Alzockary v. Sessions et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Margo K Brodie |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02263 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus |
Case Filed: | Apr 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 26, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 11, 2017 5:24 AM EDT |
Defendant
David T. Donahue
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Secretary of DHS Jeh Charles Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Director of USCIS Lori Scialabba
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Attorney General Jeff Sessions
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rex W. Tillerson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ebrahim S. Alzockary
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Judgment - Clerk
Fri 05/26 11:25 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT- ORDERED and ADJUDGED that Plaintiffs Complaint and all claims therein be and hereby are dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure.. Ordered by Janet Hamilton, Deputy Clerk on 5/26/2017. (Marziliano, August) |
|
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Settlement Order(Other)
Fri 05/26 11:23 AM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Settlement. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the parties to the above-captioned action, that Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims therein be and hereby are dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a)(l)(A) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 5/25/2017. (Francis-McLeish, Ogoro) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Settlement
Tue 05/23 4:47 PM
MOTION for Settlement by David T. Donahue, Jeh Charles Johnson, Lori Scialabba, Jeff Sessions, Rex W. Tillerson. (Parikh, Reena) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 05/10 2:08 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice by David T. Donahue, Jeh Charles Johnson, Lori Scialabba, Jeff Sessions, Rex W. Tillerson (Parikh, Reena) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order to Show Cause (Federal)
Tue 04/25 11:34 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE and Electronic Service upon the US Attorneys Office. The United States Attorney, as attorney for defendants, is directed to show cause on or before 5/29/2017 , in writing, why a writ of mandamus should not be issued, and shall serve a copy of the response on plaintiff, with proof of such service to the Clerk of this Court; On or before 6/19/2017 , plaintiff shall file his reply, if any, with proof of service to the Clerk of this Court; Oral argument shall be heard on 7/20/2017 at 10:30 A.M. in courtroom 6F North before Judge Margo K. Brodie; Service of a copy of this Order along with the1 Complaint/Petition of Writ of Mandamus by Ebrahim S. Alzockary shall be Electronically Served upon the US Attorney's Office. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 4/25/2017. (Francis-McLeish, Ogoro) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/25 4:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Reena Parikh on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Parikh, Reena) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Wed 04/19 11:54 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Wed 04/19 11:51 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/19 11:50 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Ebrahim S. Alzockary. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
Filing Fee Received
Wed 04/19 11:52 AM
FILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number 4653113804 (Bowens, Priscilla) |