PADILLA v. COUNTY OF LANCASTER, PENNSYLVANIA et al
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Henry S Perkin |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-01785 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment) |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 09, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Oct 15, 2017 5:35 AM EDT |
Defendant
COUNTY OF LANCASTER, PENNSYLVANIA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MARK REESE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JESSICA PADILLA
|
Represented By
|
1. | Deputy sheriff files sexual harassment lawsuit against Lancaster County Sheriff Mark Reese (fox43.com) |
Submitted Mon 05/08/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Tuesday, January 09, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case - 41(b)
Wed 01/10 8:20 AM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b), ETC. THE COUNTY OF LANCASTER WAS DISMISSED UPON MOTION OF ITS COUNSEL WITHOUT OBJECTIONS PRIOR TO THE ENTRY OF THIS ORDER UNDER 41.1(B). SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN ON 1/9/18. 1/10/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er, ) |
|
25 | 25
minutes
Settlement Conference
Wed 01/10 8:14 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN: an In Person Settlement Conference held on 1/9/18. Court Reporter: esr. (er, ) |
|
Tuesday, December 26, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 12/26 2:37 PM
ORDER THAT AN IN PERSON SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/9/2018 09:30 AM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN; ETC. AS HEREIN. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN ON 12/26/17. 12/26/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (mas, ) |
|
23 | 23
minutes
Settlement Conference
Tue 12/26 2:28 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN. Settlement Conference held on 12/22/17. A telephonic settlement conference was conducted in this case. (mas, ) |
|
Friday, December 08, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
minutes
Settlement Conference
Fri 12/08 11:49 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN re: A Telephonic Settlement Conference was held on 12/8/17. (ky, ) |
|
Monday, December 04, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
minutes
Settlement Conference
Mon 12/04 1:13 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN re: A Telephonic Settlement Conference was held on 12/1/17. (ky, ) |
|
Thursday, October 26, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
5
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines
Thu 10/26 3:52 PM
RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER THAT DISCOVERY IS DUE BY 1/26/2018; MOTIONS ARE DUE BY 4/6/2018; MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ARE DUE BY 3/2/2018; A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 5/21/2018 AT 9:30 A.M.; JURY SELECTION IS SCHEDULED FOR 6/4/2018 AT 9:30 A.M.; A JURY TRIAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 6/5/2018 AT 9:30 A.M.; PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO IS DUE BY 4/27/2018; DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO IS DUE BY 4/27/2018. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN ON 10/26/17. 10/26/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ky, ) |
|
19 | 19
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Thu 10/26 3:16 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN re: A Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference was held on 10/26/17. (ky, ) |
|
Tuesday, September 12, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 09/13 9:10 AM
ORDER THAT A TELEPHONIC RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 10/26/2017 AT 2:30 P.M. BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN ON 9/12/17. 9/13/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ky, ) |
|
Friday, September 08, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Consent and Order to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Fri 09/08 1:10 PM
CONSENT AND ORDER TO JURISDICTION BY U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN TO CONDUCT ALL PROCEEDINGS IN THIS CASE, INCLUDING TRIAL, THE ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT, AND ALL POST-TRIAL PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 9/8/17. 9/8/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ky, ) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 09/08 11:26 AM
NOTICE THAT THE INITIAL F.R.C.P. 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 9/12/17 AT 3:00 P.M. HAS BEEN CANCELLED. (ky, ) |
|
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Hearing
Mon 08/28 10:46 AM
NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING OF INITIAL FED.R.CIV.P. 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: THE INITIAL FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR THURSDAY, SEPTEMBER 14, 2017, AT 3:00 P.M., HAS BEEN RESCHEDULED TO TUESDAY, SEPTEMBER 12, 2017, AT 3:00 P.M. BEFORE THE HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR. AT THE EDWARD N. CAHN U.S. COURTHOUSE AND FEDERAL BUILDING, COURTROOM C, THIRD FLOOR, 504 WEST HAMILTON STREET, ALLENTOWN, PENNSYLVANIA.(dja, ) |
|
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
Mon 08/07 1:57 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by SHERYL L. BROWN on behalf of MARK REESE(BROWN, SHERYL) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 08/07 10:43 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT P. DIDOMENICIS on behalf of MARK REESE with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(DIDOMENICIS, ROBERT) |
|
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Hearing
Thu 07/27 4:41 PM
NOTICE OF SCHEDULING OF INITIAL FED.R.CIV.P. 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: AN INITIAL FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR THURSDAY, SEPTEMBER 14, 2017, AT 3:00 P.M. BEFORE THE HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR. AT THE EDWARD N. CAHN U.S. COURTHOUSE AND FEDERAL BUILDING, COURTROOM C, THIRD FLOOR, 504 WEST HAMILTON STREET, ALLENTOWN, PENNSYLVANIA.(dja, ) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 07/14 9:14 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint together with With Affirmative Defenses by MARK REESE.(BROWN, SHERYL) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Fri 06/30 2:09 PM
ORDER THAT DEFENDANT SHERIFF MARK REESE'S PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS IS GRANTED AND ALL TITLE VII CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT SHERIFF REESE AS SET FORTH IN COUNTS III AND IV ARE DISMISSED AS A MATTER OF LAW, WITH PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 6/30/17. 6/30/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ky, ) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 06/19 12:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JARED A. JACOBSON on behalf of JESSICA PADILLA with Certificate of Service(JACOBSON, JARED) |
|
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Tue 05/16 11:55 AM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Partial) filed by MARK REESE.Memorandum, Certificate of Partial Concurrence, Certificate of Service.(BROWN, SHERYL) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Partial Concurrence, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 05/12 3:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by LAUREN A. MOSER on behalf of COUNTY OF LANCASTER, PENNSYLVANIA with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(MOSER, LAUREN) |
|
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 05/12 2:44 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by COUNTY OF LANCASTER, PENNSYLVANIA.(GONZALES, JOHN) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 05/12 2:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN P. GONZALES on behalf of COUNTY OF LANCASTER, PENNSYLVANIA with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(GONZALES, JOHN) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 05/09 4:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SHERYL L. BROWN on behalf of MARK REESE with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(BROWN, SHERYL) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Affidavit of Service
Wed 05/03 3:50 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Richard Ehrlich re: served Summons upon Police Chief Hamilton, on behalf of Sheriff Mark Reese by Substituted Service on 04/25/2017 (ROOKS, FRANKLIN) |
|
2 | 2
service
Affidavit of Service
Wed 05/03 3:43 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Richard Ehrlich re: served Summons upon E. William Peters (Chief County Clerk), on behalf of Office of County Commissioners for Lancaster County by Substituted Service on 04/25/2017 (ROOKS, FRANKLIN) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
49
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/19 9:09 AM
COMPLAINT against COUNTY OF LANCASTER, PENNSYLVANIA, MARK REESE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 158207.), filed by JESSICA PADILLA.(jwl, ) |
|
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/19 9:10 AM
Summons Issued as to COUNTY OF LANCASTER, PENNSYLVANIA, MARK REESE. Two Forwarded To: Counsel on 4/19/17 (jwl, ) |
||
misc
Jury Demand
Wed 04/19 9:10 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by JESSICA PADILLA. (jwl, ) |