Belizar et al v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Joseph F Bianco |
Referred: | Gary R Brown |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02341 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 11, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 16, 2017 4:56 AM EDT |
Defendant
Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Belizar
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stanley Belizar
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Terminated: 04/28/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.
Terminated: 04/28/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc.
Terminated: 04/28/2017
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Wednesday, October 11, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 10/13 11:40 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice and without costs. The clerk of the court shall close the case.. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 10/11/2017. (Bollbach, Jean) |
|
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 10/06 5:15 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Potashner, Marshall) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
minutes
Settlement Conference
Wed 09/20 4:03 PM
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown: CIVIL CAUSE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Counsel for Plaintiff: No Appearance Necessary. Counsel for Defendant: Marshall T. Potashner, present. Counsel for Plaintiff in State Court: Thomas P. Brennan, present. Counsel for Defendant in State Court: Frederick Soller, present. Settlement Conference held on 9/20/2017 at 11:49 am. Settlement discussions held, case settled as set forth on the record. A stipulation of discontinuance to be filed by all parties by no later than November 3, 2017. Other: Oral motion to seal made by Counsel Mr. Potashner. Motion granted on the record. (FTR Log #11:49 - 11:51 and SEALED 1:30 - 1:39.) (Ortiz, Grisel) |
|
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 08/10 2:49 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Due to a conflict with the court's calendar, the August 23, 2017 settlement conference is hereby adjourned to August 30, 2017 at 2:00 p.m. The parties are directed to comply with the undersigned's individual rules regarding settlement conferences, including the provision of an ex parte letter to the court regarding the party's settlement position. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 8/10/2017. c/ecf (Johnston, Linda) |
||
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Tue 08/08 10:53 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER finding as moot10 Motion to Adjourn Conference. Due to a conflict with the court's calendar, the August 9, 2017 settlement conference is hereby adjourned to August 23, 2017 at 2:30 p.m. The parties are directed to comply with the undersigned's individual rules regarding settlement conferences, including the provision of an ex parte letter to the court regarding the party's settlement position. In addition, counsel are reminded of their obligation of professional cooperation and courtesy and are directed to review Local Civil Rule 26.4 "Cooperation Among Counsel in Discovery." Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 8/8/2017. c/ecf (Meehan, James) |
||
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 07/31 7:35 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re10 Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference Letter in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ray, John) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Adjourn Conference
Mon 07/31 5:29 PM
Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Potashner, Marshall) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Hearing
Wed 07/05 8:55 AM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Hearing A settlement conference is set for 8/9/2017 at 10:30 a.m.. Parties should consult my individual rules regarding settlement. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 7/5/2017. (McMorrow, Karen) |
||
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Letter
Fri 06/30 2:12 PM
Letter re: Settlement Conference Date by Michael Belizar, Stanley Belizar (Ray, John) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 06/05 11:08 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Due to a change in the Court's calendar, the 6/20/2017 Initial Conference is rescheduled to 6/27/2017 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 840 before Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 6/5/2017. (McMorrow, Karen) |
||
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 05/22 10:52 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Potashner, Marshall) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 05/15 10:47 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 6/20/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 840 before Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. See order for instructions. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 5/15/2017. (McMorrow, Karen) |
|
Att: 1 GRB Individual Rules | ||
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
State Court Record
Fri 05/05 10:50 AM
STATE COURT RECORD received from the Suffolk County Clerk's Office. Since this case is E-filed, there are no hard copies of the documents. (Florio, Lisa) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order Dismissing Parties
Tue 05/02 11:04 AM
Order Dismissing without prejudice and without costs Parties Party Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company and Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. terminated.. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 4/28/17. (Bollbach, Jean) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Stipulation
Thu 04/27 3:45 PM
STIPULATION Dismissing the claims against defendants Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., and Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., without prejudice, and allowing defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company until May 20, 2017 to respond to the Verified Complaint by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Potashner, Marshall) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Thu 04/20 9:42 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Thu 04/20 9:40 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 04/20 9:42 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Joseph F. Bianco and Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) |
||
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 04/19 3:29 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Suffolk, case number 605175/2017. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0207-9461228) (Potashner, Marshall) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Verified Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 -- Affidavits of Service, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |