First Choice ER, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 3:17-bk-31432
Lead case is: 3:17-bk-31432
Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Stacey G Jernigan |
Case #: | 3:17-bk-31436 |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 29, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 50-99 |
Est. Assets | $50,000,001 to $100 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Health Care Business |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
First Choice ER, LLC
2941 Lake Vista Dr
Lewisville, TX 75067-3801 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75242 |
Docket last updated: 6 minutes ago |
Monday, August 20, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
claims
Withdrawal of claim
Mon 08/20 10:45 AM
Withdrawal of claim(s): 43 Filed by Creditor BDC Family Limited Partnership. (Robinson, Shad) |
|
Tuesday, June 26, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Operating report
Tue 06/26 4:31 PM
Debtor-in-possession quarterly operating report (post-confirmation) for filing period January 1, 2018 to March 31, 2018 filed by Debtor First Choice ER, LLC. (Boydston, Elizabeth) |
|
Thursday, March 29, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
order
Final decree
Thu 03/29 9:20 AM
Order Granting Reorganized Debtors Second Omnibus Application for Entry of a Final Decree and Motion to Close Certain Bankruptcy Cases Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 350 and Fed.R.Bankr.P.3022 and Amending Caption of Remaining Case (Case closed) . Entered on 3/29/2018 (Tello, Chris) |
|
Thursday, March 01, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Operating report
Thu 03/01 3:26 PM
Debtor-in-possession quarterly operating report (post-confirmation) for filing period October 1, 2017 to December 31, 2017 filed by Debtor First Choice ER, LLC. (Boydston, Elizabeth) |
|
Friday, September 29, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Schedules
Fri 09/29 2:13 PM
Schedules: Schedules A/B and D-H with Summary of Assets and Liabilities. Filed by Debtor First Choice ER, LLC. (Wilkes, Gregory) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Statement of financial affairs
Fri 09/29 1:10 PM
Statement of financial affairs for a non-individual . Filed by Debtor First Choice ER, LLC. (Springer, Timothy) |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Schedules
Wed 07/12 5:44 PM
Schedules: Schedules A/B and D-H with Summary of Assets and Liabilities. Filed by Debtor First Choice ER, LLC. (Wilkes, Gregory) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
court
Meeting of creditors held
Mon 06/12 1:18 PM
Trustee's initial report of meeting of creditors held on 6/12/2017 (Kippes, Meredyth) |
||
Sunday, June 11, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
none
Sun 06/11 4:05 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Schedules 17-31436 sgj11) ( 31.00). Receipt number 23820073, amount $ 31.00 . (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Schedules
Fri 06/09 10:15 AM
Schedules: Schedules A/B and D-H with Summary of Assets and Liabilities. Filed by Debtor First Choice ER, LLC. (Boydston, Elizabeth) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Schedules
Thu 06/01 8:51 PM
Schedules: Schedules A/B and D-H with Summary of Assets and Liabilities. Filed by Debtor First Choice ER, LLC . (Gluck, Kristian) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of appearance and request for notice
Thu 06/01 12:24 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Michael W. Broome filed by Creditor First National Bank . (Spelmon, T) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of appearance and request for notice
Thu 06/01 12:16 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Michael W. Broome filed by Creditor Wilson Scott, LLC . (Spelmon, T) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/1/2017 (Spelmon, T) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
trustee
Meeting of creditors continued/adjourned
Wed 05/31 7:16 AM
Statement Adjourning 341(a) Meeting of Creditors. The United States Trustee commenced the section 341 meeting of creditors in this case on 5/30/2017 and continued the meeting to 6/12/2017 at 10:00 a.m. Central Time. The Debtor shall serve notice of the continued section 341 meeting immediately. 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/12/2017 at 10:00 AM at Dallas 341 Rm 524. (Kippes, Meredyth) |
||
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Statement of financial affairs
Tue 05/23 7:22 PM
Statement of financial affairs for a non-individual . Filed by Debtor First Choice ER, LLC . (Schwartz, John) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of appearance and request for notice
Mon 04/24 4:58 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Megan M. Adeyemo Filed by Creditor Kimley-Horn and Associates, Inc.. (Adeyemo, Megan) |
|
Saturday, April 22, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
court
BNC certificate of mailing
Sat 04/22 11:43 PM
BNC certificate of mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/22/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Joint administration
Fri 04/21 1:43 PM
Order granting motion for joint administration lead case 3:17-bk-31432 with member case 3:17-bk-31436 |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Joint administration
Thu 04/20 2:45 PM
Motion for joint administration of cases Adeptus Health Inc. Filed by Debtor First Choice ER, LLC (Gluck, Kristian) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
2 | 2
court
Notice of deficiency
Thu 04/20 12:27 PM
Notice of deficiency. Schedule A/B due 5/3/2017. Schedule D due 5/3/2017. Schedule E/F due 5/3/2017. Schedule G due 5/3/2017. Schedule H due 5/3/2017. Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 5/3/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs due 5/3/2017. Creditor matrix due 4/24/2017. (Daniel, K.) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
4
pgs
misc
Voluntary petition ch 11 (attorney filer)
Wed 04/19 4:57 PM
Non-individual Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by First Choice ER, LLC (Schwartz, John) |
|
Att: 1 28 pgs Appendix Attachments | ||
crditcrd
none
Wed 04/19 5:25 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary petition (chapter 11) 17-31436 11) [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt number 23591594, amount $1717.00 . (U.S. Treasury) |