K&D LLC t/a CORK v. TRUMP OLD POST OFFICE LLC et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Richard J Leon |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00731 |
Nature of Suit | 380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage |
Cause | 28:1442 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 26, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 16, 2017 5:14 AM EDT |
Defendant
DONALD J. TRUMP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
TRUMP OLD POST OFFICE LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
K&D LLC
|
Represented By
|
1. | Lawsuit against Trump and his DC hotel is dismissed (cnn.com) |
Submitted Tue 11/27/2018 | |
2. | Trump asks federal judge to dismiss lawsuit filed by D.C. restaurant owners (politi.co) |
Submitted Wed 05/10/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 08, 2020 | ||
45 | 45
appeal
USCA Mandate
Wed 04/08 1:26 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to43 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by K&D LLC ; USCA Case Number 18-7185 (Attachment: #1 USCA Judgment)(zsb) |
|
Tuesday, December 11, 2018 | ||
44 | 44
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Tue 12/11 7:02 AM
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date12/10/18 re43 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (ztd) |
|
appeal
USCA Case Number
Tue 12/11 5:24 PM
USCA Case Number 18-7185 for43 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by K&D LLC. (ztd) |
||
Monday, December 10, 2018 | ||
43 | 43
appeal
Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit
Mon 12/10 7:01 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT by K&D LLC. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0090-5831688. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Moss, Bradley) |
|
Monday, November 26, 2018 | ||
42 | 42
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Mon 11/26 4:48 PM
ORDER for the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, it is hereby ORDERED that defendants Trump Old Post Office, LLC's and President Donald J. Trump's Motions to Dismiss31 32 are GRANTED and this case is DISMISSED. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/26/2018. (jth) |
|
41 | 41
12
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Mon 11/26 4:45 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/24/2018. (jth) |
|
Tuesday, September 25, 2018 | ||
minutes
Motion Hearing Order on Motion to Dismiss
Tue 09/25 4:06 PM
Minute Entry for Proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Motions Hearing held on 9/25/2018; Re:31 Motion to Dismiss filed by defendant TRUMP OLD POST OFFICE LLC, and32 Motion to Dismiss filed by defendant DONALD J. TRUMP. The31 32 Motions were Heard and Taken Under Advisement. (Court Reporter: William P. Zaremba) (jth) |
||
Tuesday, September 18, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Reconsideration
Tue 09/18 4:56 PM
MINUTE ORDER denying40 Defendant Trump Old Post Office LLC's Motion for Reconsideration of Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Reschedule. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is DENIED. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 9/18/18. (lcrjl1) |
||
Thursday, September 13, 2018 | ||
40 | 40
motion
Reconsideration
Thu 09/13 1:30 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Scheduling Order, by TRUMP OLD POST OFFICE LLC(Woods, Rebecca) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Thu 09/13 6:54 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: The motions hearing presently scheduled for 9/19/2018 at 3:00 PM is rescheduled for 9/25/2018 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (jth) |
||
Wednesday, September 12, 2018 | ||
39 | 39
motion
Scheduling Order
Wed 09/12 1:48 PM
Consent MOTION to Continue Reschedule Oral Argument Date by K&D LLC(Zaid, Mark) Modified event title on 9/13/2018 (znmw). |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
order
Order on Motion for Scheduling Order
Wed 09/12 5:38 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting39 Plaintiff's Consented-To Motion to Reschedule Oral Argument Date. It is hereby ORDERED that the motions hearing set for September 19, 2018 at 3:00 PM is rescheduled for September 25, 2018 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 9/12/18. (lcrjl1) |
||
Tuesday, September 11, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 09/11 10:49 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Esther Slater McDonald on behalf of TRUMP OLD POST OFFICE LLC (McDonald, Esther) |
|
Friday, September 07, 2018 | ||
order
Order Setting Hearing on Motion ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Fri 09/07 7:29 PM
MINUTE SCHEDULING ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that a motions hearing on31 Defendant Trump Old Post Office LLCs Motion to Dismiss, and32 Defendant Donald J. Trump's Motion to Dismiss shall be held on September 19, 2018 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 9/7/18. (lcrjl1) |
||
Saturday, April 07, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
notice
Notice (Other)
Sat 04/07 5:47 PM
NOTICE of Filing of Relevant Case Decision by K&D LLC(Zaid, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - D.Md Decision | ||
Monday, March 19, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
respm
Reply to opposition to motion
Mon 03/19 3:56 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re32 MOTION to Dismiss filed by DONALD J. TRUMP. (Scherr, Jason) |
|
35 | 35
respm
Reply to opposition to motion
Mon 03/19 2:49 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re31 MOTION to Dismiss filed by TRUMP OLD POST OFFICE LLC. (Woods, Rebecca) |
|
Monday, March 12, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
28
pgs
misc
Memorandum
Mon 03/12 7:59 PM
MEMORANDUM by K&D LLC.(LaFon, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Monday, February 26, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 02/26 4:50 PM
NOTICE of Joinder by DONALD J. TRUMP re31 MOTION to Dismiss (Scherr, Jason) |
|
32 | 32
motion
Dismiss
Mon 02/26 4:44 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by DONALD J. TRUMP(Scherr, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
31 | 31
motion
Dismiss
Mon 02/26 12:00 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by TRUMP OLD POST OFFICE LLC(Woods, Rebecca) |
|
Att: 1 Statement of Facts, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, February 12, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 02/12 3:37 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against DONALD J. TRUMP, TRUMP OLD POST OFFICE LLC filed by K&D LLC.(jf) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 02/12 9:38 AM
MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of28 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to file plaintiff's Amended Complaint (see ECF No. 28-2). It is further ORDERED that, in light of the filing of the Amended Complaint,8 Defendant Donald J. Trump's Motion to Dismiss and10 Defendant Trump Old Post Office LLC's Motion to Dismiss are DENIED AS MOOT. Pursuant to the parties' Joint Stipulation29 as accepted by this Court, it is further ORDERED that defendants shall move against or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint on or before February 26, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 2/12/2018. (lcrjl1) |
||
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
order
.Order
Thu 01/18 9:14 AM
MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties'29 Joint Stipulation for Modification to Briefing Schedule, it is hereby ORDERED that the stipulation is ACCEPTED and that defendants shall file their requisite pleadings within 14 days of the date upon which this Court issues an order adjudicating28 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/18/2018. (lcrjl1) |
||
Tuesday, January 16, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Stipulation
Tue 01/16 7:41 PM
STIPULATION for Modification to Briefing Schedule by K&D LLC.(Moss, Bradley) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
28 | 28
motion
Amend/Correct
Tue 01/16 5:42 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by K&D LLC(Rome, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
27 | 27
26
pgs
respm
Memorandum in opposition to motion
Tue 01/16 5:23 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re10 MOTION to Dismiss ,8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by K&D LLC.(Rome, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Tuesday, January 02, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Remand Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 01/02 10:15 AM
MINUTE ORDER denying12 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Case to D.C. Superior Court. It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff's motion is DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/2/2018. (lcrjl1) |
||
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 11/22 2:56 PM
NOTICE of Intent to Amend Complaint by K&D LLC (Zaid, Mark) |
|
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
order
.Order
Tue 06/13 3:13 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the plaintiff's Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Determination of its Motion to Remand14 , it is hereby ORDERED that the current deadlines for responding to and replying in support of defendants' Motions to Dismiss [8, 10] are TERMINATED. Should the Court deny plaintiff's Motion to Remand, it is further ORDERED that plaintiff will have 14 days from the date of the Court's Order denying the motion to respond to both of the defendants' Motions to Dismiss. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 06/13/17. (lcrjl1) |
||
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
respm
Reply to opposition to motion
Fri 06/09 11:55 AM
REPLY to opposition to motion re14 MOTION to Stay Briefing and Consideration of Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Until 14 Days after the Court Issues a Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by K&D LLC. (Rome, Scott) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 06/08 11:59 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael E. Kenneally on behalf of DONALD J. TRUMP (Kenneally, Michael) |
|
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 06/08 11:53 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Eric W. Sitarchuk on behalf of DONALD J. TRUMP (Sitarchuk, Eric) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
respm
Reply to opposition to motion
Wed 06/07 5:34 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re12 MOTION to Remand to D.C. Superior Court filed by K&D LLC. (Rome, Scott) |
|
21 | 21
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 06/07 1:19 PM
NOTICE of Joinder in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Stay by TRUMP OLD POST OFFICE LLC re20 Memorandum in Opposition (Woods, Rebecca) |
|
20 | 20
respm
Memorandum in opposition to motion
Wed 06/07 10:52 AM
Memorandum in opposition to re14 MOTION to Stay filed by DONALD J. TRUMP.(Scherr, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Response to (non-motion) Document
Fri 06/02 6:58 PM
RESPONSE re18 Supplemental Memorandum filed by DONALD J. TRUMP. (Scherr, Jason) |
|
18 | 18
respm
Supplemental Memorandum
Fri 06/02 12:20 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re14 MOTION to Stay Pending Ruling on Motion to Remand filed by K&D LLC. (Rome, Scott) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
respm
Memorandum in opposition to motion
Thu 06/01 3:14 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re12 MOTION to Remand filed by DONALD J. TRUMP.(Scherr, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
16 | 16
respm
Memorandum in opposition to motion
Thu 06/01 2:26 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re12 MOTION to Remand filed by TRUMP OLD POST OFFICE LLC.(Woods, Rebecca) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion for Briefing Schedule Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 05/31 11:15 AM
ORDER Granting13 Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Amended Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff will respond to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss by 6/14/2017. Defendants will Reply to Plaintiff's Response by 6/28/2017. It is further ORDERED, that the parties shall meet and confer pursuant to LR 16.3, and submit a Joint Meet and Confer Statement and proposed scheduling orde within fourteen (14) days following resolution of Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 5/26/2017. (jth) Modified on 5/31/2017 to reflect the correct filing date of 5/30/2017. (jth) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Stay
Wed 05/24 12:42 PM
MOTION to Stay by K&D LLC(Rome, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Order | ||
13 | 13
motion
Briefing Schedule
Wed 05/24 12:36 PM
Consent MOTION for Briefing Schedule by K&D LLC(Rome, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Order | ||
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Remand
Thu 05/18 3:46 PM
MOTION to Remand by K&D LLC(Rome, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit | ||
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 05/10 3:59 PM
NOTICE of Joinder by DONALD J. TRUMP re10 MOTION to Dismiss (Scherr, Jason) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Dismiss
Wed 05/10 3:08 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by TRUMP OLD POST OFFICE LLC(Woods, Rebecca) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Attachment, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration Attachment | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 05/10 1:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Fred Fisher Fielding on behalf of DONALD J. TRUMP (Fielding, Fred) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Dismiss
Wed 05/10 11:50 AM
MOTION to Dismiss by DONALD J. TRUMP(Scherr, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 04/26 11:17 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting defendants' Joint Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint6 . It is hereby ORDERED that defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's Complaint on or before 05/10/17. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 04/26/17. (lcrjl1) |
||
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Receipt of Superior Court Transfer Documents
Tue 04/25 2:40 PM
Receipt on 4 25-2017 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 17-CA-001560. (zrdj) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 04/24 5:34 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint by DONALD J. TRUMP, TRUMP OLD POST OFFICE LLC (Scherr, Jason) |
|
5 | 5
order
Standing Order
Mon 04/24 12:28 PM
STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 04/24/17. (lcrjl1) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 04/20 8:24 PM
NOTICE of Joinder in Notice of Removal by TRUMP OLD POST OFFICE LLC re1 Notice of Removal, (Woods, Rebecca) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/20 6:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Allyson Newton Ho on behalf of DONALD J. TRUMP (Ho, Allyson) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice to Counsel/Party
Wed 04/19 4:22 PM
NOTICE to Counsel/Party. (sth) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Wed 04/19 3:03 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for the District of Columbia, case number 17ca1560 Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0090-4919971 filed by DONALD J. TRUMP.(Scherr, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 35 pgs Superior Court Documents Documents from Superior Court, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 04/19 4:14 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. (sth) |