Goodwater v. County of Charleston et al
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | David C Norton |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00998 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 12, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Oct 15, 2017 4:43 AM EDT |
Defendant
Charleston County Sheriff's Office
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dep J Comfort
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
County of Charleston
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lt Plunkett
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Captain Tittle
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Goodwater
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Sheriff J Al Cannon, Jr
Terminated: 08/29/2017
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, February 12, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Judgment
Mon 02/12 3:14 PM
JUDGMENT in favor of Charleston County Sheriff's Office, County of Charleston, Plunkett, J Comfort against Joseph Goodwater (jbry, ) |
|
30 | 30
13
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Mon 02/12 1:34 PM
ORDER granting 23 Motion to Dismiss Signed by Honorable David C Norton on February 12, 2018.(span, ) |
|
Monday, October 02, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Mon 10/02 7:21 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re23 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint Response filed by Charleston County Sheriff's Office, J Comfort, County of Charleston, Plunkett, Tittle. (Chandler, J W) |
|
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 09/25 7:32 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re23 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint Response filed by Joseph Goodwater.Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/2/2017 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Hunt, Bonnie) |
|
Friday, September 08, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 09/08 11:23 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 25 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 23 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Response to Motion due by 9/25/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 9/8/2017.(eric, ) |
|
Thursday, September 07, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 09/07 5:46 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to23 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Joseph Goodwater. Response to Motion due by 9/21/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Hunt, Bonnie) |
|
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Dismiss
Mon 08/28 4:27 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by J Al Cannon, Jr, Charleston County Sheriff's Office, J Comfort, County of Charleston, Plunkett, Tittle. Response to Motion due by 9/11/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Chandler, J W) |
|
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 08/15 4:21 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Charleston County Sheriff's Office, J Comfort, County of Charleston, Plunkett, Tittle, filed by Joseph Goodwater. Service due by 11/13/2017 (Hunt, Bonnie) |
|
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
minutes
Motion Hearing
Wed 07/19 4:29 PM
Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Honorable David C Norton: Motion Hearing held on 7/19/2017 re 4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by J Comfort, Tittle, Plunkett, Charleston County Sheriff's Office, County of Charleston, J Al Cannon, Jr. Plaintiff shall file amended complaint by 8/15/17. After the filing of the amended complaint, defendant should file a supplemental motion to dismiss. Court Reporter Debbie Potocki. (cmur, ) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Supplement - Not an attachment to main document
Mon 07/17 6:52 PM
SUPPLEMENT by J Al Cannon, Jr, Charleston County Sheriff's Office, J Comfort, County of Charleston, Plunkett, Tittle to12 Reply to Response to Motion, .(Chandler, J W) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Easement Plat, 1991, Plat Book CD, Page 129, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Easement, Book N214, Page 763, TMS#614-00-00-50, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Easement, Book N214, Page 758, TMS#614-00-00-49, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Easement, Book N214, Page 768, TMS#614-00-00-48 | ||
Saturday, July 08, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Supplement - Not an attachment to main document
Sat 07/08 10:31 PM
SUPPLEMENT by Joseph Goodwater to10 Response in Opposition to Motion, .(Hunt, Bonnie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1. Miller Statement, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2. Virginia Thompson Miller Deed, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3. Incident Report, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4. Right of Way for Electric, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5. Plat with Tracks, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6. 2003 Letter, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7. 2015 Letter, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8. Plat with Names, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9. Letter to County, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 10. Deed | ||
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Hearing on Motion
Tue 06/27 12:55 PM
NOTICE of Hearing on Motion4 MOTION to Dismiss : Motion Hearing set for Wednesday, 7/19/2017 at 10:30 AM in Charleston Courtroom #2, J. Waties Waring Judicial Center, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable David C Norton. (jbry, ) |
|
17 | 17
order
Order
Tue 06/27 9:32 AM
TEXT ORDER granting protection from court appearances to J.W. Nelson Chandler for 7/5-7/2017, 7/10/2017, 7/20/2017 and 8/11/2017. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 6/27/2017. (eric, ) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Request for Protection from Court Appearance
Mon 06/26 1:17 PM
NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by J W Nelson Chandler for July 5, 2017 through July 7, 2017; July 10, 2017; July 20, 2017; August 11, 2017(Chandler, J W) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Cancellation of Hearing
Mon 06/26 11:04 AM
NOTICE of Cancellation of Hearing: on Motion4 MOTION to Dismiss : Motion Hearing set for Thursday, 6/29/2017 at 10:00 AM (jbry, ) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order
Thu 06/22 11:19 AM
TEXT ORDER granting protection from court appearances to Bonnie Hunt for 8/25-9/1/2017 and 10/20-30/2017. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 6/22/2017. (eric, ) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Request for Protection from Court Appearance
Wed 06/21 7:05 PM
NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Bonnie Travaglio Hunt for August 25, 2017 to September 1, 2017 and October 20, 2017 to October 30, 2017 (Hunt, Bonnie) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Mon 06/05 4:53 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re4 MOTION to Dismiss Response filed by J Al Cannon, Jr, Charleston County Sheriff's Office, J Comfort, County of Charleston, Plunkett, Tittle.(Chandler, J W) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Property records 614-00-00-048, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B: Property records 614-00-00-049, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C: Property records 614-00-00-050, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D: Portions of Probate Court file for Estate of Maggie Goodwater | ||
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Hearing on Motion
Thu 06/01 12:54 PM
NOTICE of Hearing on Motion4 MOTION to Dismiss : Motion Hearing set for Thursday, 6/29/2017 at 10:00 AM in Charleston Courtroom #2, J. Waties Waring Judicial Center, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable David C Norton. (jbry, ) |
|
Sunday, May 28, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Sun 05/28 9:13 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re4 MOTION to Dismiss Response filed by Joseph Goodwater.Reply to Response to Motion due by 6/5/2017 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.(Hunt, Bonnie) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Exhibit A | ||
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 05/25 11:46 AM
ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 4 MOTION to Dismiss Response to Motion due by 5/30/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 5/25/2017.(jbry, ) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 05/24 12:28 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to4 MOTION to Dismiss by Joseph Goodwater. Response to Motion due by 6/7/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Hunt, Bonnie) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 05/09 8:08 AM
ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 4 MOTION to Dismiss Response to Motion due by 5/24/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 5/9/2017.(jbry, ) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 05/08 9:22 AM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to4 MOTION to Dismiss by Joseph Goodwater. Response to Motion due by 5/22/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Hunt, Bonnie) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 04/25 12:54 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by J Al Cannon, Jr, Charleston County Sheriff's Office, J Comfort, County of Charleston, Plunkett, Tittle.(Chandler, J W) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Dismiss
Tue 04/25 12:51 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by J Al Cannon, Jr, Charleston County Sheriff's Office, J Comfort, County of Charleston, Plunkett, Tittle. Response to Motion due by 5/9/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(Chandler, J W) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Garden Hill Road Map, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - County Council Directive 11-360 | ||
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Wed 04/19 8:26 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by J Al Cannon, Jr, Charleston County Sheriff's Office, J Comfort, County of Charleston, Plunkett, Tittle.(jbry, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Wed 04/19 8:25 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charleston County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2017-CP 10-00645 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-7107355), filed by Charleston County Sheriff's Office, Tittle, County of Charleston, J Al Cannon, Jr, J Comfort, Plunkett.(jbry, ) |
|
Att: 1 State Court Documents Summons and Complaint |