9
|
|
9
order
Judgment - Clerk
Thu 06/15 4:57 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT: ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the action is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs, expenses, and fees. Ordered by Janet Hamilton, Deputy Clerk on behalf of Douglas C. Palmer, Clerk of Court on 6/15/2017. (Tavarez, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 06/15 3:12 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice . *Forwarded for Judgment.So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 6/12/2017. (Tavarez, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 06/12 5:10 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice, for the Court's endorsement by James B. Comey, John F Kelly, James McCament, Gregory A. Richardson, Jeff Sessions (Marutollo, Joseph)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/26 9:30 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Anthony Marutollo on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Marutollo, Joseph)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 04/21 2:16 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Xiumin Zhang. John F Kelly served on 4/21/2017, answer due 5/12/2017. (Rahman, Meer)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Thu 04/20 4:12 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Thu 04/20 4:10 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Thu 04/20 4:10 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/18 1:39 PM
COMPLAINT FOR MANDAMUS against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9457289 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Xiumin Zhang. (Rahman, Meer)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Appendix,
|
| |
Att: 2
Proposed Summons,
|
| |
Att: 3
Civil Cover Sheet
|
|
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 04/20 4:04 PM
Case assigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) Modified on 4/20/2017 (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
|