Canada v. Berryhill
Wisconsin Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | J P Stadtmueller |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00555 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 22, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, January 15, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Tue 01/15 11:27 AM
ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 1/15/2019: GRANTING15 Unopposed Motion for Attorney's Fees Pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 406(b) and ORDERING the Commissioner to pay the awarded amount from the withheld funds directly to Plaintiff's counsel, David Traver, for work performed in Plaintiff's cases (Case Nos. 15-CV-1267 and 17-CV-555). See Order for further details. (cc: all counsel) (jm) |
|
Monday, December 31, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 12/31 8:52 AM
RESPONSE to Motion filed by Nancy A Berryhill re15 MOTION for Attorney Fees under 42 U.S.C. §406 (b) NOTICE OF NO OPPOSITION . (Hugo, Megan) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 12/31 8:48 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Megan C Hugo on behalf of Nancy A Berryhill. Attorney(s) appearing: Megan C. Hugo (Hugo, Megan) |
|
Sunday, December 09, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Declaration
Sun 12/09 8:43 PM
DECLARATION of Attorney David F. Traver in support of motion for fee under 42 U.S.C. §406 (b)(Traver, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Fee Agreement 2015, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Fee Agreement 2017, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Award, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Attorney Traver's Letter to Ms. Canada, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Attorney Hudec's Fee Authorization | ||
16 | 16
respm
Brief in Support of Motion
Sun 12/09 8:37 PM
BRIEF in Support filed by Anderlyne Canada re15 MOTION for Attorney Fees under 42 U.S.C. §406 (b) . (Traver, David) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Attorney Fees
Sun 12/09 8:36 PM
MOTION for Attorney Fees under 42 U.S.C. §406 (b) by Anderlyne Canada. (Traver, David) |
|
Tuesday, August 29, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
2
pgs
order
Order Approving Stipulation
Tue 08/29 10:52 AM
ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 8/29/2017 ADOPTING13 Parties' Stipulation for Award of Attorney's Fees and Costs. Award of $3,000.00 in attorney's fees and $419.68 in costs, for a total of $3,419.68, to be paid by Defendant in full satisfaction and settlement of any and all claims Plaintiff may have in this matter pursuant to the EAJA. See Order for further details. (cc: all counsel)(jm) |
|
Friday, August 25, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Stipulation
Fri 08/25 3:47 PM
STIPULATION for Attorney's Fees and Costs Under the EAJA by Anderlyne Canada.(Traver, David) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, August 22, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Judgment
Tue 08/22 10:43 AM
JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk and approved as to form by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 8/22/2017. Matter REMANDED to the Commissioner of Social Security pursuant to Sentence Four of Section 205 of the Social Security Act, 42 U.S.C. §405(g). (cc: all counsel)(jm) |
|
11 | 11
order
Order Remanding Case Order Approving Stipulation
Tue 08/22 10:06 AM
ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 8/22/2017: ADOPTING10 Parties' Stipulation for Remand and REMANDING CASE to the Commissioner of Social Security pursuant to Sentence Four of Section 205 of the Social Security Act, 42 U.S.C. §405(g). (cc: all counsel)(jm) |
|
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Stipulation
Fri 08/18 1:50 PM
STIPULATION for reversal and remand under sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) by Anderlyne Canada.(Traver, David) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
socsec
Certificate of Service - Social Security Transcript
Fri 06/23 1:33 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Social Security Transcript by Nancy A Berryhill (Pawlak, Brian) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order
Thu 06/22 9:36 AM
ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 6/22/2017. By 6/26/2017, Defendant to serve on Plaintiff copy of proposed Notice of Mailing and Preservation of Rights and copy of the transcript of administrative proceedings. By 7/17/2017, parties to meet and confer in good faith effort to resolve matter. Plaintiff's brief due by 8/25/2017; Defendant's response due by 10/24/2017; Plaintiff's reply due by 11/14/2017. Unless Court grants exception, initial briefs to be no more than 25 double-spaced pages and reply brief to be no more than 10 double-spaced pages. Parties to notify Court promptly if either chooses not to submit reply brief or supporting materials. No extensions will be granted. (cc: all counsel)(jm) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Proposed Document
Mon 06/19 1:36 PM
PROPOSED Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule filed by Anderlyne Canada. (Truett, Eric) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 06/19 1:35 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Truett on behalf of Anderlyne Canada. Attorney(s) appearing: Eric Truett (Truett, Eric) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Wed 05/31 4:51 PM
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Nancy A Berryhill. (Pawlak, Brian) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 05/31 4:40 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Anderlyne Canada complaint served on U.S. Attorney, Attorney General, and SSA Region V (Traver, David) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Wed 04/19 9:21 AM
Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Anderlyne Canada. (Traver, David) |
|
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Wed 04/19 8:18 AM
NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl) |
||
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/18 8:37 PM
DISCLOSURE Statement by Anderlyne Canada. (Traver, David) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/18 8:33 PM
COMPLAINT against Nancy A Berryhill by Anderlyne Canada. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2561593)(Traver, David) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |