Perez et al v. B&B Party & Events Inc. et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Vera M Scanlon |
Referred: | Vera M Scanlon |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02260 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 15:1938 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 14, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 11, 2017 5:31 AM EDT |
Defendant
B&B Party & Events Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Abraham Kleinbart
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Benjamin Kleinbart
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maria Morocho
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rosa Perez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Wednesday, March 28, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Wed 03/28 5:52 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon for all further proceedings. Judge Margo K. Brodie no longer assigned to case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Brucella, Michelle) |
|
utility
Case No Longer Referred
Wed 03/28 5:49 PM
Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. (Brucella, Michelle) |
||
Tuesday, March 27, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Tue 03/27 4:18 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Original form forwarded to Judge Brodie's chambers for approval. (Quinlan, Krista) |
|
minutes
Status Conference
Tue 03/27 4:04 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon:Status Conference held on 3/27/2018 in Courtroom 13A South. James O'Donnell appearing with Plaintiffs. Mark Kook appearing for Defendants. See separate docket entry for Order issuing from this proceeding. (FTR Log #3:38-4:02.) (Quinlan, Krista) |
||
Tuesday, March 13, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Settlement
Tue 03/13 5:26 PM
Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval by Maria Morocho, Rosa Perez. (Dalton, Helen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A (Fully Executed Settlement Agreement) | ||
Wednesday, March 07, 2018 | ||
order
Scheduling Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Wed 03/07 8:19 AM
RE-SCHEDULING ORDER: Due to a conflict in counsel's schedule, the status Conference originally scheduled for 3/23/2018 will be held on 3/27/2018 at 3:30 PM in Courtroom 13A South before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Counsel are to confirm amongst themselves that all are aware of this change. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 3/7/2018. (Quinlan, Krista) |
||
Tuesday, March 06, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Letter
Tue 03/06 3:57 PM
Letter from Defendants' COunsel Requesting Change in Time of Conference by B&B Party & Events Inc., Abraham Kleinbart, Benjamin Kleinbart (Kook, Mark) |
|
Wednesday, February 28, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Wed 02/28 8:44 AM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part consent17 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The Court is not available on the date requested. The 3/13/2018 in person status conference is adjourned to 3/23/2018 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 13A South before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Counsel for all Parties and Plaintiff are required to attend in person. To the extent the Parties have not already done so, on or before 3/15/2018, the Parties must file on ECF a joint motion for judicial approval of the proposed settlement. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 2/28/2018. (Quinlan, Krista) Modified on 2/28/2018 to correct date. (Quinlan, Krista) |
||
Tuesday, February 27, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Letter
Tue 02/27 5:56 PM
Letter journment of Preliminary Conference by B&B Party & Events Inc., Abraham Kleinbart, Benjamin Kleinbart (Kook, Mark) |
|
Thursday, February 22, 2018 | ||
adr
Report of Mediation(Settled/Unsettled)
Thu 02/22 11:46 AM
REPORT of Mediation settled. Both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be e-mailed to Robyn Weinstein at Robyn_Weinstein@nyed.uscourts.gov within two weeks following mediation session.Mediation Report Questionnaires due by 3/8/2018. (Weinstein, Robyn) |
||
Monday, February 12, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Mon 02/12 10:03 AM
ORDER granting15 otion to Adjourn Conference. Pursuant to Cheeks v. Freeport Pancake House, Inc., 796 F.3d 199 (2d Cir. 2015), an in-person status conference is scheduled for March 13, 2018 at 10:00 AM before the undersigned in Courtroom 13A South. Counsel for all Parties and Plaintiff are required to attend in person. To the extent the Parties have not already done so, on or before March 8, 2018, the Parties must file on ECF a joint motion for judicial approval of the proposed settlement. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 2/12/2018. (Pearce, Jessica) |
||
Friday, February 09, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 02/09 11:17 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by James Patrick Peter O'Donnell on behalf of Maria Morocho, Rosa Perez (aty to be noticed) (O'Donnell, James) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Adjourn Conference
Fri 02/09 11:14 AM
MOTION to Adjourn Conference As the Parties Have Reached a Settlement by Maria Morocho, Rosa Perez. (Dalton, Helen) |
|
Wednesday, January 03, 2018 | ||
adr
Selection of Mediator
Wed 01/03 1:21 PM
SELECTION OF MEDIATOR Chaim B Book selected as Mediator. The first mediation session will take place on February 7, 2018. Fourteen days on or before the session date, counsel shall file with the Mediator their client's mediation statement summarizing the facts, legal issues, particulars of any prior settlement discussions, and the name and title of the client or client representative with full settlement authority who will attend the mediation in person. Attendance in person is required of the trial attorney, insurance adjuster, and client or client representative with full settlement authority. The Confidentiality Stipulation must be signed at the mediation session by all participants and the Mediator and returned to Robyn Weinstein, ADR Administrator, Robyn_Weinstein@nyed.uscourts.gov or fax (718) 613-2333. Contact information for the Mediator is on the docket sheet. Upon completion of the mediation, both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be e-mailed to Robyn Weinstein at Robyn_Weinstein@nyed.uscourts.gov within two weeks following mediation session.Report of Mediation due by 2/21/2018. (Weinstein, Robyn) |
||
order
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Status Report Order Scheduling Order
Wed 01/03 4:01 PM
ORDER: In light of the upcoming mediation in early February, the status report date is postponed until 2/28/2018, and the 2/15/2018 status conference is adjourned sine die. If the parties do not settle, the Court will schedule another status conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 1/3/2018. (Scanlon, Vera) |
||
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
order
Order Referring Case to Mediation
Mon 11/20 8:54 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Mediation shall be completed by 12/22/17. Selection of Mediator due by 12/4/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 11/20/2017. (Quinlan, Krista) |
||
Friday, November 17, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Letter
Fri 11/17 10:29 AM
Letter Re: Parties' Request for Referral to EDNY Court Annexed Mediation Program by Maria Morocho, Rosa Perez (Dalton, Helen) |
|
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 09/26 10:30 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: As discussed during the 9/25/2017 conference (see attached order for additional detail and deadlines), all discovery including fact discovery must be completed by 4/30/2018. On or before 5/30/2018, the Parties will file a joint status report letter confirming that discovery is complete. On or before 5/30/2018, the Parties will initiate any dispositive motions in accordance with the Individual Rules of the District Judge. On or before 6/30/2018, the Parties will file their joint Proposed Pretrial Order. An in person Status Conference is set for 2/15/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 13A South before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. On or before 2/8/2018, the Parties will file a joint status report letter, of no more than three pages, identifying any outstanding discovery disputes. Counsel are encouraged to consider mediation with the Court's ADR program. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 9/25/2017. (Quinlan, Krista) |
|
minutes
Initial Conference Hearing
Tue 09/26 10:26 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon:Initial Conference Hearing held on 9/25/2017 in Courtroom 13A South. Helen Dalton appearing for Plaintiff. Ms. Dalton is to file a notice of appearance. Mark Kook appearing for Defendants. See separate docket entry for Order issuing from this proceeding. (FTR Log #11:27-11:36.) (Quinlan, Krista) |
||
Tuesday, September 12, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Adjourn Conference
Tue 09/12 2:45 PM
Supplemental MOTION to Adjourn Conference re Plaintiffs' Consent by B&B Party & Events Inc., Abraham Kleinbart, Benjamin Kleinbart. (Kook, Mark) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Adjourn Conference
Tue 09/12 1:23 PM
First MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for September 13, 2017, by B&B Party & Events Inc., Abraham Kleinbart, Benjamin Kleinbart. (Kook, Mark) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Scheduling Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Tue 09/12 5:11 PM
ORDER granting Motions11 and12 to Adjourn Conference. RE-SCHEDULING ORDER: The Initial Conference is scheduled for 9/25/2017 11:30 AM in Courtroom 13A South before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Plaintiffs' counsel is directed to confirm with Defendants' counsel that all necessary participants are aware of this conference. In order to facilitate settlement discussions, Plaintiffs' counsel is expected to provide Defendants' counsel with a detailed calculation of damages at least one week prior to the Initial Conference. Counsel must complete the attached joint proposed scheduling order and file on ECF no later than 9/18/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 9/12/2017. (Pearce, Jessica) |
||
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
order
Scheduling Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Mon 09/11 2:49 PM
RE-SCHEDULING ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict, the Initial Conference set for 9/13/2017 will begin at 10:00 AM (not 12:00 PM) in Courtroom 13A South before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Counsel are to confirm amongst themselves that all are aware of this change. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 9/11/2017. (Quinlan, Krista) Modified on 9/11/2017 (Pearce, Jessica) |
||
Thursday, September 07, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Proposed Scheduling Order
Thu 09/07 4:35 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Maria Morocho, Rosa Perez (Dalton, Helen) |
|
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 07/25 3:35 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: As set forth in the attached Order, an Initial Conference is scheduled for 9/13/2017 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Scanlon in Courtroom 504 North. Plaintiffs' counsel is directed to confirm with Defendants' counsel that all necessary participants are aware of this conference. In order to facilitate settlement discussions, Plaintiffs' counsel is expected to provide Defendants' counsel with a detailed calculation of damages at least one week prior to the Initial Conference. Counsel must complete the attached joint proposed scheduling order and file on ECF no later than 9/7/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 7/25/2017. (Quinlan, Krista) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 07/24 11:07 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by B&B Party & Events Inc., Abraham Kleinbart, Benjamin Kleinbart (Kook, Mark) |
|
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 07/21 10:31 AM
Defendants' ANSWER to1 Complaint by All Defendants. (Kook, Mark) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
order
Status Report Order
Mon 07/10 9:40 AM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: If Defendants fail to answer by 7/24/2017, Plaintiffs are to timely move for entry of a certificate of default, then move for a default judgment. Plaintiffs' counsel is ordered to serve this Order on Defendants' counsel, and to file an affidavit of service by 7/14/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 7/10/2017. (Quinlan, Krista) |
||
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 05/05 4:06 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rosa Perez, Maria Morocho. Benjamin Kleinbart served on 4/24/2017, answer due 5/15/2017. (Dalton, Helen) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 05/05 4:04 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rosa Perez, Maria Morocho. Abraham Kleinbart served on 4/24/2017, answer due 5/15/2017. (Dalton, Helen) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 05/05 4:03 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rosa Perez, Maria Morocho. B&B Party & Events Inc. served on 4/20/2017, answer due 5/11/2017. (Dalton, Helen) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Wed 04/19 3:19 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/19 3:19 PM
Summons Issued as to B&B Party & Events Inc., Abraham Kleinbart, Benjamin Kleinbart. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/19 3:18 PM
COMPLAINT against B&B Party & Events Inc., Abraham Kleinbart, Benjamin Kleinbart, filed by Rosa Perez, Maria Morocho. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
Filing Fee Received
Wed 04/19 3:19 PM
FILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number 465311379 (Davis, Kimberly) |