OSORIO-MARTINEZ et al v. JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III et al
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Paul S Diamond |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-01747 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 08:1255 Failure USCIS To Adjudicate Permanent Residency Petition |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2017 |
Re-opened: | Jul 19, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jul 20, 2021 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 14, 2017 5:12 AM EDT |
Amicus
CENTER FOR GENDER AND REFUGEE STUDIES
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
THOMAS DECKER
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DIANE EDWARDS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
THOMAS D. HOMAN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JOHN F. KELLY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JETHZABEL MARITZA AGUILAR MANCIA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CARMEN ALEYDA LOBO MEJIA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MARIA DELMI MARTINEZ NOLASCO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
WENDY AMPARO OSORIO-MARTINEZ
|
Represented By
|
1. | Lawsuit filed by families in Berks County Residential Center seeks to prevent deportation of children (readingeagle.com) |
Submitted Thu 04/20/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Tuesday, July 20, 2021 | ||
45 | 45
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case - 41(b)
Tue 07/20 11:36 AM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 7/20/2021. 7/20/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt) |
|
Monday, July 19, 2021 | ||
44 | 44
appeal
USCA Mandate
Mon 07/19 2:10 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to32 Notice of Appeal (Credit Card Payment), filed by WENDY AMPARO OSORIO-MARTINEZ, JETHZABEL MARITZA AGUILAR MANCIA, CARMEN ALEYDA LOBO MEJIA, MARIA DELMI MARTINEZ NOLASCO THAT ORDER OF DISTRICT COURT ENTERED 5/23/17 IS REVERSED AND CAUSE REMANDED FOR PROCEEDINGS CONSISTENT WITH THIS OPINION (rf, ) |
|
Friday, March 30, 2018 | ||
43 | 43
order
Suspense Order
Mon 04/02 9:14 AM
ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT MARK THIS ACTION CLOSED FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES AND PLACE THE MATTER IN THE CIVIL SUSPENSE FILE.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 3/30/18. 4/2/18 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
42 | 42
order
Order
Wed 06/21 12:52 PM
ORDER THAT ALL DEADLINES ARE STAYED PENDING FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 6/21/17. 6/21/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nl, ) |
|
41 | 41
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Wed 06/21 8:41 AM
ORDER THAT THE MOTION (DOC. NO.40 ) IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 6/21/17. 6/21/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nl, ) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
40 | 40
motion
Stay
Fri 06/16 4:38 PM
Consent MOTION to Stay District Court Proceedings filed by THOMAS DECKER, DIANE EDWARDS, THOMAS D. HOMAN, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, JOHN F. KELLY, THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.Certificate of Service.(ANDRAPALLIYAL, VINITA) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
39 | 39
order
Order
Thu 06/08 9:20 AM
ORDER THAT THE REQUEST (DOC. NO.34 ) IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL STRIKE PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT (DOC. NO.30 ) AND ALL RELATED EXHIBITS (DOC. NOS. 30-1 THROUGH 30-37) FROM THE DOCKET. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 6/8/17. 6/8/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nl, ) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
respoth
Response
Wed 06/07 4:36 PM
Response to Defendants Request to Strike Plaintiffs Proposed Findings of Fact re34 Response in Opposition to Motion, by JETHZABEL MARITZA AGUILAR MANCIA, CARMEN ALEYDA LOBO MEJIA, MARIA DELMI MARTINEZ NOLASCO, WENDY AMPARO OSORIO-MARTINEZ. (VALE, ANTHONY) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
notice
Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
Fri 05/26 2:58 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance as to Michael Joseph Edelman on behalf of Plaintiffs in the above-captioned matter with Certificate of Service.(jaa, ) Modified on 5/26/2017 (jaa, ) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
appeal
USCA Notice of Docketing ROA
Wed 05/24 11:21 AM
NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re32 Notice of Appeal (Credit Card Payment), filed by WENDY AMPARO OSORIO-MARTINEZ, JETHZABEL MARITZA AGUILAR MANCIA, CARMEN ALEYDA LOBO MEJIA, MARIA DELMI MARTINEZ NOLASCO. USCA Case Number 17-2159 (dmc, ) |
|
35 | 35
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Wed 05/24 11:18 AM
ORDER THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED IN PART. MY 5/23/2017 ORDER (DOC. NO.31 ) IS STAYED UNTIL FRIDAY, 6/2/2017 AT NOON. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 5/24/17. 5/24/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nl, ) |
|
34 | 34
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Wed 05/24 9:55 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re33 Emergency MOTION to Stay re31 Order,, opposition to plaintiffs' request for a stay of removal pending appeal and request that the "Proposed Findings of Fact" (ECF 30) be stricken from the record filed by THOMAS DECKER, DIANE EDWARDS, THOMAS D. HOMAN, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, JOHN F. KELLY, THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (REUVENI, EREZ) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
motion
Stay
Tue 05/23 4:12 PM
Emergency MOTION to Stay re31 Order,, filed by JETHZABEL MARITZA AGUILAR MANCIA, CARMEN ALEYDA LOBO MEJIA, MARIA DELMI MARTINEZ NOLASCO, WENDY AMPARO OSORIO-MARTINEZ. Certificate of Service.(VALE, ANTHONY) |
|
32 | 32
appeal
Notice of Appeal (Credit Card Payment)
Tue 05/23 3:57 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to31 Order,, by JETHZABEL MARITZA AGUILAR MANCIA, CARMEN ALEYDA LOBO MEJIA, MARIA DELMI MARTINEZ NOLASCO, WENDY AMPARO OSORIO-MARTINEZ. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0313-12086347. Copies to Judge, Clerk USCA, Appeals Clerk and (VALE, ANTHONY) |
|
31 | 31
14
pgs
order
Order
Tue 05/23 2:16 PM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR EMERGENCY RELIEF IS DENIED. THE 4/19/2017 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER BY JUDGE STENGEL (DOC. NO.3 ) IS DISSOLVED. THE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 5/23/2017 (DOC. NO.20 ) IS CANCELLED. PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR WRIT TO TRANSPORT MS. OSORIO-MARTINEZ AND D.S.R.O. TO THE 5/23/2017 HEARING (DOC. NO.27 ) AND DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR HEARING OR LEAVE TO FILE RESPONSE (DOC. NO.28 ) ARE DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 5/23/17. 5/23/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nl, ) |
|
30 | 30
trial
Proposed Findings of Fact
Tue 05/23 2:02 PM
Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by JETHZABEL MARITZA AGUILAR MANCIA, CARMEN ALEYDA LOBO MEJIA, MARIA DELMI MARTINEZ NOLASCO, WENDY AMPARO OSORIO-MARTINEZ. Certificate of Service(VALE, ANTHONY) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit List, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 9, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 10, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 11, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 12.1, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 12.2, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit 13, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit 14, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit 15, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit 16, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit 17, | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit 18, | ||
Att: 21 Exhibit 19, | ||
Att: 22 Exhibit 20, | ||
Att: 23 Exhibit 21, | ||
Att: 24 Exhibit 22, | ||
Att: 25 Exhibit 23, | ||
Att: 26 Exhibit 24, | ||
Att: 27 Exhibit 25, | ||
Att: 28 Exhibit 26.1, | ||
Att: 29 Exhibit 26.2, | ||
Att: 30 Exhibit 27, | ||
Att: 31 Exhibit 28, | ||
Att: 32 Exhibit 29, | ||
Att: 33 Exhibit 30, | ||
Att: 34 Exhibit 31, | ||
Att: 35 Exhibit 32, | ||
Att: 36 Exhibit 33, | ||
Att: 37 Exhibit 34 | ||
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
respoth
Memorandum
Mon 05/22 3:27 PM
Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Emergency Injunctive Relief by CENTER FOR GENDER AND REFUGEE STUDIES. (nl, ) Modified on 5/22/2017 (nl, ) |
|
28 | 28
motion
Hearing Leave to File Document
Mon 05/22 2:42 PM
MOTION for Hearing re27 MOTION for Writ /Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus to Require the Government to Transport Wendy Amparo Osorio-Martinez and Her Minor Child, D.S.R.-O., to the May 23, 2017 Hearing or, Alternatively , MOTION for Leave to File Response filed by THOMAS DECKER, THOMAS D. HOMAN, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, JOHN F. KELLY, THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(ANDRAPALLIYAL, VINITA) |
|
27 | 27
motion
Writ
Mon 05/22 12:05 PM
MOTION for Writ /Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus to Require the Government to Transport Wendy Amparo Osorio-Martinez and Her Minor Child, D.S.R.-O., to the May 23, 2017 Hearing filed by JETHZABEL MARITZA AGUILAR MANCIA, CARMEN ALEYDA LOBO MEJIA, MARIA DELMI MARTINEZ NOLASCO, WENDY AMPARO OSORIO-MARTINEZ.Memorandum In Support, Certificate of Service.(RICKABAUGH, JESSICA) |
|
26 | 26
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Mon 05/22 10:42 AM
ORDER THAT THE MOTION (DOC. NO.22 ) IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL FILE THE PROPOSED BRIEF. (SEE DOC. NO. 22-1.). SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 5/22/17. 5/22/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nl, ) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
respm
Response to Motion
Fri 05/19 6:02 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re22 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Emergency Injunctive Relief filed by THOMAS DECKER, THOMAS D. HOMAN, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, JOHN F. KELLY. (ANDRAPALLIYAL, VINITA) |
|
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 05/19 5:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ANTHONY VALE on behalf of JETHZABEL MARITZA AGUILAR MANCIA, CARMEN ALEYDA LOBO MEJIA, MARIA DELMI MARTINEZ NOLASCO, WENDY AMPARO OSORIO-MARTINEZ with Certificate of Service(VALE, ANTHONY) |
|
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 05/19 5:53 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA RICKABAUGH on behalf of JETHZABEL MARITZA AGUILAR MANCIA, CARMEN ALEYDA LOBO MEJIA, MARIA DELMI MARTINEZ NOLASCO, WENDY AMPARO OSORIO-MARTINEZ with Certificate of Service(RICKABAUGH, JESSICA) |
|
22 | 22
motion
Leave to File Document
Fri 05/19 2:15 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Emergency Injunctive Relief filed by CENTER FOR GENDER AND REFUGEE STUDIES..(HELFER, ARLEIGH) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A (Proposed Brief), | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Thu 05/18 11:58 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re14 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Response Brief filed by JETHZABEL MARITZA AGUILAR MANCIA, CARMEN ALEYDA LOBO MEJIA, MARIA DELMI MARTINEZ NOLASCO, WENDY AMPARO OSORIO-MARTINEZ.(EDELMAN, MICHAEL) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration Steven E. Samuel, Ph.D., | ||
Att: 3 Declaration Bryan Johnson, Esq. | ||
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order
Tue 05/16 1:25 PM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFFS SHALL RESPOND TO THE DEFENDANTS' BRIEF NO LATER THAN THURSDAY, 5/18/2017 AT NOON. THE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING IS RESCHEDULED TO TUESDAY, 5/23/2017 AT 10:30 AM AND WILL BE HELD IN COURTROOM 14-A OF THE JAMES A. BYRNE UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PENNSYLVANIA, 19106. UNLESS OTHERWISE ORDERED, THE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (DOC. NO.3 ) SHALL EXPIRE ON TUESDAY, 5/23/2017 AT 11:59 PM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 5/16/17. 5/16/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nl, ) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
respoth
Response
Tue 05/09 7:23 PM
Letter in Response to Plaintiffs' May 5, 2017 Letter by THOMAS DECKER, THOMAS D. HOMAN, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, JOHN F. KELLY, THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (ANDRAPALLIYAL, VINITA) Modified on 5/10/2017 (fb) |
|
18 | 18
order
Order Reassigning Case
Tue 05/09 9:58 AM
ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL TO HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 5/9/17. 5/9/17 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
respm
Memorandum
Fri 05/05 11:54 AM
Letter re12 MOTION for Clarification and Reply to Plaintiffs' Objection filed by JETHZABEL MARITZA AGUILAR MANCIA, CARMEN ALEYDA LOBO MEJIA, MARIA DELMI MARTINEZ NOLASCO, WENDY AMPARO OSORIO-MARTINEZ. (EDELMAN, MICHAEL) Modified on 5/8/2017 (fb) |
|
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
Fri 05/05 11:27 AM
ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE EXCESS PAGES IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 5/4/17.5/5/17 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) |
|
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Wed 05/03 7:36 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by THOMAS DECKER, DIANE EDWARDS, THOMAS D. HOMAN, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, JOHN F. KELLY, THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(DARROW, JOSEPH) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Declaration | ||
14 | 14
motion
File Excess Pages
Wed 05/03 6:31 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Response Brief filed by THOMAS DECKER, DIANE EDWARDS, THOMAS D. HOMAN, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, JOHN F. KELLY, THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.Certificate of Service.(DARROW, JOSEPH) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
13 | 13
minutes
Telephone Conference
Wed 05/03 3:57 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL Telephone Conference held on 5/3/17 (jl, ) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Clarification
Fri 04/28 4:49 PM
MOTION for Clarification and Reply to Plaintiffs' Objection filed by THOMAS DECKER, DIANE EDWARDS, THOMAS D. HOMAN, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, JOHN F. KELLY, THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.Certificate of Service.(DARROW, JOSEPH) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/28 4:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH ANTON DARROW on behalf of THOMAS DECKER, DIANE EDWARDS, THOMAS D. HOMAN, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, JOHN F. KELLY, THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY with Certificate of Service(DARROW, JOSEPH) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Objections
Thu 04/27 5:11 PM
Objections by JETHZABEL MARITZA AGUILAR MANCIA, CARMEN ALEYDA LOBO MEJIA, MARIA DELMI MARTINEZ NOLASCO, WENDY AMPARO OSORIO-MARTINEZ re9 Notice (Other) . (EDELMAN, MICHAEL) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 04/27 12:58 PM
NOTICE by THOMAS DECKER, THOMAS D. HOMAN, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, JOHN F. KELLY, THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY re3 Order,, (ANDRAPALLIYAL, VINITA) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/27 12:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by VINITA ANDRAPALLIYAL on behalf of THOMAS DECKER, THOMAS D. HOMAN, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, JOHN F. KELLY, THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (ANDRAPALLIYAL, VINITA) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 04/25 4:55 PM
NOTICE by JETHZABEL MARITZA AGUILAR MANCIA, CARMEN ALEYDA LOBO MEJIA, MARIA DELMI MARTINEZ NOLASCO, WENDY AMPARO OSORIO-MARTINEZ re5 Notice (Other), Response to Notice of Related Case (EDELMAN, MICHAEL) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney
Thu 04/20 3:13 PM
Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (jl, ) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 04/19 6:42 PM
NOTICE by THOMAS DECKER, DIANE EDWARDS, THOMAS D. HOMAN, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, JOHN F. KELLY, THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY re1 Complaint, of related case (Castro and JAAS) and request to reassign case to Judge Paul Diamond (REUVENI, EREZ) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/19 6:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by EREZ REUVENI on behalf of THOMAS DECKER, DIANE EDWARDS, THOMAS D. HOMAN, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, JOHN F. KELLY, THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (REUVENI, EREZ) |
|
3 | 3
order
Order
Wed 04/19 1:43 PM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S EMERGENCY MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER IS GRANTED. DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE A BRIEF ON OR BEFORE AND SHOW CAUSE WHY A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE TO ENJOIN DEFENDANTS AND ALL OTHER PERSONS IN ACTIVE CONCERT OR PARTICIPATION WITH THEM, DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY. COUNSEL FOR THE PARTIES SHALL APPEAR AT A HEARING ON 5/19/17 AT 9:30 A.M. TO PRESENT ARGUMENT ON WHETHER A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD ISSUE IN THIS CASE; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL ON 4/19/17. 4/19/17 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, COPY PLACED IN US ATTORNEY BOX.(jl, ) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Temporary Restraining Order
Tue 04/18 9:28 AM
MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER FILED BY JETHZABEL MARITZA AGUILAR MANCIA, CARMEN ALEYDA LOBO MEJIA, MARIA DELMI MARTINEZ NOLASCO, WENDY AMPARO OSORIO-MARTINEZ; MEMO IN SUPPORT.(jmv, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/18 9:02 AM
CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY, INJUNCTIVE AND MONETARY RELIEF against THOMAS DECKER, DIANE EDWARDS, THOMAS D. HOMAN, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, JOHN F. KELLY, THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE158128), filed by CARMEN ALEYDA LOBO MEJIA, JETHZABEL MARITZA AGUILAR MANCIA, WENDY AMPARO OSORIO-MARTINEZ, MARIA DELMI MARTINEZ NOLASCO.(jmv, ) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/18 9:03 AM
Summons Issued as to THOMAS DECKER, DIANE EDWARDS, THOMAS D. HOMAN, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, JOHN F. KELLY. Forwarded To: 5 Origs mailed to counsel on 4/18/17 (jmv, ) |
||
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Tue 04/18 9:20 AM
Summons Issued as to THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General Forwarded To: 3 Origs mailed to counsel; 1 to AUSA on 4/17/17 (jmv, ) |
||
misc
Jury Demand
Tue 04/18 9:43 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by JETHZABEL MARITZA AGUILAR MANCIA, CARMEN ALEYDA LOBO MEJIA, MARIA DELMI MARTINEZ NOLASCO, WENDY AMPARO OSORIO-MARTINEZ. (jmv, ) |