Fraker v. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Arthur D Spatt |
Referred: | Anne Y Shields |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02353 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 15:2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 06, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 16, 2017 5:25 AM EDT |
Defendant
Best Buy Co., Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Sears Holding Corporation
|
|
Defendant
The Home Depot, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Peter Fraker
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
utility
Transfer Case Opened
Tue 10/10 2:23 PM
Case transferred from New York Eastern has been opened in Western District of Oklahoma[LIVE] as case 5:17-cv-01084, filed 10/10/2017. (Florio, Lisa) |
||
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order
Tue 10/10 9:24 AM
JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order. In Re: MDL No. 2792 SAMSUNG TOP-LOAD WASHING MACHINE MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION. Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the Untied States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Western District of Oklahoma for the reasons stated in the order of October 6, 2017, and with the consent of that Court, assigned to the Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti. (Ortiz, Grisel) |
|
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District Transfer
Tue 10/10 9:27 AM
Case electronically transferred to District of Western District of Oklahoma. In Re: MDL No. 2792 SAMSUNG TOP-LOAD WASHING MACHINE MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Ortiz, Grisel) |
||
Wednesday, October 04, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order
Wed 10/04 9:50 AM
JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order Re: IN RE: Samsung Top-Load Washing Machine Marketing, Sales Practices and Products Liability Litigation MDL No. 2792. Pursuant to to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the Unties States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Eastern District of W.D. Oklahoma for the reasons stated in the Order of October 4, 2017, and, with the consent of that Court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti. This Order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States Distirct Court for the Eastern Distirct of W.D. Oklahoma. (Ortiz, Grisel) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Tue 05/23 2:52 PM
ORDER granting5 Motion to Stay. The action is STAYED pending final resolution of Wells v. Samsung Electronics America, Inc., et al.. Case No. CIV-17-46-D; Higginbotham v. Samsung Electronics America, Inc., et al., Case No. CIV-17-102-D; consolidated as Case No. CIV-17-46-D. All deadlines, including Defendants' obligations to respond to Plaintiffs complaint, are VACATED until further order of the Court; Plaintiff shall notify the Court of any resolutions within fourteen (14) days of the decisions if the Court is not otherwise notified. It is So Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 5/23/2017. (Coleman, Laurie) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Stay
Fri 05/19 6:43 PM
MOTION to Stay by Peter Fraker. (Federman, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 Federman Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 Agreed Motion to Consolidate, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 Order Granting Consolidation, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/20 11:39 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Rodin, Deanna) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., | ||
Att: 2 Summons The Home Depot, Inc., | ||
Att: 3 Summons Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, | ||
Att: 4 Summons Best Buy Co., Inc., | ||
Att: 5 Summons Sears Holding Corporation | ||
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Thu 04/20 11:27 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Thu 04/20 11:25 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 04/20 11:27 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Arthur D. Spatt and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) |
||
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/19 8:47 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9462266 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Peter Fraker. (Federman, William) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons Best Buy Co., Inc., | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons Lowes Home Centers, LLC, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Summons Samsung Electronics America, Inc., | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Summons Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., | ||
Att: 6 Proposed Summons Sears Holding Corporation, | ||
Att: 7 Proposed Summons The Home Depot, Inc. |