Landes et al v. Sony Mobile Communications (U.S.A.), Inc. et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Joseph F Bianco |
Referred: | Steven I Locke |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02264 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Apr 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 01, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 11, 2017 5:22 AM EDT |
Defendant
Sony Electronics, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sony Mobile Communications (U.S.A.), Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Goddard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Logan Landes
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, January 03, 2018 | ||
42 | 42
misc
Transcript
Wed 01/03 2:44 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on December 1, 2018, before Judge Joseph F. Bianco. Transcriber Tracy Gribben Transcription LLC, Telephone number 732-263-0044. Email address: tgribben@comcast.net. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/24/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/5/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/3/2018. (Kanellopoulos, John) |
|
Friday, December 01, 2017 | ||
41 | 41
order
Judgment
Mon 12/04 9:54 AM
FINAL JUDGMENT : Hereby adjudged and decreed pursuant to Rules 23 and 58 of FRCP 1. final order approving class action settlement, 2. judgment is hereby entered in accordance with the Final Order Approving Class Action Settlement and this action is dismissed with prejudice 3. a copy of this Final Judgment shall be filed in, and applies to, this Action. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 12/1/2017. (Bollbach, Jean) |
|
40 | 40
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Mon 12/04 9:47 AM
ORDER granting33 Motion for Attorney Fees. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 12/1/2017. (Bollbach, Jean) (Main Document 40 replaced on 12/4/2017) (Bollbach, Jean) |
|
39 | 39
13
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Settlement Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
Mon 12/04 9:46 AM
ORDER granting28 Motion for Settlement; granting16 motion for class action settlement See order for full details. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 12/1/2017. (Bollbach, Jean) |
|
38 | 38
minutes
Status Conference
Mon 12/04 8:54 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joseph F. Bianco:Fairness Hearing held on 12/1/2017 - Court approves the class settlement and therequest for attorneys fees. A written order will follow (FTR Log #1:50 - 2:25.) (Bollbach, Jean) |
|
Friday, November 17, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
notice
Notice(Other)
Tue 11/21 9:26 AM
NOTICE of withdrawal of objection to class action settlement filed by James Rogers (Bollbach, Jean) |
|
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
respoth
Reply in Support
Tue 11/14 3:39 PM
REPLY in Support REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF JOINT MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AND UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES, REIMBURSEMENT OF LITIGATION EXPENSES, AND PLAINTIFFS INCENTIVE AWARD filed by James Goddard, Logan Landes. (Kulesa, Nancy) |
|
35 | 35
respoth
Reply in Support
Tue 11/14 1:46 PM
REPLY in Support re28 Joint MOTION for Settlement FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER AND JUDGMENT GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND ISSUANCE OF RELATED ORDERS filed by Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony Mobile Communications (U.S.A.), Inc.. (Hooper, John) |
|
Thursday, November 09, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
respm
Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Motion
Thu 11/09 4:49 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re28 Joint MOTION for Settlement FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER AND JUDGMENT GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND ISSUANCE OF RELATED ORDERS Supplemental Declaration of Jeanne Finegan filed by James Goddard, Logan Landes. (Kulesa, Nancy) |
|
Friday, October 13, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
motion
Attorney Fees
Fri 10/13 6:59 PM
MOTION for Attorney Fees , REIMBURSEMENT OF LITIGATION EXPENSES AND PLAINTIFFS INCENTIVE AWARD by James Goddard, Logan Landes. (Kulesa, Nancy) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
32 | 32
motion
Attorney Fees
Fri 10/13 6:37 PM
MOTION for Attorney Fees , REIMBURSEMENT OF LITIGATION EXPENSES AND PLAINTIFFS INCENTIVE AWARD by James Goddard, Logan Landes. (Kulesa, Nancy) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
31 | 31
respm
Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Motion
Fri 10/13 6:04 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re28 Joint MOTION for Settlement FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER AND JUDGMENT GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND ISSUANCE OF RELATED ORDERS filed by James Goddard, Logan Landes. (Kulesa, Nancy) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
30 | 30
30+
pgs
respoth
Memorandum in Support
Fri 10/13 5:56 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re28 Joint MOTION for Settlement FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER AND JUDGMENT GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND ISSUANCE OF RELATED ORDERS filed by James Goddard, Logan Landes. (Kulesa, Nancy) |
|
29 | 29
30+
pgs
respoth
Memorandum in Support
Fri 10/13 4:47 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re28 Joint MOTION for Settlement FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER AND JUDGMENT GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND ISSUANCE OF RELATED ORDERS filed by Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony Mobile Communications (U.S.A.), Inc.. (Hooper, John) |
|
28 | 28
motion
Settlement
Fri 10/13 4:33 PM
Joint MOTION for Settlement FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER AND JUDGMENT GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND ISSUANCE OF RELATED ORDERS by James Goddard, Logan Landes. (Kulesa, Nancy) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A: [Proposed] Final Order Approving Class Action Settlement, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B: [Proposed] Final Judgment, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C: Declaration of Jeanne C. Finegan, APR and Exhibits A-I | ||
utility
Incorrect Case-Document Information
Mon 10/16 10:04 AM
Incorrect Case/Document/Entry Information. Entry 32 motion terminated as memo incorrect. Motion refiled correctly in document #33 (Bollbach, Jean) |
||
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
respoth
Objection to Class Action Settlement
Wed 09/27 11:25 AM
Objection to Class Action Settlement filed by objector James J Rogers. (Bollbach, Jean) |
|
Tuesday, September 19, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 09/19 10:12 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nancy Kulesa on behalf of James Goddard, Logan Landes (notification declined or already on case) (Kulesa, Nancy) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 09/18 3:41 PM
Electronic ORDER granting DE22 , Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at the NYEDs homepage. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 9/18/2017. (Perri, Anthony) |
||
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
minutes
Status Conference
Thu 08/03 1:20 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joseph F. Bianco:Bench Ruling held on 8/3/2017 - decision made on the record (Tape #ftr 12:0 - 12:33.) (Bollbach, Jean) |
|
23 | 23
order
Order to Show Cause
Thu 08/03 1:14 PM
ORDER, INTER ALIA, GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT, PROVISIONALLY CERTIFYING SETTLEMENT CLASS, DIRECTING NOTICE TO THE CLASS ANDSCHEDULING FAIRNESS HEARING. Fairness hearing set for December 1, 2017 at 1:30 pm in Courtroom 1020 See order for full details Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 8/3/2017. (Bollbach, Jean) |
|
22 | 22
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 08/03 9:39 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-9729364. by James Goddard, Logan Landes. (Kulesa, Nancy) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Wednesday, August 02, 2017 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 08/02 1:03 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall participate in a telephone conference with the Court tomorrow, August 3, 2017, at 12:00 p.m. to discuss the pending motion for preliminary approval of the class action settlement. At that time, counsel for plaintiffs shall initiate the call and, once all the parties are on the line, call Chambers at 631-712-5670. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 8/2/2017. (Hammond, Daniel) |
||
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Change of Address/Firm/Email
Tue 08/01 4:21 PM
NOTICE of Change of Firm and Contact Information by Eric F. Gladbach (Gladbach, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Letter to Clerk regarding Change of Firm and Contact Information, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Change of Address/Firm/Email
Tue 08/01 3:51 PM
NOTICE of Change of Firm and Contact Information by John Hooper (Hooper, John) |
|
Att: 1 Letter to Clerk regarding Change of Firm and Contact Information, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
respoth
Memorandum in Support
Tue 07/25 3:08 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re16 Joint MOTION to Appoint Counsel JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND ISSUANCE OF RELATED ORDERS filed by James Goddard, Logan Landes. (Hopkins, Shannon) |
|
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 07/19 5:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey Garrett Young on behalf of Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony Mobile Communications (U.S.A.), Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Young, Geoffrey) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
respoth
Reply in Support
Fri 07/14 6:00 PM
REPLY in Support re16 Joint MOTION to Appoint Counsel JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND ISSUANCE OF RELATED ORDERS filed by Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony Mobile Communications (U.S.A.), Inc.. (Hooper, John) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Appoint Counsel
Fri 07/14 4:50 PM
Joint MOTION to Appoint Counsel JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND ISSUANCE OF RELATED ORDERS by James Goddard, Logan Landes. (Hopkins, Shannon) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Preliminary Approval Order, | ||
Att: 2 Settlement Agreement with Exhibits, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of Patrick Juneau in Support of the Settlement | ||
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
minutes
Status Conference ~Util - Set Hearings
Thu 07/06 4:10 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joseph F. Bianco:Status Conference held on 7/6/2017, ( Fairness hearing set for 12/1/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 1020 before Judge Joseph F. Bianco.) (Tape #ftr 3:30 - 3:44.) (Bollbach, Jean) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 06/30 8:25 AM
Electronic ORDER granting DE14 , Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. On consent, the deadline by which Defendants are to answer, move, or otherwise respond, is hereby extended through and including 8/3/2017. SO Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 6/30/2017. (Perri, Anthony) |
||
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 06/28 10:06 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony Mobile Communications (U.S.A.), Inc.. (Gladbach, Eric) |
|
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 06/27 2:01 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: By letter dated June 22, 2017, defendants request that the status conference set for June 29, 2017 be rescheduled. Plaintiffs consent to this request. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the request is granted. The telephone conference is rescheduled to July 6, 2017 at 3:00 p.m. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 6/27/2017. (Hammond, Daniel) |
||
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice(Other)
Thu 06/22 11:31 AM
NOTICE by Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony Mobile Communications (U.S.A.), Inc. REQUEST TO RESET CONFERENCE (Hooper, John) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 06/16 1:53 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the status conference scheduled for June 26, 2017 at 3:00 p.m. is rescheduled to June 29, 2017 at 3:00 p.m. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 6/16/2017. (Hammond, Daniel) |
||
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 05/30 11:15 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony Mobile Communications (U.S.A.), Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Sony Corporation, Corporate Parent Sony Corporation of America, Corporate Parent Sony Americas Holding, Inc. for Sony Electronics, Inc.; Corporate Parent Sony Corporation, Corporate Parent Sony Mobile Communications AB, Corporate Parent Sony Mobile Communications Inc. for Sony Mobile Communications (U.S.A.), Inc.. (Hooper, John) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference
Tue 05/30 9:52 AM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Conference By letter dated May 26, 2017, the parties request an in-person conference to discuss the status of this litigation. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the request is granted. The parties shall appear in Courtroom 1040 for a status conference on June 26, 2017 at 3:00 p.m. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 5/30/2017. (Hammond, Daniel) |
||
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Pre Motion Conference
Fri 05/26 11:51 AM
First MOTION for pre motion conference by James Goddard, Logan Landes. (Hopkins, Shannon) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 05/26 11:23 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Eric F. Gladbach on behalf of Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony Mobile Communications (U.S.A.), Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Gladbach, Eric) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 05/26 11:20 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by John Hooper on behalf of Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony Mobile Communications (U.S.A.), Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Hooper, John) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 05/10 3:34 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Logan Landes, James Goddard. Sony Mobile Communications (U.S.A.), Inc. waiver sent on 5/2/2017, answer due 7/3/2017. (Hopkins, Shannon) |
|
7 | 7
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 05/10 3:31 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Logan Landes, James Goddard. Sony Electronics, Inc. waiver sent on 5/2/2017, answer due 7/3/2017. (Hopkins, Shannon) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/20 8:52 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bollbach, Jean) |
|
Att: 1 Sony Mobile | ||
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 04/19 9:26 AM
Proposed Summons. by James Goddard, Logan Landes (Hopkins, Shannon) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 04/19 9:23 AM
Proposed Summons. by James Goddard, Logan Landes (Hopkins, Shannon) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Tue 04/18 2:56 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Tue 04/18 9:48 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Rodin, Deanna). |
|
Att: 1 (4/18/2017) Additional Corrections | ||
notice
Notice(Other)
Tue 04/18 2:53 PM
Proposed summonses are rejected; the caption on each summons does not match the caption of the complaint; the Clerk's Office cannot issue the summonses with an incorrect caption. Counsel is advised to submit completed proposed summonses using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Rodin, Deanna) |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 04/18 2:55 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Joseph F. Bianco and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) |
||
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony Mobile Communications (U.S.A.), Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9451970 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Logan Landes, James Goddard. (Hopkins, Shannon) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons |