Simon v. Plymouth Police Department, et al
Original Case: 1:15-cv-11788
First Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-civil-01355 |
Type | civil / private / real property |
Nature of Suit | 230 Real Property - Rent Lease & Ejectment |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 25, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 26, 2018 4:39 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
PLYMOUTH POLICE DEPARTMENT
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
TIMOTHY P. MACMILLAN, Patrol Detective
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
JAMES R. VACHON, Patrol Detective
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
JAMES E. LEBRETTON, Patrol Detective
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
JEFFREY MICHAEL SNOW, Food Truck, Property Owner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
ANTHONY SIMON
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 06/26/2018 4:39 AM EDT |
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #83) filed by Appellant Anthony Simon. Transcript Report/Order form due 05/02/2017. PLEASE NOTE: The December 1, 2016 amendment to the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure made significant changes to appellate practice. The full text of the amendments, as well as a summary of major rule changes, is available here. The changes went into effect on December 1, 2016. 17-1355 (AL) |