Flynn v. Williams
Wisconsin Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | J P Stadtmueller |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00553 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 08, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order Approving Stipulation Order Dismissing Case
Wed 05/10 10:56 AM
ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 5/10/2017: ADOPTING7 Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal and DISMISSING action without prejudice. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Darryl Allen Flynn at Waupun Correctional Institution)(jm) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Prisoner Case
Mon 05/08 3:09 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Darryl Allen Flynn. Case dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). (mac) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Fri 04/21 3:36 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Darryl Allen Flynn. (mac) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order Directing Prisoner Payment
Thu 04/20 2:45 PM
ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 4/20/2017 ORDERING that on or before 5/11/2017, plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of S15.62 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Darryl Allen Flynn and Warden at Waupun Correctional Institution)(jm) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Letter from Clerk re Consent to Magistrate
Tue 04/18 3:49 PM
LETTER from the clerk to Mr. Flynn re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Duffin and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days (lh) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
Tue 04/18 3:45 PM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Darryl Allen Flynn. (lh) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee
Tue 04/18 3:45 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Darryl Allen Flynn. (lh) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - Prisoner
Tue 04/18 3:45 PM
PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against Natasha Williams by Darryl Allen Flynn.(lh) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Natasha Williams |