Williams v. 4806-14 Church Ave. Realty LLC
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Frederic Block |
Referred: | Peggy Kuo |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02346 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:1201 Civil Rights (Disability) |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 15, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 16, 2017 5:35 AM EDT |
Defendant
4806-14 Church Ave. Realty LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Bryan Williams
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 09/15 4:38 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Bryan Williams (Fuller, Lawrence) |
|
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 09/15 4:51 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER DISMISSING CASE: See entry10 . Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 9/15/2017. (Innelli, Michael) |
||
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 08/18 12:42 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: In light of the Status Report filed at9 a Status Conference is scheduled for September 20, 2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11C South before Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. If a Stipulation of Dismissal is filed before the conference, then the conference will be cancelled. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to ensure that defendant is aware of the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 8/18/2017. (Riquelme, Claudia) |
||
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Status Report
Thu 08/17 9:38 AM
STATUS REPORT by Bryan Williams (Fuller, Lawrence) |
|
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
order
Status Report Order
Thu 07/27 4:29 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: In light of the response to the Order to Show Cause filed at8 a status report or a Stipulation of Dismissal must be filed by August 28, 2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 7/27/2017. (Riquelme, Claudia) |
||
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Response to Order to Show Cause
Wed 07/26 2:07 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Bryan Williams (Fuller, Lawrence) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
order
Order to Show Cause
Wed 07/26 11:23 AM
Order to Show Cause: Plaintiff is ordered to show cause by August 9, 2017 why Plaintiff has not requested a certificate of default in this action. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a). Failure to comply may result in a recommendation that this matter be dismissed for failure to prosecute. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 7/26/2017. (Riquelme, Claudia) |
||
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 07/10 2:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence A. Fuller on behalf of Bryan Williams (aty to be noticed) (Fuller, Lawrence) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice(Other)
Wed 07/05 4:32 PM
NOTICE: The Court notes that Lawrence Fuller has filed a Notice of Unavailability at6 . Mr. Fuller has not noticed an Appearance on this case. (Riquelme, Claudia) |
||
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice(Other)
Thu 06/29 9:34 AM
NOTICE by Bryan Williams (Harris, Keith) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 06/21 1:49 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bryan Williams. 4806-14 Church Ave. Realty LLC served on 4/28/2017, answer due 5/19/2017. (Harris, Keith) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/21 2:33 PM
Summons Issued as to 4806-14 Church Ave. Realty LLC. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Fri 04/21 2:29 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Fri 04/21 2:25 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 04/21 2:16 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) |
||
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/19 4:39 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9461823 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Bryan Williams. (Harris, Keith) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons |