Fontanes v. 192 5th Ave. LTD et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Margo K Brodie |
Referred: | Robert M Levy |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02336 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:1201 Civil Rights (Disability) |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 18, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 16, 2017 5:24 AM EDT |
Defendant
192 5th Ave. LTD
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Soi Thai Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Pedro Fontanes
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 07/18 10:28 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE . IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED, CONSENTED TO, AND AGREED by the undersigned counsel for all Defendants, that the case is settled pursuant to the terms of a confidential agreement and the lawsuit is dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 (a), with prejudice, and without costs or disbursements to any parties herein. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 7/18/2017. (Francis-McLeish, Ogoro) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 07/17 10:17 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Pedro Fontanes (Sekendiz, Ismail) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 06/23 3:37 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 8/22/2017 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 11B South before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 6/23/2017. (Marino, Janine) |
|
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 06/13 12:09 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by 192 5th Ave. LTD. (Berger, Heath) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 06/13 5:52 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer 192 5th Ave. LTD answer due 7/5/2017.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 6/13/2017. (Levy, Robert) |
||
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 05/04 11:25 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pedro Fontanes. Soi Thai Inc served on 4/26/2017, answer due 5/17/2017. (Sekendiz, Ismail) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 05/04 11:24 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pedro Fontanes. 192 5th Ave. LTD served on 4/26/2017, answer due 5/17/2017. (Sekendiz, Ismail) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/20 4:07 PM
Summons Issued as to 192 5th Ave. LTD, Soi Thai Inc. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Thu 04/20 4:05 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Thu 04/20 4:05 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 04/20 4:00 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) |
||
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/19 12:34 PM
COMPLAINT Pedro Fontanes against 192 5th Ave. LTD, Soi Thai Inc filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9460347 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Pedro Fontanes. (Sekendiz, Ismail) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons |