Williams v. Berryhill
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas M Digirolamo |
Case #: | 8:17-cv-01083 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 22, 2018 |
Defendant
Nancy A. Berryhill
|
|
Interested Party
SSA Notify
|
|
Plaintiff
Taft Williams Jr.
|
GPO
Jun 22 2018
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas M. DiGirolamo on 6/22/2018. (jrs, Chambers) |
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Monday, October 01, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
order
Judgment - Attorney Fees
Tue 10/02 7:39 AM
ORDER granting23 Motion for Attorney Fees; JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees awarded to Plaintiff against Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas M. DiGirolamo on 10/1/2018. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Sunday, September 09, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Attorney Fees
Sun 09/09 2:06 PM
MOTION for Attorney Fees by Taft Williams, Jr(Shea, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 | ||
Friday, June 22, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Fri 06/22 9:30 AM
ORDER DENYING15 Motion for Summary Judgment; DENYING20 Motion for Summary Judgment; and REMANDING under the fourth sentence of 42 U.S.C. section 405(g). Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas M. DiGirolamo on 6/22/2018. (jrs, Chambers) |
|
21 | 21
14
pgs
order
Memorandum Opinion
Fri 06/22 9:27 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas M. DiGirolamo on 6/22/2018. (jrs, Chambers) |
|
Tuesday, May 08, 2018 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 05/08 9:31 AM
Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. DiGirolamo. Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Monday, March 12, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Summary Judgment
Mon 03/12 2:35 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Nancy A. Berryhill.(Harris, Stacey) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support | ||
Monday, February 26, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Mon 02/26 4:16 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting18 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 2/26/2018. (vals, Chambers) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Extension of Time
Mon 02/26 2:03 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by Nancy A. Berryhill(Harris, Stacey) |
|
Friday, January 12, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Fri 01/12 9:35 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting16 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 1/12/2018. (vals, Chambers) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 01/12 9:22 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by Nancy A. Berryhill(Harris, Stacey) |
|
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Summary Judgment
Mon 11/13 3:31 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Taft Williams, Jr.(Shea, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum | ||
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Tue 10/31 4:14 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting13 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 10/31/2017. (vals, Chambers) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Extension of Time
Tue 10/31 3:45 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time by Taft Williams, Jr(Shea, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order
Wed 08/16 4:57 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING re11 Proposed Social Security Scheduling Order filed by Nancy A. Berryhill. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 8/16/2017. (val, Chambers) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Proposed Social Security Scheduling Order
Wed 08/16 12:49 PM
Proposed Social Security Scheduling Order submitted by Nancy A. Berryhill(Harris, Stacey) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Transcript
Wed 08/16 11:23 AM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings(Harris, Stacey) |
|
Att: 1 Certification Page, | ||
Att: 2 Court Transcript Index, | ||
Att: 3 Documents Related to Adminstrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, | ||
Att: 4 Payment Documents and Decisions, | ||
Att: 5 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, | ||
Att: 6 Non Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 7 Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 8 Medical Records Part 1, | ||
Att: 9 Medical Records Part 2 | ||
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice to Substitute Attorney
Tue 08/08 1:34 PM
NOTICE to Substitute Attorney (Harris, Stacey) |
|
Tuesday, July 04, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Tue 07/04 10:43 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Taft Williams, Jr. Nancy A. Berryhill served on 6/26/2017, answer due 8/25/2017.(Shea, Stephen) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Wed 05/10 1:29 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher for all Proceedings. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 5/10/2017 (cags, Deputy Clerk) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 05/10 9:40 AM
PAPERLESS NOTICE of Appearance and Consent to Magistrate Judge by Vickie LeDuc on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Fri 04/21 2:24 PM
Summons Issued 60 days as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(kns, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 04/20 4:38 PM
ORDER granting3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 4/20/2017. (c/s 04/20/2017 jf3s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 04/19 3:00 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Taft Williams, Jr(Shea, Stephen) |
|
2 | 2
corresp
Magistrate Judge - consent to
Wed 04/19 2:59 PM
Consent to Magistrate Judge (Shea, Stephen) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/19 2:59 PM
COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill, filed by Taft Williams, Jr.(Shea, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons |