Hu et al v. The City of New York et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Allyne R Ross |
Referred: | James R Cho |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02348 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1981 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2017 |
Re-opened: | Jul 08, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jan 20, 2022 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 16, 2017 5:14 AM EDT |
Defendant
Dennis Burkart
280 Broadway 3rd Floor
New York, NY 10007 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michael Camera
280 Broadway 3rd Floor
New York, NY 10007 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rafael Collis
280 Broadway 3rd Floor
New York, NY 10007 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Salvatore Concialdi
280 Broadway 3rd Floor
New York, NY 10007 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
John/Jane Doe(s) Nos. 1-10
|
|
Defendant
Jose L. Espaillat
280 Broadway 3rd Floor
New York, NY 10007 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
M Imran
280 Broadway 3rd Floor
New York, NY 10007 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cesar Romero
280 Broadway 3rd Floor
New York, NY 10007 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
The City of New York
100 Church Street
New York, NY 10007 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Robert Turner
280 Broadway 3rd Floor
New York, NY 10007 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
888 Consulting Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric Hu
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NY Drilling, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Monday, March 11, 2024 | ||
misc
Costs Taxed
Mon 03/11 2:30 PM
Costs Taxed in amount of $ $1943.40 against Plaintiff, in favor of Defendants and included in the Judgment. Brenna B. Mahoney, Clerk of Court. (BBM) |