OTC Outlet, Inc. v. Zoetis, Inc. et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Kiyo A Matsumoto |
Referred: | Roanne L Mann |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02332 |
Nature of Suit | 380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 31, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Oct 15, 2017 4:31 AM EDT |
Defendant
Zoetis Belgium S.A.
|
|
Defendant
Zoetis, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
OTC Outlet, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, January 31, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 02/01 3:00 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE, That this action is voluntarily dismissed pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(a) against Defts Zoetis Inc. and Zoetis Belgium S.A. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close this case. (Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 1/31/18) (Galeano, Sonia) |
|
Tuesday, January 30, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 01/30 5:50 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by OTC Outlet, Inc. (Steinmetz, Michael) |
|
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
service
Certificate of Service
Fri 01/19 5:56 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zoetis, Inc. for Defendant Zoetis Inc.'s Notice of Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint and Supporting Documents (Jarrett, Bonnie) |
|
Wednesday, January 03, 2018 | ||
minutes
Pre Motion Conference Telephone Conference
Wed 01/03 4:55 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto:Telephonic Pre-Motion Conference held on 1/3/2018. Apearances: for plaintiff, Michael Steinmetz, Esq.; for defendant Zoetis Inc., Bonnie Jarrett, Esq. and Jacob Victor, Esq. Defendant Zoetis Belgium S.A. did not appear. Defendant Zoetis Inc.'s proposed motion to dismiss was discussed and defendant Zoetis Inc. was granted leave to file such motion. Plaintiff requested, and was granted, leave to file a motion for an extension of time to serve foreign defendant Zoetis Belgium S.A. The court set the following briefing schedule: on or before January 18, 2017, defendant Zoetis Inc. shall serve its motion to dismiss on plaintiff; on or before February 1, 2018 plaintiff shall serve its response to the motion to dismiss and its motion for an extension of time to serve defendant Zoetis Belgium S.A. on defendant Zoetis, Inc.; on or before February 8, 2018 , defendant Zoetis Inc. shall serve its reply regarding its motion to dismiss and its opposition to plaintiff's motion to extend time on plaintiff; and on or before February 15, 2018 , plaintiff shall serve its reply regarding its motion to extend time on defendant Zoetis Inc. The court instructed the parties to file all motion papers via ECF, and to provide the court with two courtesy copies of all papers, on the date plaintiff serves its reply regarding its motion to extend time. (Flores, Diego) |
||
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
order
Order(Other)
Thu 12/14 10:34 AM
ORDER re21 Letter Motion for Pre Motion Conference filed by Zoetis, Inc.,22 Response filed by OTC Outlet, Inc., and Orders on Motion for Pre Motion Conference dated November 3, 2017, November 7, 2017, and November 27, 2017. Due to the court's trial schedule, the premotion conference regarding defendant Zoetis, Inc.'s proposed motion to dismiss, which was previously scheduled for December 19, 2017 at 2:00 p.m., will be held on Wednesday, January 3, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. Counsel for defendant Zoetis Inc. shall coordinate a conference call between all parties and dial into the court (718-613-2180) when all parties are on the line. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 12/14/2017. (Flores, Diego) |
||
Monday, November 27, 2017 | ||
order
Order(Other)
Mon 11/27 8:16 PM
ORDER re21 Letter Motion for Pre Motion Conference filed by Zoetis, Inc.,22 Response filed by OTC Outlet, Inc., and Orders on Motion for Pre Motion Conference dated November 3, 2017 and November 7, 2017. Due to the court's trial schedule, the premotion conference regarding defendant Zoetis, Inc.'s proposed motion to dismiss, which was previously scheduled for December 5, 2017 at 2:00 p.m., will be held on Tuesday, December 19, 2017 at 2:00 p.m. Counsel for defendant Zoetis Inc. shall coordinate a conference call between all parties and dial into the court (718-613-2180) when all parties are on the line. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 11/27/2017. (Flores, Diego) |
||
Tuesday, November 07, 2017 | ||
order
Order(Other)
Tue 11/07 12:19 PM
ORDER re21 Letter Motion for Pre Motion Conference filed by Zoetis, Inc.,22 Response filed by OTC Outlet, Inc., and Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference dated November 3, 2017. Due to a conflict, the premotion conference regarding defendant Zoetis, Inc.'s proposed motion to dismiss, which was previously scheduled for November 13, 2017 at 6:00 p.m., will be held on Tuesday, December 5, 2017 at 2:00 p.m. Counsel for defendant Zoetis Inc. shall coordinate a conference call between all parties and dial into the court (718-613-2180) when all parties are on the line. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 11/7/2017. (Flores, Diego) |
||
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference
Fri 11/03 11:50 AM
ORDER granting21 Defendant Zoetis Inc.'s Request for Pre Motion Conference. A telephonic premotion conference concerning defendant Zoetis Inc.'s proposed motion to dismiss shall be held on Monday, November 13, 2017 at 6:00 p.m. Counsel for defendant Zoetis Inc. shall coordinate a conference call between all parties and dial into the court (718-613-2180) when all parties are on the line. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 11/3/2017. (Flores, Diego) |
||
Wednesday, November 01, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
respm
Response to Motion
Wed 11/01 6:43 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re21 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re Proposed Motion to Dismiss filed by OTC Outlet, Inc.. (Kehrli, Kevin) |
|
Friday, October 27, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Pre Motion Conference
Fri 10/27 5:33 PM
Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re Proposed Motion to Dismiss by Zoetis, Inc.. (Jarrett, Bonnie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Thursday, October 19, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order(Other)
Thu 10/19 5:01 PM
ORDER re:19 Settlement Recommendation. All parties have now responded to the Court's settlement proposal. Unfortunately, there is no settlement. Parties should comply with all deadlines previously set by the Court. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 10/19/2017. (Godoy-Dalmau, Gabriel) |
|
Wednesday, October 18, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
minutes
Settlement Conference
Wed 10/18 1:25 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann: Settlement Conference held on 10/18/2017. The parties are directed to respond to the Court's settlement proposal by October 19, 2017. (Kelson, Lise) |
|
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 10/10 9:55 AM
ORDER granting18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. On consent of the parties, and in light of the settlement conference scheduled before Chief Magistrate Judge Mann, defendants' time to answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint is extended to October 27, 2017 . Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 10/10/2017. (Newman, Alanna) |
||
Monday, October 09, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 10/09 4:55 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re17 Amended Complaint by Zoetis, Inc.. (Jarrett, Bonnie) |
|
Thursday, September 28, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 09/28 6:53 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Zoetis Belgium S.A., Zoetis, Inc., filed by OTC Outlet, Inc.. (Kehrli, Kevin) |
|
Friday, September 08, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Letter
Fri 09/08 1:43 PM
Letter response to letter request by Defendant to file a motion to dismiss by OTC Outlet, Inc. (Steinmetz, Michael) |
|
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 09/08 12:38 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Due to a conflict, the telephonic pre-motion conference scheduled for today will be held at 2:30 p.m. Counsel for defendants shall initiate the call and dial into 718-613-2180 when all parties are on the line. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 9/8/2017. (Newman, Alanna) |
||
minutes
Pre Motion Conference
Fri 09/08 3:02 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto: Telephonic Pre Motion Conference held on 9/8/2017. Appearances: for plaintiff, Michael Steinmetz, Esq.; for defendants, Bonnie Jarrett, Esq. Discussions held re defendants' proposed motion to dismiss. Plaintiff shall file and serve an amended complaint by September 28, 2017 and the parties shall schedule a settlement conference before Chief Magistrate Judge Mann to be held after the filing of the amended complaint, and before any motion practice. (Newman, Alanna) |
||
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 09/08 5:18 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Settlement Conference set for October 18, 2017 at 10:00 AM at 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, NY 11201 in Courtroom 13C-S before Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 9/8/2017. (Godoy-Dalmau, Gabriel) |
||
Monday, September 04, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice(Other)
Mon 09/04 8:26 PM
NOTICE by OTC Outlet, Inc. of Withdrawal of Attorney (Margiano, Richard) |
|
Friday, September 01, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference
Fri 09/01 11:00 AM
ORDER granting13 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. A telephonic pre-motion conference will be held on September 8, 2017 at 2:00 p.m. Counsel for defendants shall initiate the call and dial into 718-613-2180 when all parties are on the line. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 9/1/2017. (Newman, Alanna) |
||
Thursday, August 31, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 08/31 5:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Moshe Victor on behalf of Zoetis, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Victor, Jacob) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Pre Motion Conference
Thu 08/31 5:05 PM
Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re Proposed Motion to Dismiss by Zoetis, Inc.. (Jarrett, Bonnie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 08/31 5:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Bonnie Leigh Jarrett on behalf of Zoetis, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Jarrett, Bonnie) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 08/31 4:59 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zoetis, Inc. (Jarrett, Bonnie) |
|
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 08/15 1:25 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by OTC Outlet, Inc.. Zoetis Belgium S.A. served on 8/11/2017, answer due 9/1/2017. (Steinmetz, Michael) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 08/15 1:23 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by OTC Outlet, Inc.. Zoetis, Inc. served on 8/11/2017, answer due 9/1/2017. (Steinmetz, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Wed 08/09 10:04 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zoetis Belgium S.A., Zoetis, Inc.. (Tavarez, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Issued | ||
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 08/08 3:46 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint by OTC Outlet, Inc. (Kehrli, Kevin) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 08/08 3:44 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint by OTC Outlet, Inc. (Kehrli, Kevin) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/08 3:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Myer Steinmetz on behalf of OTC Outlet, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Steinmetz, Michael) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/08 3:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Kehrli on behalf of OTC Outlet, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Kehrli, Kevin) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Thu 04/20 3:14 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. *** NO SUMMONS ISSUED*** (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Thu 04/20 3:12 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 04/20 3:06 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto and Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) |
||
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/18 11:01 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9459016 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by OTC Outlet, Inc.. (Margiano, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |