018. (Fernandez, Erica) |
|
32 | 32
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 10/31 1:15 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal (Voluntary) by Target Department Store, Inc. (Christman, Steven) |
|
Thursday, September 06, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
order
Stipulation and Order
Thu 09/06 11:39 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER of Voluntary Dismissal re: Claims between Defendants.Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 9/6/2018. (Fernandez, Erica) |
|
Friday, August 31, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
Fri 08/31 11:26 AM
ORDER: Granting30 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Steven M. Christman substitutes attorney Carmine Joseph Castellano for defendant Centimark Corporation. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 8/31/2018. (Gillespie, Saudia) |
||
Thursday, August 30, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
notice
Notice of Consent to Change Attorney
Thu 08/30 12:00 PM
NOTICE of Consent to Change Attorney by Steven Mark Christman (Christman, Steven) |
|
Wednesday, August 29, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Stipulation
Wed 08/29 1:28 PM
STIPULATION of Voluntary Dismissal Re: Claims Between Defendants by Target Department Store, Inc. (Christman, Steven) |
|
Thursday, August 02, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 08/02 4:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Pretter on behalf of Diane Burley (aty to be noticed) (Pretter, David) |
|
Monday, July 30, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Mon 07/30 12:00 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Target Department Store, Inc.. (Sandler, Jason) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Mon 07/30 3:25 PM
ORDER: Terminating27 , inadvertently filed as a Motion. The document is an updated letter of26 Motion for an Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, previously granted on 7/27/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 7/30/2018. (Gillespie, Saudia) |
||
Friday, July 27, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Fri 07/27 3:50 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Target Department Store, Inc.. (Sandler, Jason) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Fri 07/27 5:20 PM
ORDER: Granting26 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The following deadlines are extended: Fact discovery extended to October 12, 2018; plaintiff's expert disclosure extended to October 31, 2018; defendants' expert disclosures extended to November 30, 2018; expert discovery extended to February 15, 2019. The status/settlement conference previously scheduled for October 22, 2018 is adjourned to December 4, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 13D South before the undersigned. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 7/27/2018. (Gillespie, Saudia) |
||
Monday, April 23, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Mon 04/23 3:29 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Target Department Store, Inc.. (Sandler, Jason) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery 1 - Terminate Hearings
Mon 04/23 4:56 PM
ORDER: Granting25 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Plaintiff's expert disclosure deadline is extended to August 14, 2018; defendant's expert disclosure deadline is extended to September 14, 2018; expert discovery is extended to October 15, 2018. The settlement conference previously scheduled for May 7, 2018 is cancelled. The status conference previously scheduled for August 22, 2018 is adjourned and converted to a status/settlement conference at 10:00 a.m. on October 22, 2018 in Courtroom 13D South before the undersigned. The parties shall be prepared (1) to state their respective positions on settlement, with principals WITH FULL SETTLEMENT DECISION-MAKING AUTHORITY (UP TO THE AMOUNT LAST DEMANDED FOR DEFENDANTS, DOWN TO THE AMOUNT LAST OFFERED FOR PLAINTIFFS) PRESENT OR AVAILABLE BY TELEPHONE THROUGHOUT THE CONFERENCE, (2) to articulate the basis for any anticipated summary judgment motions and to be familiar with any premotion conference procedures required by the district judge presiding over the case, and (3) to state whether they will agree to assignment of this case to a magistrate judge for all purposes, including jury trial and entry of final judgment. Counsel are encouraged to file a written application requesting a settlement conference on an earlier date if they believe it might be productive to do so. The parties shall submit mediation statements, which may be filed on the docket ex parte, by October 17, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 4/23/2018. (Gillespie, Saudia) |
||
Monday, March 26, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
answer
Answer to Crossclaim
Mon 03/26 1:49 PM
ANSWER to23 Crossclaim by Centimark Corporation. (Castellano, Carmine) |
|
Friday, February 23, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
cmp
Crossclaim
Fri 02/23 12:38 PM
CROSSCLAIM CROSS-CLAIMS against Centimark Corporation, filed by Target Department Store, Inc.. (Sandler, Jason) |
|
Thursday, February 22, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Leave to File Document
Thu 02/22 2:51 PM
MOTION for Leave to File by Target Department Store, Inc.. (Sandler, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit STIPULATION TO ASSERT CROSS-CLAIMS, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit CROSS-CLAIMS AGAINST CENTIMARK CORPORATION | ||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Thu 02/22 5:15 PM
ORDER granting22 Motion for Leave to File. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 2/22/2018. (Gold, Steven) |
||
Thursday, January 11, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery ~Util - Set Hearings
Thu 01/11 10:33 AM
ORDER: Granting21 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Fact discovery is extended to May 15, 2018; plaintiff's expert disclosure deadline is extended to June 15, 2018; defendant's expert disclosure deadline is extended to July 16, 2018; expert discovery is extended to August 15, 2018. The settlement conference previously scheduled for March 7, 2018 is adjourned to May 7, 2018 at 2:30 PM and the status conference previously scheduled for June 22, 2018 is adjourned to August 22, 2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 13D South before the undersigned. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 1/11/2018. (Gillespie, Saudia) |
||
Wednesday, January 10, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Wed 01/10 3:10 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Target Department Store, Inc.. (Sandler, Jason) |
|
Tuesday, January 02, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Tue 01/02 2:34 PM
ANSWER to13 Amended Complaint, Amended Crossclaim,12 Amended Complaint , ANSWER to13 Amended Complaint, Amended Crossclaim,12 Amended Complaint by Target Department Store, Inc.. (Christman, Steven) |
|
Friday, December 22, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
answer
Answer to Crossclaim
Fri 12/22 2:48 PM
ANSWER to17 Answer to Amended Complaint, Crossclaim by Target Department Store, Inc.. (Christman, Steven) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 12/22 12:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Samuel Sandler on behalf of Target Department Store, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Sandler, Jason) |
|
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint Crossclaim
Tue 12/19 4:40 PM
ANSWER to13 Amended Complaint, Amended Crossclaim , CROSSCLAIM against Target Department Store, Inc. by Centimark Corporation. (Castellano, Carmine) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 12/19 4:18 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Centimark Corporation (Castellano, Carmine) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 12/19 4:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Carmine Joseph Castellano on behalf of Centimark Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Castellano, Carmine) |
|
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
service
Summons Issued
Tue 11/14 10:37 AM
Summons Issued re Amended Complaint as to Centimark Corporation. (Lee, Tiffeny) |
|
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
cmp
Amended Complaint Amended Crossclaim(Document only)
Mon 11/13 2:54 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, AMENDED CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants, filed by Diane Burley. (Markovits, Thomas) |
|
Friday, November 10, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 11/10 4:14 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Diane Burley. (Markovits, Thomas) |
|
Wednesday, October 25, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 10/25 3:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Adam C Calvert on behalf of Target Department Store, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Calvert, Adam) |
|
Monday, October 16, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend ~Util - Set Hearings
Mon 10/16 2:00 PM
ORDER: Granting10 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend. The parties may amend the pleadings up to and including November 15, 2017. THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE PREVIOUSLY SCHEDULED FOR FEBRUARY 7, 2018 IS ADJOURNED TO MARCH 7, 2018 AT 2:00 PM in Courtroom 13D South before the undersigned. The parties shall submit mediation statements, which may be filed on the docket ex parte, by February 28, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 10/16/2017. (Gillespie, Saudia) |
||
Monday, October 09, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to Amend
Mon 10/09 3:24 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Pleadings of both parties by Target Department Store, Inc.. (Matar, Stephanie) |
|
Friday, September 29, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Letter
Fri 09/29 11:03 AM
Letter Re: Dispute Resolution Strategy by Target Department Store, Inc. (Matar, Stephanie) |
|
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 09/29 1:53 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person settlement conference will be held at 2:30 p.m. on February 7, 2018 before the undersigned in Courtroom 13-D South. Principals with full settlement decision-making authority shall be present. The parties shall submit mediation statements, which may be filed on the docket ex parte, by January 31, 2017. Counsel shall be prepared to schedule all remaining discovery and anticipated motion practice if the case cannot be settled at that time. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 9/29/2017. (Gillespie, Saudia) |
||
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
minutes
Initial Conference Hearing ~Util - Set Hearings
Thu 08/17 12:43 PM
Minute Entry: Initial Conference Hearing held on 8/16/2017 before Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Pretter for plaintiff, Matar for defendant. The case management schedule proposed by the parties, calling among other things for Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures to be completed by September 1, 2017; fact discovery to be completed by March 15, 2018; plaintiff's expert reports to be disclosed by April 15, 2018; defendant's expert reports to be disclosed by May 15, 2018; and expert discovery to be completed by June 15, 2018, is approved. THE PARTIES WILL SUBMIT A LETTER BY OCTOBER 1, 2017, INDICATING WHETHER THEY SEEK COURT-ANNEXED MEDIATION OR A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WITH THE COURT. If the parties seek a settlement conference with the Court, the letter shall state when during the course of discovery they suggest the conference be held. THE COURT WILL HOLD A FURTHER CONFERENCE AT 10:00 AM ON JUNE 22, 2018. The parties shall be prepared (1) to state their respective positions on settlement, with principals WITH FULL SETTLEMENT DECISION-MAKING AUTHORITY (UP TO THE AMOUNT LAST DEMANDED FOR DEFENDANTS, DOWN TO THE AMOUNT LAST OFFERED FOR PLAINTIFFS) PRESENT OR AVAILABLE BY TELEPHONE THROUGHOUT THE CONFERENCE, (2) to articulate the basis for any anticipated summary judgment motions and to be familiar with any premotion conference procedures required by the district judge presiding over the case, and (3) to state whether they will agree to assignment of this case to a magistrate judge for all purposes, including jury trial and entry of final judgment. (Gillespie, Saudia) |
|
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 08/01 12:03 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 11:30 a.m. on August 16, 2017 before the undersigned in Courtroom 13-D South. Counsel for all parties must attend. Counsel for plaintiff is directed to immediately confirm this conference date and time with defendant's counsel. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 8/1/2017. (Gillespie, Saudia) |
|
Att: 1 Chambers Individual Rules | ||
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Jury Demand
Tue 04/25 2:09 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Diane Burley (Markovits, Thomas) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Tue 04/25 10:52 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Tue 04/25 10:52 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 04/25 10:51 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Carol Bagley Amon and Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) |
||
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/19 12:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Mark Christman on behalf of Target Department Store, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Christman, Steven) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 04/18 11:20 AM
Civil Cover Sheet.. Re1 Notice of Removal, by Target Department Store, Inc. (Matar, Stephanie) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 04/18 11:14 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Target Department Store, Inc. (After Remand) from Supreme Court, Kings County, case number 512616/2016. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0207-9456502) (Matar, Stephanie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Summons & Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Verified Answer, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit CPLR 3017(c) Demand, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Summary Order of Remand, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Response to CPLR 3017(c) Demand, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Corporate Status |