McInnis v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Jane Triche Milazzo |
Referred: | Janis Van Meerveld |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-03555 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1333 Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 08, 2022 |
Last checked: Sunday Oct 15, 2017 3:18 AM CDT |
Defendant
BP America Production Company
|
|
Defendant
BP Exploration & Production, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
BP PLC
|
|
Defendant
Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Transocean Deepwater, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Transocean Holdings, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Jacques Pierre McInnis, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, February 02, 2023 | ||
80 | 80
8
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Reconsideration
Thu 02/02 2:33 PM
ORDER AND REASONS: denying77 Motion for Reconsideration, as stated herein. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 02/02/2023. (am) |