SportPet Designs Inc v. Cat1st Corporation et al
Wisconsin Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Lynn Adelman |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00554 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 15:1126 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 26, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Oct 15, 2017 4:25 AM CDT |
Defendant
Cat1st Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jun Takeuchi
|
|
Plaintiff
SportPet Designs Inc
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, June 26, 2018 | ||
40 | 40
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 06/26 1:08 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal - STIPULATED NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Cat1st Corporation. (Chang, Rick) |
|
utility
Terminate Case - Notice Attorneys
Wed 06/27 9:12 AM
Case Terminated pursuant to40 Stipulation of Dismissal (bx) |
||
Tuesday, May 15, 2018 | ||
39 | 39
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 05/15 3:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie H Anacker on behalf of SportPet Designs Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Stephanie Anacker (Anacker, Stephanie) |
|
Tuesday, April 10, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Tue 04/10 1:43 PM
ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 04/10/2018 granting37 Motion to Stay. Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference is rescheduled for 6/27/2018 at 11:15 AM. (cc: all counsel) (lls) |
|
Monday, April 09, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
motion
Stay
Mon 04/09 12:27 PM
MOTION to Stay /Stipulated Motion for Temporary Stay of Case Pending Settlement by Cat1st Corporation.(Chang, Rick) |
|
Att: 1 (Proposed) Order | ||
Tuesday, March 20, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 03/20 11:34 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 03/19/2018. IT IS ORDERED that a telephonic Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) scheduling conference is scheduled for Wednesday, April 25th, 2018, at 11:15 a.m. The court will initiate the call. The participation of the attorney who will be handling the case is required and the telephone number should be provided in the Rule 26(f) report. (cc: all counsel)(lls) |
|
Friday, March 16, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Fri 03/16 10:31 PM
ANSWER to11 Amended Complaint by Cat1st Corporation.(Chang, Rick) |
|
Friday, March 02, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
15
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Terminate Party
Fri 03/02 3:47 PM
DECISION AND ORDER that Cat1st's first motion to dismiss (ECF No.10 ) is DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORDERING that Takeuchi's motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction (ECF No.28 ) is GRANTED and Takeuchi is DISMISSED. FURTHER ORDERING that Cat1st's motion to dismiss SportPet's remaining patent claims for improper venue and SportPet's remaining trademark, copyright, and deceptive trade practices claims for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted (ECF No.12 ) is DENIED with respect to SportPet's claims against Cat1st for infringement of its SPORT PET DESIGNS trademark only and otherwise GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERING that SportPet's motions to strike; in the alternative, for leave to conduct discovery and file a sur-reply brief; and for leave to file a reply brief (ECF Nos.21 ,23 ) are DENIED. Signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 3/2/2018. (cc: all counsel)(gc) |
|
Wednesday, January 24, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 01/24 11:29 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SportPet Designs Inc on Jun Takeuchi (Espin, Melissa) |
|
Tuesday, November 28, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Declaration
Tue 11/28 12:15 AM
SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION of Jun Takeuchi Supplemental Declaration ISO Reply to MTD (Dkt. No. 31) (Chang, Rick) |
|
Monday, November 27, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
respm
Reply Brief in Support of Motion
Mon 11/27 7:38 PM
REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Jun Takeuchi re28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2); motion to join Cat1st MTD Dkt. No. 12 DEFENDANT'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO JUN TAKEUCHI'S MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(b)(2), FRCP 12(b)(3) AND FRCP 12(b)(6) . (Chang, Rick) |
|
Thursday, November 09, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
respm
Brief in Opposition to Motion
Thu 11/09 3:43 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by SportPet Designs Inc re28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2); motion to join Cat1st MTD Dkt. No. 12 titled "Plaintiffs Memorandum in Response to Jun Takeuchis Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(2), FRCP 12(b)(3) AND FRCP 12(b)(6)" .(Espin, Melissa) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Adam Kellogg in Support of Plaintiff's Memorandum in Response to Jun Takeuchi's Motion to Dismiss | ||
Thursday, October 19, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
respm
Brief in Support of Motion
Thu 10/19 9:21 PM
BRIEF in Support filed by Jun Takeuchi re28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2); motion to join Cat1st MTD Dkt. No. 12 .(Chang, Rick) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Jun Takeuchi | ||
28 | 28
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Thu 10/19 9:19 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2); motion to join Cat1st MTD Dkt. No. 12 by Jun Takeuchi.(Chang, Rick) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
misc
Notice of Electronic Filing Error
Fri 10/20 9:36 AM
NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re29 Brief in Support of Motion, filed by Jun Takeuchi ; The Declaration to this document should have been filed as a separate entry. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (jcl) |
||
Tuesday, October 03, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
respm
Response (Non-Motion)
Tue 10/03 1:44 PM
RESPONSE filed by SportPet Designs Inc re26 Notice of Supplemental Authority (Espin, Melissa) |
|
Thursday, September 28, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice - (Do not use this event for a Notice of Appeal)
Thu 09/28 9:13 PM
NOTICE by Cat1st Corporation Notice of Supplemental Authority(Chang, Rick) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exh A In Re Cray | ||
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
respm
Response to Motion
Wed 09/13 11:36 PM
RESPONSE to Motion filed by Cat1st Corporation re24 MOTION for Leave to File,23 MOTION for Leave to File REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS CIVIL L.R. 7(h) NONDISPOSITIVE MOTION TO STRIKE TAKEUCHI DECLARATION, OR ALTERNATIVELY, FOR LEAVE TO CONDUCT DISCOVERY AND FILE A SURREPLY BRIEF TO MOTION TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE . (Chang, Rick) |
|
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice - (Do not use this event for a Notice of Appeal)
Mon 09/11 12:49 PM
NOTICE by SportPet Designs Inc of Motion re previously filed Motion for Leave (Espin, Melissa) |
|
Wednesday, September 06, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Leave to File Document
Wed 09/06 3:40 PM
MOTION for Leave to File REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS CIVIL L.R. 7(h) NONDISPOSITIVE MOTION TO STRIKE TAKEUCHI DECLARATION, OR ALTERNATIVELY, FOR LEAVE TO CONDUCT DISCOVERY AND FILE A SURREPLY BRIEF TO MOTION TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE by SportPet Designs Inc. (Espin, Melissa) |
|
Tuesday, September 05, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
respm
Brief in Opposition to Motion
Tue 09/05 9:14 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by Cat1st Corporation re21 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION to Strike Takeuchi Declaration MOTION for Discovery MOTION for Leave to File Surreply Brief .(Chang, Rick) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Ko Takeuchi in support of Defendant's Opposition | ||
Saturday, August 26, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Strike Discovery
Sat 08/26 12:04 PM
Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION to Strike Takeuchi Declaration , MOTION for Discovery and leave to file Surreply Brief by SportPet Designs Inc.(Espin, Melissa) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Melissa Blair Espin, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Melissa Blair Espin, | ||
Att: 3 Affidavit Declaration of Adam Kellogg, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Signature page to Declaration of Adam Kellogg, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Adam Kellogg, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration of Adam Kellogg | ||
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Declaration
Fri 08/11 10:45 PM
DECLARATION of Rick Chang ISO Reply to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss(Chang, Rick) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Reply Brief in Support of Motion
Fri 08/11 10:27 PM
REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Cat1st Corporation re12 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(3) and 12(b)(6) .(Chang, Rick) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Ko Takeuchi ISO Reply to Motion to Dismiss | ||
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Brief in Opposition to Motion
Fri 07/28 11:27 AM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by SportPet Designs Inc re10 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(3) for Improper Venue and FRCP 12(b)(6) for Failure to State a Claim . (Espin, Melissa) |
|
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Thu 07/27 1:34 PM
Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Cat1st Corporation. (Chang, Rick) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 07/27 1:41 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Lynn Adelman. Magistrate Judge William E Duffin no longer assigned to the case due to non-consent. (lz) |
||
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Disclosure Statement
Tue 07/25 4:39 PM
DISCLOSURE Statement by Cat1st Corporation. (Chang, Rick) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Tue 07/25 2:21 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Rick C Chang (Duane H. Mathiowetz) (Chang, Rick) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Mon 07/24 5:20 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Rick C Chang (Chang, Rick) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice to File Disclosure Statement
Fri 07/14 9:43 AM
NOTICE to Defendant, Cat1st Corporation - Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement should have been filed with your first pleading. Please file your disclosure statement by July 21, 2017. (mlm) |
||
notice
Notice by Clerk to Counsel Re Consent to Magistrate
Fri 07/14 9:45 AM
NOTICE from the clerk to Defendant, Cat1st Corporation requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin be filed by July 28, 2017; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (mlm) |
||
Thursday, July 13, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Declaration
Thu 07/13 11:42 PM
DECLARATION of Rick Chang ISO 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Cat1st Corporation(Chang, Rick) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
12 | 12
motion
Dismiss
Thu 07/13 11:38 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Cat1st Corporation.(Chang, Rick) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law ISO Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6)(3) and 12(b)(6), | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 06/29 2:54 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by SportPet Designs Inc.(Espin, Melissa) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
misc
Notice of Electronic Filing Error
Mon 06/12 3:39 PM
NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re10 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(3) for Improper Venue and FRCP 12(b)(6) for Failure to State a Claim filed by Cat1st Corporation. The Memorandum in Support of your Motion to Dismiss and the Declaration should have been filed as separate entries. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (mlm) |
||
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Dismiss
Fri 06/09 11:27 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(3) for Improper Venue and FRCP 12(b)(6) for Failure to State a Claim by Cat1st Corporation.(Chang, Rick) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in support of Motion to Dismiss, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Chang in support of Motion to Dismiss, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Chang Decl Exh A, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Chang Decl Exh. B, | ||
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Dismiss | ||
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 05/19 8:43 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 5/19/2017. For good cause, the motion for an extension of time (ECF No.9 ) is granted. Defendant Cat1st Corporation shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint no later than June 9, 2017. (cc: all counsel) (lz) |
||
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 05/18 1:21 PM
Expedited MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Cat1st Corporation.(Chang, Rick) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Rick Chang, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Thu 05/11 12:08 PM
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by SportPet Designs Inc. (Espin, Melissa) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 05/04 1:09 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by SportPet Designs Inc. Cat1st Corporation served on 4/28/2017. (Espin, Melissa) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/21 10:29 AM
DISCLOSURE Statement by SportPet Designs Inc. (Espin, Melissa) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents
Fri 04/21 10:16 AM
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks. (lz) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/20 11:35 AM
Summons Issued as to Cat1st Corporation, Jun Takeuchi. (mlm) |
||
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Wed 04/19 8:14 AM
NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl) |
||
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 04/18 5:20 PM
REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by SportPet Designs, Inc. (Espin, Melissa) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Original Document
Tue 04/18 5:11 PM
ORIGINAL DOCUMENT Civil Cover Sheet (Espin, Melissa) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 04/18 5:09 PM
REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by SportPet Designs, Inc. (Espin, Melissa) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/18 5:08 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by SportPet Designs, Inc.. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2561556)(Espin, Melissa) |