Kuck v. US Foods Inc
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Donald C Coggins, Jr |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00989 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 01, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 14, 2017 5:50 AM EDT |
Defendant
US Foods Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Kuck
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Tuesday, May 01, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case 60 Day Settlement Order
Tue 05/01 9:26 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 5/1/2018. (abuc) |
|
Tuesday, January 30, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
order
Mediation Order
Tue 01/30 10:34 AM
MEDIATION ORDER Mediation Due by 8/27/2018, Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 1/30/2018. (abuc) |
|
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Case Reassigned CV
Thu 12/14 9:50 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr. Judge Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (cwil, ) |
|
Wednesday, May 17, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 05/17 9:12 AM
FORMAL SCHEDULING ORDER and SPECIAL NOTICE TO COUNSEL WITH CASES BEFORE JUDGE JOSEPH F. ANDERSON, JR. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 6/16/2017, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/31/2017, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 12/11/2017, Discovery due by 2/1/2018, Motions due by 2/23/2018, Jury Selection Deadline 5/1/2018. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 5/16/17. (mflo, ) |
|
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
minutes
Pretrial Conference
Wed 05/17 9:09 AM
Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr: Rule 16 Conference held on 5/16/2017. Court Reporter not present. (mflo, ) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 05/12 3:41 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 8 Motion for Craig A. McDougal to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of US Foods Inc.; granting 9 Motion for Samuel Wesley Butler to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of US Foods Inc. Directed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 5/12/17.(mflo, ) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (only one attorney per motion)
Wed 05/10 3:05 PM
Consent MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Samuel Wesley Butler ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-7146970) by US Foods Inc. Response to Motion due by 5/24/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Foster, John) |
|
Att: 1 Supporting Documents Application and Oath, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
8 | 8
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (only one attorney per motion)
Wed 05/10 3:02 PM
Consent MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Craig A. McDougal ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-7146954) by US Foods Inc. Response to Motion due by 5/24/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Foster, John) |
|
Att: 1 Supporting Documents Application and Oath, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Mon 05/08 3:53 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by William Kuck.(Burroughs, Shane) (Main Document 7 replaced on 5/10/2017) (mflo, ) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Pretrial Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 04/25 4:51 PM
ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL RULE 16 CONFERENCE: Rule 16 Conference set for Tuesday, May 16, 2017, at 2:30 p.m. in chambers of the Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. Matters to be taken up at the conference will include all those items identified in Rule 16(a) and (c) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The attorneys of record shall conduct a conference pursuant to Rule 26(f) no later than 14 days prior to the date of the Rule 16 Conference. Signed by Honorable Joseph F. Anderson, Jr. on on 4/25/17. (mflo, ) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 04/24 5:22 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by US Foods Inc.(Foster, John) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Tue 04/18 4:36 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by US Foods Inc.(mflo, ) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Tue 04/18 4:34 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Lexington County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2017-CP 32-00892 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-7106523), filed by US Foods Inc.(mflo, ) |
|
Att: 1 State Court Documents, | ||
Att: 2 Letter to plaintiff's attorneys |