George v. Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Ellen L Hollander |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01073 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1446 Notice of Removal - Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 01, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Oct 15, 2017 4:28 AM EDT |
Defendant
Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nancy F. George
717 St. Johns Road
Baltimore, MD 21210 |
GPO
Feb 01 2018
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 2/1/2018. (c/m 2/1/18 jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, February 01, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Thu 02/01 3:55 PM
ORDER granting16 Motion of defendant for Summary Judgment; Judgment is entered in favor of defendant. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 2/1/2018. (c/m 2/1/18 jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
30 | 30
17
pgs
order
Memorandum Opinion
Thu 02/01 3:54 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 2/1/2018. (c/m 2/1/18 jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Status Report
Wed 09/13 4:44 PM
STATUS REPORT by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company(Bolton, Bryan) |
|
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Mon 08/21 11:55 AM
ORDER denying as moot7 Motion of plaintiff to Stay. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 8/21/2017. (c/m 8/21/17 jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Supplemental
Thu 06/29 3:16 PM
Supplemental to15 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company(Bolton, Bryan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Tue 05/30 12:32 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re16 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Statute of Limitations filed by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company.(Bolton, Bryan) |
|
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 05/16 3:23 PM
ORDER denying21 Motion to become accredited to electronically file in the online filing system by Nancy F. George; directing if Ms. George seeks an extension of a deadline, she is directed to identify in her request the particular deadline she wishes the Court to extend. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 5/16/2017. (c/m 5/16/17 jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order
Tue 05/16 8:33 AM
ORDER directing plaintiff to inform the Court as to whether or not she consents to the referral of this case to a Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings by 5/31/17. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 5/15/2017. (c/m 5/16/17 jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
23 | 23
misc
Status Report
Mon 05/15 4:20 PM
STATUS REPORT by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company(Bolton, Bryan) |
|
22 | 22
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 05/15 3:57 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re16 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Statute of Limitations filed by Nancy F. George.(jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment A, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment B, | ||
Att: 3 Attachment C, | ||
Att: 4 Attachment D, | ||
Att: 5 Attachment E, | ||
Att: 6 Attachment F, | ||
Att: 7 Attachment G, | ||
Att: 8 Attachment H | ||
21 | 21
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 05/15 3:50 PM
MOTION to become accredited to electronically file in the online filing system by Nancy F. George (jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Response
Tue 05/02 1:03 PM
RESPONSE re12 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company.(Bolton, Bryan) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
service
Certificate of Service
Mon 05/01 2:50 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company re16 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Statute of Limitations ,15 Response in Opposition to Motion,14 Answer to Complaint (AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (Jasiukaitis, Marianna) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 04/28 3:40 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 5/15/2017. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 4/28/2017. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Rule 12/56
Wed 04/26 9:11 AM
Rule 12/56 letter mailed to Nancy F. George (c/m 4/26/17 jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Summary Judgment
Tue 04/25 8:09 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Statute of Limitations by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company(Bolton, Bryan) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Statute of Limitations, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 8 Text of Proposed Order | ||
15 | 15
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Tue 04/25 4:28 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re7 MOTION to Stay filed by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company.(Bolton, Bryan) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Stay, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 04/25 4:22 PM
ANSWER to2 Complaint by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company.(Bolton, Bryan) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Correspondence
Wed 04/19 12:57 PM
Correspondence from Clerk to plaintiff re removal notification(c/m 4/19/17 jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
12 | 12
order
Standing Order Concerning Removal
Wed 04/19 12:54 PM
Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 4/19/2017. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/19 12:53 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company(jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 04/19 11:04 AM
NOTICE to Plaintiff of Filing a Notice of Removal by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company (jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 04/19 10:57 AM
NOTICE of filing Notice of Removal by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company (jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 04/19 10:56 AM
MOTION for postponement by Nancy F. George(jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Stay
Wed 04/19 10:55 AM
MOTION to Stay by Nancy F. George(jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
6 | 6
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 04/19 10:54 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Circuit Court Judge (jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order
Wed 04/19 10:53 AM
ORDER Regarding Request for Waiver of Prepaid Costs. Signed by Circuit Court Judge Judge (jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 04/19 10:51 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company(jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 04/19 10:50 AM
REQUEST for Waiver of Prepaid Costs by Nancy F. George (jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/19 10:48 AM
COMPLAINT against Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company, filed by Nancy F. George.(jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1 Case Information Report | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 04/19 10:46 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Howard County, Maryland, case number 13-C-16-109821 CN. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14637097313), filed by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company.(jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Remark - State Court Docs
Wed 04/19 11:02 AM
THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2-9) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT OF MARYLAND FOR HOWARD COUNTY. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) |