Marotta et al v. Smith & Nephew
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Catherine C Blake |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01078 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 02, 2023 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 16, 2017 5:01 AM EDT |
Defendant
Smith & Nephew
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Connie Marotta
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Marotta
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 02, 2023 | ||
683 | 683
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Mon 08/21 4:07 PM
MARGINAL ORDER APPROVING 4651 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Smith & Nephew, James Marotta (CCB 17-1078 , James Marotta, Connie Marotta (CCB 17-1078 and Connie Marotta terminated. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 8/2/2023. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB, 1:17-cv-01078-CCB(kb3s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Tuesday, August 01, 2023 | ||
682 | 682
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 08/01 8:13 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Smith & NephewAssociated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB, 1:17-cv-01078-CC |